Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB012 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 06/24/2022

                    Page 1 
June 24, 2022  SB 22-012  
 
 
  Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0431  
Sen. Donovan 
Rep. Hooton  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
June 24, 2022 
Signed into Law 
Clare Pramuk | 303-866-2677 
clare.pramuk@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: VERSIONS OF THE COLORADO CONSTITUTION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the State Archivist to submit a proposal to the State Capitol Building 
Advisory Committee for the creation of a permanent public of the original Colorado 
Constitution in the state capitol building and to provide educational opportunities. The 
bill increases state workload in FY 2022-23 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires the State Archivist in the Department of Personnel and Administration (DPA) to 
submit a proposal to the State Capitol Building Advisory Committee for: 
 
 the creation of a permanent display of the original Colorado Constitution in the state capitol 
building; 
 an online educational exhibition of the Colorado Constitution including all amendments; and 
 opportunities to provide updated physical copies of the Constitution within state offices.  
 
The State Archivist, in partnership with History Colorado, is required to contract with an online 
exhibit design company to determine best practices for the display and online exhibition, and to 
submit the proposal by February 28, 2023.  The State Archivist is authorized to solicit, accept, and 
expend bequests, gifts, grants, and donations to accomplish these requirements. The bill prohibits 
appropriations from the General Fund or any cash fund. 
    Page 2 
June 24, 2022  SB 22-012  
 
 
Background 
The Colorado Constitution is a 40-page manuscript written on machine-made ledger paper and bound 
with a 12-page document that includes the minutes of the State Constitutional Convention. The 
Colorado State Archives in the DPA is the legal custodian of the document. The constitution is 
currently on loan through December 2022, and available for public viewing, at the History Colorado 
Center in Denver.  The room in which the constitution is currently on display has temperature and 
climate controls, protective lighting, additional security, and requires museum archivists to 
periodically turn the pages to ensure the continued preservation of the document. 
 
The Secretary of State and the Colorado General Assembly, currently maintain searchable electronic 
copies of the Colorado Constitution that are available to the public free-of-charge.  The links are:  
https://www.coloradosos.gov/pubs/info_center/laws/COConstitution/ColoradoConstitution.pdf and 
https://leg.colorado.gov/colorado-constitution. 
State Revenue 
The bill may increase state revenue from bequests, gifts, grants, and donations however, no sources 
have been identified at this time.  Bequests, gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from TABOR 
revenue limits. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload for the DPA and History Colorado as explained below.  
 
The State Archivist in the DPA and staff of History Colorado will collaborate on meeting the 
requirements of the bill.  This workload can be accomplished within existing appropriations.  Costs to 
contract with an online exhibit design company, display the Colorado Constitution, and provide 
educational opportunities are assumed to be funded with gifts, grants and donations.   
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 20, 2022, and takes effect August 9, 2022, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts  
History Colorado   Information Technology    Legal Services     
Personnel     State 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.