Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB001 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/24/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
ENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 22-0684.01 Jerry Barry x4341
SENATE BILL 22-001
Senate Committees House Committees
Local Government
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER STREETS UTILIZING101
DESIGN MANAGEMENT STRATEGIES , AND, IN CONNECTION
102
THEREWITH, MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
The bill creates the crime prevention through safer streets grant
program (grant program) in the department of public safety (DPS). The
bill requires DPS to issue requests for proposals to local governmental
agencies for the agencies to identify areas where crime is prevalent. After
identifying such areas, local governmental agencies can apply to DPS for
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 24, 2022
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Buckner and Hinrichsen, 
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Ricks and Tipper, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. grants for improvements designed to create safer streets.
The bill directs DPS to establish policies and procedures for the
grant program. It also creates an advisory committee to review grant
requests and make recommendations to the executive director of DPS.
The executive director reviews responses to the requests for proposals
and grants and determines which local governmental agencies will
receive money and the amount of each grant.
The bill appropriates $10.3 million to DPS for the grant program.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 24-33.5-117 as2
follows:3
24-33.5-117.  Crime prevention through safer streets grant4
program - created - committee - reports - repeal. (1)  T
HERE IS5
CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT THE CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER6
STREETS GRANT PROGRAM, REFERRED TO IN THIS SECTION AS THE "GRANT7
PROGRAM". THE GRANT PROGRAM ALLOWS THE DEPARTMENT AND LOCAL8
GOVERNMENTS TO EVALUATE AND DESIGN SAFER STREETS AND9
NEIGHBORHOOD MODELS THAT DISCOURAGE CRIME , REVITALIZE10
COMMUNITY IMAGE, AND ESTABLISH PLACE-SPECIFIC CRIME PREVENTION11
STRATEGIES THAT ACCOUNT FOR GEOGRAPHIC , CULTURAL, ECONOMIC,12
AND SOCIAL CHARACTERISTICS OF THE TARGET AREAS . THE DEPARTMENT13
SHALL ADMINISTER THE GRANT PROGRAM PURSUANT TO THIS SECTION .14
T
HE DEPARTMENT SHALL FIRST ISSUE REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS TO LOCAL15
GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES FOR THE AGENCY TO OBTAIN AN ANALYSIS TO16
IDENTIFY AREAS WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT . SUBJECT TO17
AVAILABLE APPROPRIATIONS, THE DEPARTMENT MAY PROVIDE TECHNICAL18
ASSISTANCE TO AGENCIES INTERESTED IN SUBMITTING RESPONSIVE19
PROPOSALS. AFTER AREAS WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT ARE20
IDENTIFIED, LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES MAY SUBMIT A GRANT21
001-2- APPLICATION TO THE DEPARTMENT FOR A GRANT TO PAY FOR1
IMPROVEMENTS DESIGNED TO CREATE SAFER STREETS . A LOCAL2
GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY MAY PARTNER WITH A COMMUNITY -BASED3
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION TO SUBMIT A JOINT APPLICATION TO THE4
DEPARTMENT FOR A GRANT TO PAY FOR IMPROVEMENTS DESIGNED TO5
CREATE SAFER STREETS. SUCH IMPROVEMENTS MAY INCLUDE :6
(a)  B
ETTER LIGHTING;7
(b)  I
MPROVED TRASH COLLECTION ;8
(c)  A
CCESS CONTROL;9
(d)  T
ERRITORIAL REINFORCEMENT ; AND10
(e)  I
MPROVED SPACE MANAGEMENT .11
(2)  T
HE DEPARTMENT SHALL DEVELOP POLICIES AND PROCEDURES :12
(a)  F
OR LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES TO SUBMIT RESPONSES13
TO THE REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS AND GRANT APPLICATIONS ;     
14
(b)  E
NSURING THAT MONEY FROM THE GRANT AWARD IS NOT USED
15
FOR:16
(I)  H
IRING LAW ENFORCEMENT OR CODE ENFORCEMENT
17
PERSONNEL OR PEACE OFFICERS;18
(II)  F
ACIAL RECOGNITION PURPOSES; OR
19
(III)  S
URVEILLANCE PROGRAMS THAT UTILIZE NETWORKS OF
20
SENSORS TO DETECT GUNSHOTS , COMMONLY REFERRED TO AS A21
"S
HOTSPOTTER" PROGRAM;
22
(c)  E
NSURING THAT MONEY FROM THE GRANT AWARD ENHANCES
23
COMMUNITY SAFETY BOTH INSIDE AND OUTSIDE OF URBAN AREAS ; AND24
(d) RELATED TO HOW MONEY IS DISBURSED TO AGENCIES .25
(3)  A
LL GRANT APPLICATIONS MUST ADDRESS :
26
(a)  T
HE TARGET AREA AND CRIME CHALLENGE THE APPLICANT
27
001
-3- HOPES TO ADDRESS;1
(b)  T
HE SPECIFIC PROJECTS THE GRANT WOULD FUND ;
2
(c)  D
ETAILS ON HOW THE APPLICANT HAS COLLABORATED WITH
