Second Regular Session Seventy-third General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO INTRODUCED LLS NO. R22-0756.01 Ashley Athey x2291 HJR22-1003 House Committees Senate Committees HOUSE JOINT RESOLUTION 22-1003 C ONCERNING THE COMMEMORATION OF THE BIRTHDAY OF THE101 R EVEREND DR. MARTIN LUTHER KING, JR.102 WHEREAS, The Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr., was born1 in Atlanta, Georgia, on January 15, 1929, graduated from Morehouse2 College with a Bachelor of Arts degree in 1948, graduated from Crozer3 Theological Seminary in 1951, and received a Ph.D. from Boston4 University in 1955; and5 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King's faith, resiliency, and commitment to6 justice became known worldwide through his speeches, writings, and7 actions; and8 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King declared that the moral responsibility9 to aid the oppressed did not stop at the edge of his street, town, or state10 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Ricks and Exum, Bacon, Herod, Jodeh SENATE SPONSORSHIP Buckner and Fields, Coleman Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. when he wrote, "I cannot sit idly by in Atlanta and not be concerned about1 what happens in Birmingham. Injustice anywhere is a threat to justice2 everywhere."; and3 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King withstood attacks on his home and4 family, among numerous other threats and setbacks, standing firm in his5 conviction that although the arc of the moral universe is long, it bends6 towards justice; and7 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King led the Montgomery bus boycott, a8 13-month protest beginning in 1955, against the segregated city bus lines;9 and10 WHEREAS, The Montgomery bus boycott led to the integration11 of the Montgomery city bus system and is widely credited as the12 beginning of the civil rights movement in America; and13 WHEREAS, In 1957, Rev. Dr. King was elected president of the14 Southern Christian Leadership Conference, an organization formed to15 provide leadership for the burgeoning civil rights movement; and16 WHEREAS, Between 1957 and 1968, Rev. Dr. King spoke more17 than 2,500 times, wrote 5 books as well as numerous articles, led protests,18 helped register African American voters, was arrested more than 2019 times, was awarded 5 honorary degrees, was named Man of the Year by20 Time magazine, and became the symbolic leader of the African American21 community as well as a world figure; and22 WHEREAS, On August 28, 1963, Rev. Dr. King directed the23 March on Washington, wherein more than 200,000 Americans gathered24 in the name of equality and civil rights and which culminated in Rev. Dr.25 King's historic "I Have a Dream" speech; and26 WHEREAS, The leadership of Rev. Dr. King was instrumental in27 bringing about landmark legislation, such as the "Civil Rights Act of28 1964", which prohibited segregation in public accommodations and29 facilities and banned discrimination based on race, color, or national30 origin, and the "Voting Rights Act of 1965", which eliminated remaining31 legal barriers to voting for disenfranchised African American voters; and32 WHEREAS, In 1964, Rev. Dr. King was awarded the Nobel Peace33 Prize for his tireless and selfless work in the pursuit of justice for African34 HJR22-1003 -2- Americans and other oppressed people in America; and1 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King's 13 years of nonviolent leadership2 ended abruptly and tragically when, on April 4, 1968, he was assassinated3 while standing on the balcony of the Lorraine Motel in Memphis,4 Tennessee; and5 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King's life and work continue to echo in our6 lives as we strive to reach the lofty goal he set when he said, "Let us all7 hope that the dark clouds of racial prejudice will soon pass away and the8 deep fog of misunderstanding will be lifted from our fear-drenched9 communities, and in some not too distant tomorrow the radiant stars of10 love and brotherhood will shine over our great nation with all their11 scintillating beauty."; and12 WHEREAS, The celebration of Martin Luther King, Jr. Day in13 Colorado was championed by Representative Wilma Webb, who14 sponsored the legislation creating the holiday, and on April 4, 1985,15 Colorado Governor Dick Lamm signed the bill into law; and16 WHEREAS, Colorado's enactment of the holiday and the annual17 Marade -- a merging of the words "march" and "parade" -- predated the18 federal holiday designation, and the first celebration in Colorado was on19 January 20, 1986; and20 WHEREAS, Rev. Dr. King's birthday is a federal holiday in the21 United States and a state holiday in the state of Colorado, which is22 celebrated each year on the third Monday in January; and23 WHEREAS, On Monday, January 17, 2022, we celebrate the 36th24 anniversary of Rev. Dr. King's holiday; now, therefore,25 Be It Resolved by the House of Representatives of the Seventy-third26 General Assembly of the State of Colorado, the Senate concurring herein:27 That we, the members of the Colorado General Assembly, hereby28 encourage appropriate observances, ceremonies, and activities to29 commemorate the federal and state legal holiday honoring the Rev. Dr.30 Martin Luther King, Jr., throughout all cities, towns, counties, school31 districts, and local governments within Colorado.32 Be It Further Resolved, That copies of this Joint Resolution be sent33 HJR22-1003 -3- to President Joe Biden, Honorable Governor Jared Polis, the1 Congressional Black Caucus, the National Black Caucus of State2 Legislators, and the members of Colorado's congressional delegation:3 Senators Michael Bennet and John Hickenlooper and Representatives4 Diana DeGette, Joe Neguse, Lauren Boebert, Ken Buck, Doug Lamborn,5 Jason Crow, and Ed Perlmutter.6 HJR22-1003 -4-