Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB042 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/04/2022

                    Page 1 
March 4, 2022  SB 22-042  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 27, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0028  
Sen. Coram 
Rep. Esgar; Will  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 4, 2022 
House Agriculture  
Clare Pramuk | 303-866-2677 
clare.pramuk@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: COLORADO STATE FAIR AUTHORITY BOARD MEMBERSHIP  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill restructures the Board of Commissioners of the Colorado State Fair Authority 
but does not change the size or responsibilities of the board. It increases state 
workload in FY 2022-23 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
Senate Bill 22-013, signed into law on February 25, 2022, increased the size of the Board of 
Commissioners of the State Fair Authority from eleven to thirteen members, including the 
Commissioner of Agriculture or the Commissioner’s designee, two residents from the county where 
the state fair is held (Pueblo County), one resident from each of the eight congressional districts, and 
two residents from the state at large.  SB22-013 added an at-large member and a member from the 
new eighth congressional district. Instead of members from each of the eight congressional districts, 
this bill requires two members from each of the four agricultural districts in the state.  
 
On October 31, 2022, the Governor must appoint two members from the state at large.  When a current 
member’s term expires or a vacancy otherwise occurs, the Governor must appoint members according 
to the requirements included in the bill.  The bill also sets requirements for members regarding 
occupation, agricultural experience, residency, and political party affiliation.  The requirements 
included in this bill supersede the requirements in SB22-013. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload for the Office of the Governor to incorporate the new requirements.  This 
can be accomplished within existing appropriations.    Page 2 
March 4, 2022  SB 22-042  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Agriculture      Governor  Information Technology 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.