Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1359 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 08/08/2022

                    Page 1 
August 8, 2022  HB 22-1359  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0699  
Rep. Bacon; Snyder 
Sen. Rodriguez  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst:  
August 8, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
Matt.Bishop@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: COLORADO HOUSEHOLD FINANCIAL RECOVERY PROGRAM  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a pilot program to provide loan support to certain individuals and 
households affected by the COVID-19 pandemic.  It increases state expenditures and 
may increase state revenue beginning in FY 2022-23. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill includes an appropriation of $5.2 million to the Colorado 
Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program Fund for use by the Department of 
Treasury. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1359 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds $5,110,295     $69,595     
 	Centrally Appropriated $9,971 $9,971 
 	Total Expenditures $5,120,266 $79,566 
 	Total FTE 0.9 FTE 0.7 FTE 
Transfers
1
 	General Fund ($5,200,000) 	- 
 	Cash Funds $5,200,000 	- 
 	Net Transfer 	$0 	- 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $780,000  	- 
 
1
 This transfer is made through an appropriation of General Fund to a cash fund. 
 
    Page 2 
August 8, 2022  HB 22-1359  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Colorado Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program in the Department of the 
Treasury to facilitate lending to certain individuals and households impacted by the COIVD-19 
pandemic.  The program may establish a loan loss reserve to partially offset risk in making loans to 
eligible individuals or households, make payments to lenders to buy down interest rates, or to provide 
lending capital.  The bill establishes parameters for the program, including the maximum loan and 
interest amounts, and reporting requirements. The department may award grants to nonprofit 
organizations to facilitate program outreach, and it may contract with community development 
financial institutions to administer the program, in consultation with the advisory council created by 
the Financial Empowerment Office in the Department of Law. The program administrator must 
submit a report on the program to the Governor and the legislature each year beginning 
November 1, 2023. 
 
The bill creates the Colorado Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program Fund for the program, 
continuously appropriates the fund to the department, and authorizes the collection of gifts, grants, 
and donations for the program. The department may expend up to four percent of the money 
appropriated to the fund for the direct and indirect costs of administering the program. 
State Revenue 
The bill potentially increases state revenue to the Colorado Household Financial Recovery Pilot 
Program Fund from gifts, grants, or donations; however, no sources have been identified at this time.  
Gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from TABOR revenue limits. 
State Transfers 
The bill requires an appropriation from the General Fund to the Colorado Household Financial 
Recovery Pilot Program Fund of $5.2 million in FY 2022-23 to transfer funding for the program. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of the Treasury by $5.1 million in FY 2022-23 
and $0.1 million in FY 2023-24 from the Colorado Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program Fund.  
Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
   Page 3 
August 8, 2022  HB 22-1359  
 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1359 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of the Treasury   
Personal Services 	$44,143       $44,143        
Operating Expenses 	$810       $810        
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200        -       
Recovery Program Costs
1
 	$5,000,000 	-       
Legal Services 	$59,142 $24,643 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
2
 	$9,971 $9,971        
FTE – Personal Services 	0.6 FTE 0.6 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.3 FTE 0.1 FTE 
Total Cost $5,120,266 $79,566 
Total FTE 0.9 FTE 0.7 FTE 
1
 Funds are continuously appropriated to the Department of the Treasury and costs for the recovery 
program may be spent over multiple years. 
2
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Department of the Treasury. Workload will increase to oversee the program, select one or more 
contracted administrators, establish program policies, and create the annual report.  This workload is 
estimated to require 0.6 FTE beginning in FY 2022-23; costs in the first year assume a July 1, 2022 start 
date. Additional recovery program costs include the contract with an administrator, awarding 
outreach grants to nonprofit organizations, establishing the loan loss reserve, making payments to 
lenders, or issuing loans.  The split between these costs will be determined by the department. 
 
Legal services.  The Department of the Treasury will require 600 hours of legal services in FY 2022-23 
and 250 hours in subsequent years to provide general counsel on program development and support 
with contracting. Legal services are provided by the Department of Law at a rate of $98.57 per hour. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amount in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes.  Page 4 
August 8, 2022  HB 22-1359  
 
 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on June 3, 2022. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill includes an appropriation of $5,200,000 from the General Fund to the Colorado 
Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program Fund, which is continuously appropriated to the 
Department of the Treasury.  The Department of Treasury also requires 0.6 FTE in FY 2022-23.   
 
In addition, the bill requires and includes a reappropriation in FY 2022-23 of $59,142 from the 
Colorado Household Financial Recovery Pilot Program Fund to the Department of Law, and 0.3 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Governor Information Technology Law  
Legislative Council Staff Personnel Treasury 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.