Second Regular Session Seventy-third General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REENGROSSED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the House of Introduction LLS NO. 22-0684.01 Jerry Barry x4341 SENATE BILL 22-001 Senate Committees House Committees Local Government Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER STREETS UTILIZING101 DESIGN MANAGEMENT STRATEGIES , AND, IN CONNECTION 102 THEREWITH, MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill creates the crime prevention through safer streets grant program (grant program) in the department of public safety (DPS). The bill requires DPS to issue requests for proposals to local governmental agencies for the agencies to identify areas where crime is prevalent. After identifying such areas, local governmental agencies can apply to DPS for SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended March 25, 2022 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading March 24, 2022 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Buckner and Hinrichsen, Bridges, Coleman, Danielson, Fenberg, Fields, Ginal, Gonzales, Hansen, Jaquez Lewis, Kolker, Lee, Moreno, Pettersen, Story, Winter, Zenzinger HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Ricks and Tipper, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. grants for improvements designed to create safer streets. The bill directs DPS to establish policies and procedures for the grant program. It also creates an advisory committee to review grant requests and make recommendations to the executive director of DPS. The executive director reviews responses to the requests for proposals and grants and determines which local governmental agencies will receive money and the amount of each grant. The bill appropriates $10.3 million to DPS for the grant program. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 24-33.5-117 as2 follows:3 24-33.5-117. Crime prevention through safer streets grant4 program - created - committee - reports - repeal. (1) T HERE IS5 CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT THE CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER6 STREETS GRANT PROGRAM, REFERRED TO IN THIS SECTION AS THE "GRANT7 PROGRAM". THE GRANT PROGRAM ALLOWS THE DEPARTMENT AND LOCAL8 GOVERNMENTS TO EVALUATE AND DESIGN SAFER STREETS AND9 NEIGHBORHOOD MODELS THAT DISCOURAGE CRIME , REVITALIZE10 COMMUNITY IMAGE, AND ESTABLISH PLACE-SPECIFIC CRIME PREVENTION11 STRATEGIES THAT ACCOUNT FOR GEOGRAPHIC , CULTURAL, ECONOMIC,12 AND SOCIAL CHARACTERISTICS OF THE TARGET AREAS . THE DEPARTMENT13 SHALL ADMINISTER THE GRANT PROGRAM PURSUANT TO THIS SECTION .14 T HE DEPARTMENT SHALL FIRST ISSUE REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS TO LOCAL15 GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES FOR THE AGENCY TO OBTAIN AN ANALYSIS TO16 IDENTIFY AREAS WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT . SUBJECT TO17 AVAILABLE APPROPRIATIONS, THE DEPARTMENT MAY PROVIDE TECHNICAL18 ASSISTANCE TO AGENCIES INTERESTED IN SUBMITTING RESPONSIVE19 PROPOSALS. AFTER AREAS WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT ARE20 IDENTIFIED, LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES MAY SUBMIT A GRANT21 001-2- APPLICATION TO THE DEPARTMENT FOR A GRANT TO PAY FOR1 IMPROVEMENTS DESIGNED TO CREATE SAFER STREETS . A LOCAL2 GOVERNMENTAL AGENCY MAY PARTNER WITH A COMMUNITY -BASED3 NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION TO SUBMIT A JOINT APPLICATION TO THE4 DEPARTMENT FOR A GRANT TO PAY FOR IMPROVEMENTS DESIGNED TO5 CREATE SAFER STREETS. SUCH IMPROVEMENTS MAY INCLUDE :6 (a) B ETTER LIGHTING;7 (b) I MPROVED TRASH COLLECTION ;8 (c) A CCESS CONTROL;9 (d) T ERRITORIAL REINFORCEMENT ; AND10 (e) I MPROVED SPACE MANAGEMENT .11 (2) T HE DEPARTMENT SHALL DEVELOP POLICIES AND PROCEDURES :12 (a) F OR LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES TO SUBMIT RESPONSES13 TO THE REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS AND GRANT APPLICATIONS ; 14 (b) E NSURING THAT MONEY FROM THE GRANT AWARD IS NOT USED 15 FOR:16 (I) H IRING LAW ENFORCEMENT OR CODE ENFORCEMENT 17 PERSONNEL OR PEACE OFFICERS;18 (II) F ACIAL RECOGNITION PURPOSES; OR 19 (III) S URVEILLANCE PROGRAMS THAT UTILIZE NETWORKS OF 20 SENSORS TO DETECT GUNSHOTS , COMMONLY REFERRED TO AS A21 "S HOTSPOTTER" PROGRAM; 22 (c) E NSURING THAT MONEY FROM THE GRANT AWARD ENHANCES 23 COMMUNITY SAFETY BOTH INSIDE AND OUTSIDE OF URBAN AREAS ; AND24 (d) RELATED TO HOW MONEY IS DISBURSED TO AGENCIES .25 (3) A LL GRANT APPLICATIONS MUST ADDRESS : 26 (a) T HE TARGET AREA AND CRIME CHALLENGE THE APPLICANT 27 