Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1408 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/27/2022

                    Page 1 
April 27, 2022   HB 22-1408  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-1026  
Rep. Herod 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 27, 2022  
House Business  
Louis Pino | 303-866-3556 
louis.pino@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: MODIFY PERFORMANCE -BASED INCENTIVE FOR FILM PRODUC TION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Film Incentive Task Force and allows the executive director of the 
Office of Economic Development to approve incentives exceeding the current limit for 
qualified production companies.  The bill makes a one-time fund transfer, and it will 
increase state expenditures in FY 2022-23 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires appropriations of $2,002,131 to multiple state 
agencies.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1408 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$2,131     	-     
Cash Funds $2,000,000  
Centrally Appropriated 	$189 	-       
Total Expenditures $2,002,320 	-       
Transfers 	General Fund ($2,000,000)     	-     
 	Cash Funds $2,000,000 	- 
 	Net Transfer 	$0 	- 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$320     	-     
 
 
    Page 2 
April 27, 2022   HB 22-1408  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Film Incentive Task Force to conduct a study and prepare a report with 
recommendations on how to make the performance-based incentive for film production in Colorado 
more effective. The task force will include two members from the House of Representatives, 
two members from the Senate, one representative of the Motion Picture Association, one 
representative of the film and television production sector, and the Director of the Office of Film, 
Television, and Media within the Colorado Office of Economic Development.  The four legislative 
members are entitled to per diem compensation, while the non-legislative representatives serve 
without compensation. The task force is required to submit its report to the legislature by no later 
than January 1, 2023. The bill requires the Office of Economic Development to provide staff services 
to the task force. 
 
The bill also allows the Executive Director of the Office of Economic Development to authorize the 
approval or issuance of an incentive in an amount that exceeds the current statutory limit of 20 percent 
of qualifying local expenditures for a production company at the director’s discretion. 
 
Finally, the bill transfers $2.0 million from the General Fund to the Colorado Office of Film, Television, 
and Media Operational Account Cash Fund for use or use in awarding performance-based incentives 
for film production in Colorado and for the loan guarantee program to finance production activities. 
Background 
The Colorado Film, Television, and Media Performance-Based Incentive encourages film production 
in Colorado with a performance-based rebate for up to 20 percent of qualified expenses. To qualify, 
all production companies need to hire at least 50 percent local cast and crew.  Colorado production 
companies need to have at least $100,000 in qualified local expenses, while out-of-state production 
companies need to have at least $1 million in qualified local expenses, except if they are producing 
television commercials and video game productions. Those productions need to have at least $250,000 
in qualified local expenses. 
State Transfers 
The bill transfers $2.0 million from the General Fund to the Colorado Office of Film, Television, and 
Media Operational Account Cash Fund.  The transfer is assumed to occur on July 1, 2022; see Technical 
Note. 
   Page 3 
April 27, 2022   HB 22-1408  
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state cash fund expenditures in the Office of Economic Development by $2,000,000 
and General Fund expenditures in the Legislative Department by $2,320 in FY 2022-23.  Expenditures 
are shown in Table 3 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 22-1408 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Office of Economic Development   
Film Incentives 	$2,000,000 	- 
OEDIT Subtotal 	$2,000,000 	- 
Legislative Department   
Per Diems and Expense Reimbursements  	$2,131       	-       
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$189        -       
Legislative Dept. Subtotal 	$2,320 	- 
Total Cost 	$2,002,320 	- 
Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Office of Economic Development.  In FY 2022-23, office expenditures will increase by $2 million to 
provide film incentives utilizing existing staff and to provide staff services to the task force as required 
by the bill.  This workload can be accomplished within existing appropriations. 
 
Legislative Department. It is assumed that four members of the legislature will participate in four 
meetings of the task force before January 1, 2023, and will not meet after. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  Because legislative per diem is 
accounted for like salary, centrally appropriated costs will increase for supplemental employee 
retirement payments as shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to decrease the amount of General Fund held in reserve by $320 
in FY 2022-23, which will increase the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
 
 
  Page 4 
April 27, 2022   HB 22-1408  
 
Technical Note 
The bill transfers $2.0 million from the General Fund to the Colorado Office of Film, Television, and 
Media Operational Account Cash Fund on July 1, 2023.  It is assumed that this transfer will occur on 
July 1, 2022. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires the following appropriations: 
 
 $2,000,000 from the Colorado Office of Film, Television, and Media Operational Account Cash 
Fund to the Office of Economic Development; and 
 $2,131 from the General Fund to the Legislative Department. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Legislative Council Staff Office of Economic Development 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.