Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1412 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/29/2022

                    Page 1 
April 29, 2022  HB 22-1412  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0314  
Rep. Garnett; Van Winkle 
 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 29, 2022 
House Business 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
Anna.Gerstle@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: SUNSET DIVISION OF GAMING  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill.  This bill continues the Division of Gaming in the Department of Revenue, 
which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2022.  State fiscal impacts include a 
minimal revenue and workload impact from changes to the program under the bill, as 
well as the continuation of the program's current revenue and expenditures. The 
Division of Gaming is continued through 2033, and the regulation of sports betting is 
continued through 2027.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note Status: The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 22-1412
1
 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       	-       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       	-       
 	New FTE 	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	-       	-       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds
2
 	-       $183,507,515       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $20,632,177       
 	Continuing FTE 	-       120.5 FTE       
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund 	-       	-       
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts from changes under the bill and the continuing impacts from extending the program 
beyond its current repeal date. Because the bill continues a program with minor changes, there are no new impacts. 
The continuing program impacts may end if the bill is not passed and the program is allowed to repeal. 
2
 This amount includes gaming and sports betting tax revenue, as well as administrative fees and fines.   Page 2 
April 29, 2022  HB 22-1412  
 
Summary of Legislation 
Under current law, the Division of Gaming (division) in the Department of Revenue (DOR) repeals 
September 1, 2022.  This bill includes the recommendations of the sunset review completed by the 
Department of Regulatory Agencies, which include the following:  
 
 continuing the division until September 1, 2033, and the regulation of sports betting by the 
division until September 1, 2027; 
 
 allowing the Limited Gaming Control Commission, at its discretion, to delegate licensing duties 
to the division;  
 
 lowering the age requirement to work in a casino from 21 years old to 18 years old; 
 
 clarifying that the Fantasy Contests Act uses the DOR’s Hearings Division to conduct hearings for 
violations; 
 
 repeals the requirement that applicants for sports betting licenses whose primary residences are 
located outside of the United States submit to a fingerprint-based criminal history record check, 
unless required to do so by the commission; and 
 
 requires that sports betting winnings be subject to the Gambling Payment Intercept Act.  
Background 
Division of Gaming.  The Limited Gaming Control Commission and the Division of Gaming regulate 
casino gambling in Central City, Black Hawk, and Cripple Creek, and sports betting that occurs in 
licensed casinos and on internet platforms that contract with a licensed casino.  The division also 
regulates fantasy sports contents.  The sunset report completed by the Department of Regulatory 
Agencies can be found here:  
https://drive.google.com/file/d/1CtzowSNOryiR6mHPVI7Vy7HMCH_G4_wA/view 
 
Gambling Payment Intercept Act.  This program requires the Department of Revenue to maintain, or 
contract with a vendor to maintain, a registry of individuals who owe unpaid child support, criminal 
restitution, and/or unpaid debt to the state.  Prior to paying a winner, a licensee must check whether 
the winner is on the registry and if, listed, withhold the amount owed and send it to the DOR or the 
vendor, to be distributed to the applicable state agency.   
Continuing Program Impacts 
Expenditures.  Based on the department's projections for FY 2022-23, the DOR is expected to have 
expenditures of $20.6 million for the Division of Gaming.  If this bill is enacted, current expenditures 
will continue for the program starting in FY 2023-24.  If this bill is not enacted, the program will end 
on September 1, 2023, following a wind-down period, and state expenditures will decrease starting in 
FY 2023 24 by the amounts shown in Table 1.  
  Page 3 
April 29, 2022  HB 22-1412  
 
Revenue.  Based on the department's projections for FY 2022-23, the division is expected to collect 
$183.5 million in revenue, which includes gaming and sports betting tax revenue, fines, and licensing 
and operation fees.  If this bill is enacted, this revenue will continue starting in FY 2023-24.  If the bill 
is not enacted, some portion of the amount in Table 1 would no longer be collected.  Because the 
Colorado Constitution gives authority to the Limited Gaming Control Commission to regulate limited 
gaming, and portions of state law concerning some aspects of gaming are located in other sections of 
statute, this amount cannot be estimated.  This fiscal note will be updated if more information becomes 
available.  Licensing fees and other service revenue is subject to TABOR, while certain tax revenue is 
exempt from TABOR.   
 
The changes to the program that drive additional revenue and costs are discussed in the State Revenue 
and State Expenditures sections below. 
State Revenue 
The bill may increase revenue to the Department of Public Safety by a minimal amount if there is a 
change in the number of criminal history record checks completed.  Additional checks for potential 
employees between the ages of 18 and 21 will increase workload, which may be offset by fewer checks 
completed for internationally based applicants.  The fee for a check is $39.50 per check, of which $28.25 
per check is subject to TABOR.  The revenue impact is expected to be minimal. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload for the Division of Gaming to process additional operator license 
applications from people between the ages of 18 and 21 and make modifications to the Gambling 
Payment Intercept Act.  Some of the increase may be offset by a reduction in workload from collecting 
fingerprints from internationally based applicants.  No new appropriations are required.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect September 1, 2022, assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Personnel  Public Safety  Revenue 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  .