001 -3- HOPES TO ADDRESS;1 (b) T HE SPECIFIC PROJECTS THE GRANT WOULD FUND ; 2 (c) D ETAILS ON HOW THE APPLICANT HAS COLLABORATED WITH 3 COMMUNITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES IN DEVELOPING THE IMPROVEMENTS4 TO BE FUNDED UNDER THE APPLICATION ; AND5 (d) D ETAILS ON HOW THE PLAN WOULD PREVENT THE 6 DISPLACEMENT OF HOMELESS POPULATIONS AND HARM TO COMMUNITIES7 OF COLOR AND VULNERABLE POPULATIONS .8 (4) PRIOR TO SUBMITTING GRANT APPLICATIONS TO THE9 DEPARTMENT, LOCAL GOVERNMENT AGENCIES SHALL SOLICIT FEEDBACK10 AND CONSULT WITH IMPACTED COMMUNITIES , INCLUDING BUT NOT11 LIMITED TO AREA RESIDENTS AND BUSINESS OWNERS ; HOMEOWNERS'12 ASSOCIATIONS; REGISTERED NEIGHBORHOOD ORGANIZATIONS ; AND13 EXPERTS IN ENVIRONMENTAL DESIGN , INCLUDING URBAN AND14 TRANSPORTATION PLANNING PROFESSIONALS AND ARCHITECTS WITH15 RELEVANT EXPERIENCE IN ENVIRONMENTAL DESIGN .16 (5) THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR SHALL:17 (a) R EVIEW RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PROPOSALS TO IDENTIFY18 AREAS AROUND THE STATE WHERE CRIME IS MORE PREVALENT , SELECT19 LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL AGENCIES TO RECEIVE MONEY TO IDENTIFY SUCH20 AREAS, AND DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF MONEY FOR EACH AGENCY ;21 (b) A PPOINT MEMBERS OF THE CRIME PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER22 STREETS ADVISORY COMMITTEE ESTABLISHED PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION23 (6) OF THIS SECTION; AND24 (c) A FTER REVIEWING THE RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE25 COMMITTEE, SELECT GRANT RECIPIENTS FOR SAFER STREETS , AND26 DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF EACH GRANT .27 001 -4- (6) (a) THERE IS CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT THE CRIME1 PREVENTION THROUGH SAFER STREETS ADVISORY COMMITTEE , REFERRED2 TO IN THIS SECTION AS THE "COMMITTEE". THE COMMITTEE CONSISTS OF3 THE FOLLOWING ELEVEN PERSONS , WHO ARE APPOINTED BY THE4 EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR:5 (I) T WO MEMBERS OF LAW ENFORCEMENT ; 6 (II) T WO ELECTED LOCAL OFFICIALS , ONE FROM AN URBAN 7 COMMUNITY AND ONE FROM A RURAL COMMUNITY ;8 (III) A N EXPERT IN SITUATIONAL CRIME PREVENTION ; 9 (IV) T HREE PERSONS FROM ORGANIZATIONS REPRESENTING 10 COMMUNITY INTERESTS;11 (V) A N EXPERT WITH A BACKGROUND IN URBAN OR 12 TRANSPORTATION PLANNING ;13 (VI) A N ARCHITECT WITH EXPERIENCE IN ENVIRONMENTAL 14 DESIGN; AND15 (VII) A N EXPERT IN EQUITY, DIVERSITY, AND INCLUSIVITY IN THE 16 LAW ENFORCEMENT OR PUBLIC SAFETY FIELD .17 (b) M EMBERS OF THE COMMITTEE SERVE WIT HOUT COMPENSATION18 AND WITHOUT REIMBURSEMENT FOR EXPENSES .19 (c) T HE COMMITTEE SHALL REVIEW APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS20 FOR SAFER STREETS AND MAKE RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE EXECUTIVE21 DIRECTOR FOR WHICH GRANTS TO APPROVE AND THE AMOUNT OF EACH22 GRANT. IN MAKING ITS RECOMMENDATIONS , THE COMMITTEE SHALL 23 CONSIDER THE APPLICANT'S PLAN TO PREVENT:24 (I) T HE DISPLACEMENT OF HOMELESS POPULATIONS ; AND 25 (II) H ARM TO COMMUNITIES OF COLOR AND VULNERABLE 26 POPULATIONS.27 001 -5- (7) THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY SHALL APPROPRIATE TEN MILLION1 THREE HUNDRED THOUSAND DOLLARS IN FISCAL YEAR 2022-23 FROM THE2 GENERAL FUND FOR THE GRANT PROGRAM .3 (8) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 1, 2023, EACH LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL4 AGENCY THAT RECEIVES A GRANT SHALL PROVIDE A FINAL REPORT TO THE5 DEPARTMENT DESCRIBING HOW THE GRANT MONEY WAS UTILIZED AND6 WHAT MEASURABLE OR OBSERVABLE IMPACTS THE USE OF THE GRANT7 MONEY HAD ON REDUCING CRIME . ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2023, THE8 DEPARTMENT SHALL SUBMIT A SUMMARY OF THE REPORTS TO THE9 JUDICIARY COMMITTEES OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AND SENATE ,10 OR TO ANY SUCCESSOR COMMITTEES .11 (9) THIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE NOVEMBER 1, 2023.12 SECTION 2. Appropriation. For the 2022-23 state fiscal year,13 $10,300,000 is appropriated to the department of public safety for use by14 the division of criminal justice. This appropriation is from the general15 fund and is based on an assumption that the department will require an16 additional 2.0 FTE. To implement this act, the department may use this17 appropriation for DCJ administrative services.18 SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,19 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate20 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.21 001 -6-