Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1285 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/28/2022

                    Page 1 
April 28, 2022  HB 22-1285  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated April 11, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0589  
Rep. Neville; Esgar 
Sen. Moreno; Cooke  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 28, 2022 
Senate HHS  
Annie Scott | 303-866-5851 
Annie.Scott@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: PROHIBIT COLLECTION HOSPITAL NOT DISCLOSING PRICES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
This bill prohibits a hospital from pursuing a collection action against a patient owing 
debt if the hospital was not in compliance with federal price transparency laws on the 
date that the items or services were provided to the patient, allows a patient to pursue 
legal action, and requires certain remedies from hospitals for violations.  The bill may 
increase state workload and revenue beginning in FY 2022-23.   
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.    
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
Under federal law, hospitals are required to post standard charges on a publically available website 
as of January 1, 2021.  On or after February 15, 2023, the bill prohibits a critical access hospital licensed 
and certified by the Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) from pursuing a 
collection action against a patient owing debt if the hospital was not in material compliance with 
hospital price transparency laws on the date that the items or services were provided to the patient, 
and allows a patient to file suit to determine if the hospital was out of compliance with these laws.  If 
a hospital is found to be out of material compliance, the hospital is required to: 
 
 refund any amount of the debt that has been paid and pay a penalty to the payer in an amount 
equal to the total amount of the debt; 
 dismiss any court action and pay any attorney fees and costs incurred by the patient relating to 
the action; and 
 remove any report made to a consumer reporting agency relating to the debt from the patient's 
credit report.   
   Page 2 
April 28, 2022  HB 22-1285  
 
State Revenue and Expenditures 
Workload in the Judicial Department may increase to the extent that civil cases are filed to seek the 
remedies allowed under the bill.  The number of cases are expected to be minimal and no additional 
appropriations are required.  Revenue from civil filing fees may also increase minimally, and are 
subject to TABOR.   
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Health Care Policy and Financing  Information Technology 
Judicial  Law          
Public Health and Environment 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.