Second Regular Session Seventy-third General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the Second House LLS NO. 22-0640.01 Brita Darling x2241 SENATE BILL 22-098 Senate Committees House Committees Health & Human Services Health & Insurance Appropriations Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING A TASK FORCE TO EXAMINE THE CREATION OF A101 PROGRAM ALLOWING FOR THE USE OF DONATED UNUSED DRUGS ,102 AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill creates the Colorado drug reuse opportunity program (program). The program allows members of the public, health-care providers, pharmacies, health-care facilities, drug manufacturers, and other entities to donate prescription drugs, excluding controlled substances, and "over-the-counter" medicine (drugs) to be distributed or HOUSE 2nd Reading Unamended May 5, 2022 SENATE 3rd Reading Unamended April 20, 2022 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading April 19, 2022 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Rodriguez, Buckner, Ginal, Gonzales, Liston, Winter HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Roberts and Will, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute. Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. redispensed to Colorado residents with a prescription for such a drug or symptoms treatable with such a drug (eligible patients). Donated drugs are free to eligible patients, although there may be a fee for processing and redispensing the drugs. The bill establishes requirements for: ! Donating unused drugs, receiving and accepting drug donations, and redispensing and administering unused drugs to eligible patients; ! Storing, repackaging, and labeling donated drugs; ! Disposing of donated drugs that cannot be redispensed; and ! Record keeping relating to the donation, receipt, and reuse of the donated drugs. In redispensing the donated drugs, to the extent possible, the program gives priority to eligible patients who are not covered by health insurance or who lack adequate health insurance coverage or whose income falls below a certain income level. The state board of pharmacy shall promulgate rules, including rules for donating and receiving drugs, labeling and repackaging drugs, and redispensing or administering drugs by persons authorized to dispense or administer drugs. With certain exceptions, the bill provides immunity from civil or criminal liability or professional discipline for a manufacturer, donor, or receiver of drugs for activities directly attributable to donating, receiving, redispensing, or administering a drug under the program. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 25-1.5-118 as 2 follows:3 25-1.5-118. Drug repository task force - creation - report -4 definitions - repeal. (1) T HE DRUG REPOSITORY TASK FORCE IS HEREBY 5 CREATED IN THE DEPARTMENT . THE PURPOSE OF THE TASK FORCE IS TO6 EXAMINE DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAMS FOR UNUSED PRESCRIPTION DRUGS7 AND OVER-THE-COUNTER MEDICATIONS IN THE COUNTRY TO DETERMINE8 THE BEST MODEL FOR COLORADO TO IMPLEMENT A SAFE , EFFICIENT, AND9 EFFECTIVE DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM IN THE STATE .10 (2) A S USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE 11 098-2- REQUIRES:1 (a) "M EDICINE" MEANS PRESCRIPTION DRUGS AND 2 OVER-THE-COUNTER MEDICATIONS.3 (b) "T ASK FORCE" MEANS THE DRUG REPOSITORY TASK FORCE 4 CREATED IN THIS SECTION.5 (3) T HE TASK FORCE CONSISTS OF AT LEAST THIRTEEN AND NO 6 MORE THAN FIFTEEN VOTING MEMBERS , AS FOLLOWS:7 (a) S IX MEMBERS APPOINTED BY THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE 8 DEPARTMENT, AS FOLLOWS:9 (I) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING THE DEPARTMENT ; 10 (II) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING PATIENTS ; 11 (III) O NE MEMBER FROM A STATEWIDE ADVOCACY GROUP 12 REPRESENTING CHRONIC HEALTH CONDITIONS ;13 (IV) O NE MEMBER FROM A STATEWIDE ORGANIZATION OF 14 HOSPITALS;15 (V) O NE MEMBER FROM A SAFETY NET HOSPITAL ; AND 16 (VI) O NE MEMBER FROM A STATEWIDE ASSOCIATION OF 17 PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEYS;18 (b) S IX MEMBERS APPOINTED BY THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE 19 DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY AGENCIES , AS FOLLOWS:20 (I) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING THE DEPARTMENT OF 21 REGULATORY AGENCIES;22 (II) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING A STATEWIDE ASSOCIATION OF 23 PHARMACISTS;24 (III) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING