Second Regular Session Seventy-third General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the Second House LLS NO. 22-0954.01 Conrad Imel x2313 HOUSE BILL 22-1400 House Committees Senate Committees Finance Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING MA TTERS RELATED TO A PR OCEDURAL REQUIREMENT101 FOR STATE ENTERPRISES.102 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) Under existing law, an institution of higher education (institution) or a group of institutions that is managed by a single governing board and any auxiliary facility or group of auxiliary facilities with similar functions that is managed by the governing body of an institution or by the board of directors of the Auraria higher education center (AHEC) may be designated as an enterprise by the institution's or facility's governing SENATE Amended 2nd Reading May 9, 2022 HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended May 2, 2022 HOUSE 2nd Reading Unamended April 29, 2022 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP McCluskie and Tipper, Duran, Esgar, Garnett, Kennedy, Kipp, Lindsay, Titone, Weissman, Woodrow SENATE SPONSORSHIP Moreno, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. body. A number of auxiliary facilities are designated as enterprises in existing law. The bill permits an institution or an auxiliary facility that was designated as an enterprise as of January 1, 2021, and that subsequently disqualifies as an enterprise, to qualify and be redesignated as an enterprise without voter approval. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. Legislative declaration. (1) The general assembly2 finds and declares that:3 (a) Colorado's colleges and universities have been permitted to be4 designated as enterprises since 2004, and being designated as an5 enterprise gives those institutions flexibility to enhance educational6 opportunities for low-income and other under-represented students, as7 well as increase overall educational excellence;8 (b) In order to maintain enterprise status, a college or university9 must not receive more than ten percent of its total annual revenues in10 grants from all Colorado state and local governments combined;11 (c) The general assembly supports colleges and universities by12 funding capital construction projects, other large-scale projects, and13 various other programs, and the amount of that funding contributes to14 some institutions, most commonly smaller institutions that serve students15 from rural areas, occasionally temporarily losing enterprise status and16 later requalifying and being redesignated as enterprises;17 (d) Small higher education institutions have often temporarily lost18 their enterprise status in the past as a result of state capital grants;19 (e) A college or university losing enterprise status for one year20 does not have significant implications for the institutions or the state, but21 an institution losing its enterprise status for longer than one year may22 1400-2- effect the state because of the impact it has on calculating state revenue1 limits;2 (f) The recent increase in available federal funds related to the3 COVID-19 pandemic may result in the state having additional state4 money available to allocate to colleges and universities. Because more5 state money is available, the general assembly may want to appropriate6 additional state money to colleges and universities for capital construction7 and other infrastructure upgrades, which may result in institutions,8 including community colleges and some four-year institutions,9 temporarily losing enterprise status only to requalify for enterprise status10 at a later date after the funds are no longer available.11 (g) Because of the number of colleges and universities in12 Colorado and the frequency with which institutions may temporarily lose13 enterprise status only to later requalify as an enterprise, requiring a14 statewide ballot question for each institution to be redesignated as an15 enterprise each time the institution requalifies, will result in frequent and16 costly statewide ballot questions decided by voters who may not live and17 work near the institution whose enterprise status is the subject of the18 ballot question, and may limit the ability of colleges and universities to19 provide the best educational services to Colorado students.20 (2) Therefore, the general assembly determines that it is in the best21 interest of Colorado students and colleges and universities to permit22 institutions that have already qualified for enterprise status and that lose23 enterprise status to later qualify and be redesignated as an enterprise24 without voter approval in a manner does not limit the voters' authority to25 approve new educational enterprises.26 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-5-101.5, add (7)27 1400 -3- as follows:1 23-5-101.5. Enterprise status of auxiliary facilities -2 definitions. (7) NOTWITHSTANDING SECTION 24-77-108, AN AUXILIARY3 FACILITY, OR GROUP OF AUXILIARY FACILITIES WITH SIMILAR FUNCTIONS ,4 THAT IS MANAGED BY THE GOVERNING BODY OF AN INSTITUTION OF5 HIGHER EDUCATION OR BY THE BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE AURARIA6 HIGHER EDUCATION CENTER , THAT WAS DESIGNATED AS AN ENTERPRISE7 AS OF JANUARY 1, 2021, AND THAT SUBSEQUENTLY DISQUALIFIES AS AN8 ENTERPRISE, DOES NOT REQUIRE VOTER APPROVAL IN ORDER TO QUALIFY9 AND BE REDESIGNATED AS AN ENTERPRISE .10 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-5-101.7, add (6)11 as follows:12 23-5-101.7. Enterprise status of institutions of higher13 education. (6) N OTWITHSTANDING SECTION 24-77-108, AN INSTITUTION14 OF HIGHER EDUCATION , OR A GROUP OF INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER15 EDUCATION THAT IS MANAGED BY A SINGLE GOVERNING BOARD , THAT WAS16 DESIGNATED AS AN ENTERPRISE AS OF JANUARY 1, 2021, AND THAT17 SUBSEQUENTLY DISQUALIFIES AS AN ENTERPRISE , DOES NOT REQUIRE18 VOTER APPROVAL IN ORDER TO QUALIFY AND BE REDESI GNATED AS AN19 ENTERPRISE.20 SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-77-108, amend 21 (1); and add (3) as follows:22 24-77-108. Creation of a new fee-based Enterprise. In order to23 provide transparency and oversight to government mandated fees the24 People of the State of Colorado find and declare that:25 (1) A STATE ENTERPRISE QUALIFIED OR CREATED after January 1, 26 2021, any state enterprise qualified or created, as defined under Colo.27 1400 -4- Const. Art. X, section 20(2)(d), with projected or actual revenue from1 fees and surcharges of over SHALL NOT RECEIVE MORE THAN2 $100,000,000 total IN REVENUE FROM FEES AND SURCHARGES in its first3 five fiscal years must be UNLESS approved at a statewide general election.4 I F A STATE ENTERPRISE HAS COLLECTED ONE HUNDRED MILLION DOLLARS 5 ($100,000,000) IN FEES AND SURCHARGES WITHIN ITS FIRST FIVE FISCAL 6 YEARS PRIOR TO RECEIVING VOTER APPROVAL , THE STATE ENTERPRISE7 SHALL STOP COLLECTING FEES AND SURCHARGES . Ballot titles for8 enterprises shall begin, "SHALL AN ENTERPRISE BE CREATED TO9 COLLECT REVENUE TOTALING (full dollar collection for first five10 fiscal years) IN ITS FIRST FIVE YEARS...?"11 (3) F OR THE PURPOSES OF APPLYING THE REQUIREMENTS OF 12 SUBSECTIONS (1) AND (2) OF THIS SECTION:13 (a) E NTERPRISES SERVE PRIMARILY THE SAME PURPOSE WHEN 14 THEY PROVIDE THE SAME SERVICES IN THE SAME GEOGRAPHIC AREA ; AND15 (b) T HE FIRST FIVE FISCAL YEARS OF A STATE ENTERPRISE FOR THE 16 PURPOSE OF CALCULATING THE ONE HUNDRED MILLION DOLLAR AMOUNT17 SET FORTH IN SUBSECTION (1) ARE THE FIRST FIVE STATE FISCAL YEARS18 SINCE THE CREATION OR FIRST QUALIFICATION OF THE ENTERPRISE .19 SECTION 5. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,20 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate21 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.22 1400 -5-