3
COMMUNITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES IN DEVELOPING THE IMPROVEMENTS4
TO BE FUNDED UNDER THE APPLICATION ; AND5
(d)  D
ETAILS ON HOW THE PLAN WOULD PREVENT THE
6
DISPLACEMENT OF HOMELESS POPULATIONS AND HARM TO COMMUNITIES7
OF COLOR AND VULNERABLE POPULATIONS .8
(4) PRIOR TO SUBMITTING GRANT APPLICATIONS TO THE9
DEPARTMENT, LOCAL GOVERNMENT AGENCIES SHALL SOLICIT FEEDBACK10
AND CONSULT WITH IMPACTED COMMUNITIES , INCLUDING BUT NOT11
LIMITED TO AREA RESIDENTS AND BUSINESS OWNERS ; HOMEOWNERS'12
ASSOCIATIONS; REGISTERED NEIGHBORHOOD ORGANIZATIONS ; AND13
EXPERTS IN ENVIRONMENTAL DESIGN , INCLUDING URBAN AND14
TRANSPORTATION PLANNING PROFESSIONALS AND ARCHITECTS WITH15
RELEVANT EXPERIENCE IN ENVIRONMENTAL DESIGN .16
(5)  THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR SHALL:17
(a)  R
EVIEW RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS TO IDENTIFY18
AREAS AROUND THE STATE
 WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT , SELECT19
LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES TO RECEIVE MONEY TO IDENTIFY SUCH20
AREAS, AND DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF MONEY FOR EACH AGENCY ;21
(b)  A
PPOINT MEMBERS OF THE CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER22
STREETS ADVISORY COMMITTEE ESTABLISHED PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION23
(6)
 OF THIS SECTION; AND24
(c)  A
FTER REVIEWING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE25
COMMITTEE, SELECT GRANT RECIPIENTS FOR SAFER STREETS , AND26
DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF EACH GRANT .27
001
-4- (6) (a)  THERE IS CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT THE CRIME1
PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER STREETS ADVISORY COMMITTEE , REFERRED2
TO IN THIS SECTION AS THE "COMMITTEE". THE COMMITTEE CONSISTS OF3
THE FOLLOWING ELEVEN PERSONS , WHO ARE APPOINTED BY THE4
EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR:5
(I)  T
WO MEMBERS OF LAW ENFORCEMENT ;
6
(II)  T
WO ELECTED LOCAL OFFICIALS , ONE FROM AN URBAN
7
COMMUNITY AND ONE FROM A RURAL COMMUNITY ;8
(III)  A
N EXPERT IN SITUATIONAL CRIME PREVENTION ;
9
(IV)  T
HREE PERSONS FROM ORGANIZATIONS REPRESENTING
10
COMMUNITY INTERESTS;11
(V)  A
N EXPERT WITH A BACKGROUND IN URBAN OR
12
TRANSPORTATION PLANNING ;13
(VI)  A
N ARCHITECT WITH EXPERIENCE IN ENVIRONMENTAL
14
DESIGN; AND15
(VII)  A
N EXPERT IN EQUITY, DIVERSITY, AND INCLUSIVITY IN THE
16
LAW ENFORCEMENT OR PUBLIC SAFETY FIELD .17
(b)  M
EMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE SERVE WIT HOUT COMPENSATION18
AND WITHOUT REIMBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES .19
(c)  T
HE COMMITTEE SHALL REVIEW APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS20
FOR SAFER STREETS AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE EXECUTIVE21
DIRECTOR FOR WHICH GRANTS TO APPROVE AND THE AMOUNT OF EACH22
GRANT. IN MAKING ITS RECOMMENDATIONS , THE COMMITTEE SHALL
23
CONSIDER THE APPLICANT'S PLAN TO PREVENT:24
(I)  T
HE DISPLACEMENT OF HOMELESS POPULATIONS ; AND
25
(II)  H
ARM TO COMMUNITIES OF COLOR AND VULNERABLE
26
POPULATIONS.27
001
-5- (7) THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY SHALL APPROPRIATE TEN MILLION1
THREE HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS IN FISCAL YEAR 2022-23 FROM THE2
GENERAL FUND FOR THE GRANT PROGRAM .3
(8) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 1, 2023, EACH LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL4
AGENCY THAT RECEIVES A GRANT SHALL PROVIDE A FINAL REPORT TO THE5
DEPARTMENT DESCRIBING HOW THE GRANT MONEY WAS UTILIZED AND6
WHAT MEASURABLE OR OBSERVABLE IMPACTS THE USE OF THE GRANT7
MONEY HAD ON REDUCING CRIME . ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, THE8
DEPARTMENT SHALL SUBMIT A SUMMARY OF THE REPORTS TO THE9
JUDICIARY COMMITTEES OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AND SENATE	,10
OR TO ANY SUCCESSOR COMMITTEES .11
(9)  THIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE NOVEMBER 1, 2023.12
SECTION 2. Appropriation. For the 2022-23 state fiscal year,13
$10,300,000 is appropriated to the department of public safety for use by14
the division of criminal justice. This appropriation is from the general15
fund and is based on an assumption that the department will require an16
additional 2.0 FTE. To implement this act, the department may use this17
appropriation for DCJ administrative services.18
SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,19
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate20
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.21
001
-6-