A STATEWIDE ASSOCIATION OF 25 COMMUNITY PHARMACIES ;26 (IV) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING PHARMACEUTICAL 27 098 -3- MANUFACTURERS;1 (V) O NE MEMBER REPRESENTING DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAMS ; 2 AND3 (VI) O NE MEMBER WHO IS A PHYSICIAN WITH PRESCRIBING 4 AUTHORITY;5 (c) O NE MEMBER APPOINTED BY THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE 6 DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE POLICY AND FINANCING REPRESENTING THE7 DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE POLICY AND FINANCING ; AND8 (d) U P TO TWO ADDITIONAL MEMBERS APPOINTED BY THE 9 EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT , AS THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR10 DEEMS APPROPRIATE TO CARRY OUT THE TASK FORCE 'S DUTIES.11 (4) T HE APPOINTING AUTHORITIES SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (3) OF 12 THIS SECTION SHALL APPOINT MEMBERS OF THE TASK FORCE NO LATER13 THAN AUGUST 1, 2022. EACH TASK FORCE MEMBER SERVES AT THE14 PLEASURE OF THE APPOINTING AUTHORITY .15 (5) E ACH TASK FORCE MEMBER SERVES WITHOUT COMPENSATION 16 AND IS NOT ENTITLED TO REIMBURSEMENT FOR ANY EXPENSES17 ASSOCIATED WITH SERVING ON THE TASK FORCE .18 (6) T HE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT , OR THE 19 EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR'S DESIGNEE, SHALL CONVENE THE FIRST MEETING OF20 THE TASK FORCE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 15, 2022. THE TASK FORCE21 SHALL MEET AS NECESSARY TO COMPLETE ITS WORK , AS DETERMINED BY22 THE EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR OF THE DEPARTMENT , OR THE EXECUTIVE23 DIRECTOR'S DESIGNEE.24 (7) T HE TASK FORCE SHALL CONSIDER , AT A MINIMUM, THE 25 FOLLOWING ISSUES:26 (a) D RUG REPOSITORIES IN OTHER STATES , INCLUDING ILLINOIS 27 098 -4- AND IOWA, AS POSSIBLE MODELS FOR A COLORADO DRUG REPOSITORY1 PROGRAM;2 (b) T HE DRUG REPOSITORY MODEL THAT WILL BE THE SAFEST , 3 MOST EFFICIENT, AND MOST EFFECTIVE FOR COLORADO;4 (c) T HE MEDICATIONS THAT WILL BE INCLUDED IN THE DRUG 5 REPOSITORY PROGRAM;6 (d) T HE NECESSARY REQUIREMENTS FOR DONATING , RECEIVING, 7 PACKAGING, AND REDISPENSING MEDICINE;8 (e) A NY LEGAL OR REGULATORY BARRIERS TO IMPLEMENTING THE 9 DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM AND HOW TO ELIMINATE THE BARRIERS ;10 (f) T HE FEES OR OTHER COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THE DRUG 11 REPOSITORY PROGRAM;12 (g) W HETHER AND HOW TO PRIORITIZE PATIENT ACCESS TO THE 13 DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM ;14 (h) T HE NECESSARY CHANGES TO EXISTING STATUTE OR RULES IN 15 ORDER TO IMPLEMENT THE DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM ;16 (i) H OW THE DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM WILL INTERACT WITH 17 EXISTING DRUG TAKE-BACK PROGRAMS AND DRUG DEPOSITORY PROGRAMS18 IN COLORADO; AND19 (j) H OW TO MARKET THE DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM TO DONORS , 20 CONSUMERS, MANUFACTURERS, AND PERSONS REDISPENSING MEDICINE .21 (8) T HE TASK FORCE MAY SOLICIT INFORMATION FROM AND 22 CONSULT WITH ADDITIONAL STAKEHOLDERS AS NECESSARY TO DESIGN THE23 DRUG REPOSITORY PROGRAM .24 (9) T HE DEPARTMENT SHALL PROVIDE STAFF SUPPORT TO THE TASK 25 FORCE TO ASSIST THE TASK FORCE IN CARRYING OUT ITS DUTIES .26 (10) N O LATER THAN DECEMBER 15, 2022, THE TASK FORCE SHALL 27 098 -5- SUBMIT ITS REPORT, INCLUDING ITS FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS ON1 ISSUES IDENTIFIED IN SUBSECTION (7) OF THIS SECTION, TO THE GOVERNOR2 AND THE PUBLIC AND BEHAVIORAL HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES3 COMMITTEE AND THE HEALTH AND INSURANCE COMMITTEE OF THE HOUSE4 OF REPRESENTATIVES AND THE HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES COMMITTEE5 OF THE SENATE, OR ANY SUCCESSOR COMMITTEES .6 (11) T HIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023. 7 SECTION 2. Appropriation. For the 2022-23 state fiscal year,8 $47,423 is appropriated to the department of public health and9 environment for use by the center for health and environmental10 information. This appropriation is from the general fund and is based on11 an assumption that the center will require an additional 0.1 FTE. To12 implement this act, the center may use this appropriation for program13 costs.14 SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,15 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate16 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.17 098 -6-