Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB098 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/13/2022

                    Page 1  
April 12, 2022  SB 22-098  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 18, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0640  
Sen. Rodriguez 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 12, 2022 
Senate Appropriations 
Annie Scott | 303-866-5851 
Annie.Scott@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: PROGRAM ALLOWING REDISPENSING OF UNUSED DRUGS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
This bill creates a task force in the Department of Public Health and Environment to 
determine how to implement a safe, efficient, and effective drug repository program.   
The bill increases state expenditures in FY 2022-23 only.    
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $47,423 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment.   
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the Senate Health 
and Human Services Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-098 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$47,423        	-       
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$3,455        	-       
 	Total Expenditures 	$50,878       	-       
 	Total FTE 	0.1 FTE        	-       
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$7,113        	-       
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
   Page 2  
April 12, 2022  SB 22-098  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Drug Repository Task Force in the Department of Public Health and Environment 
(CDPHE) to examine existing drug repository program models, and determine how to implement an 
efficient and effective drug repository program.   
 
The task force consists of up to 15 voting members, as outlined under the bill, including six members 
appointed by the Executive Director of the CDPHE, six members appointed by the Executive Director 
of the Department of Regulatory Agencies (DORA), and one member appointed by the Executive 
Director of the Department of Health Care Policy and Financing (HCPF).  Members must be appointed 
no later than August 1, 2022, and each task force member serves without compensation, or 
reimbursement for expenses. 
 
The task force is required to convene by September 15, 2022, and will meet as necessary to consider 
issues including: 
 
 program models; 
 patient access prioritization; 
 medications to be included in the program, and requirements for donating, receiving, packaging, 
and redispensing medications; 
 fees and costs; 
 legal or regulatory barriers and solutions; and 
 any interaction with existing drug take-back and repository programs.  
 
The task force is required to report findings and recommendations to the Governor and the legislature 
by December 15, 2022.  The task force repeals July 1, 2023.   
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CDPHE by $50,787 in FY 2022-23 from the General Fund.  
Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 22-098 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Public Health and Environment    
Personal Services 	$5,923       -       
Task Force Facilitator Contract 	$9,000  	-       
Clinical Facilities Survey 	$25,000  	-       
Professional Report Writer  	$7,500  	-       
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$3,455        -       
Total Cost $50,878 	- 
Total FTE 0.1 FTE 	- 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation.  Page 3  
April 12, 2022  SB 22-098  
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. The CDPHE requires staff and contractual 
assistance to support the task force in FY 2022-23 only.   
 
 Staff.  In FY 2022-23, the CDPHE requires 0.1 FTE to develop, execute, and monitor the contracts 
for the facilitator, survey services, and report writer; provide assistance to the task force; ensure 
recommendations align with the CDPHE’s legal and privacy protections, and oversee the 
development and submission of the report.  
 
 Task force facilitator.  In FY 2022-23, the CDPHE will hire a professional meeting facilitator to 
facilitate work of the task force.  This fiscal note assumes that the task force will hold at least 
six virtual meetings to create a scope of work, review survey data, and make recommendations.  
For each two-hour meeting, it is assumed that the facilitator will require four hours of preparation 
and four hours to debrief, report out, and follow up as needed, for an estimated cost of $9,000.    
 
 Clinical facilities survey.  In FY 2022-23, the CDPHE will contract with an outside entity to 
develop and implement a survey for clinical settings and prescribers to gather information about 
program participation and implementation.  These costs are estimated at $25,000.    
 
 Reporting. In FY 2022-23 only, the CDPHE will hire a professional report writer to prepare the 
findings and recommendations of the task force.  It is assumed that 50 hours of work will be 
required, estimated at a cost of $7,500.    
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by $7,113 
in FY 2022-23, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $47,423 from the General Fund to the Department 
of Public Health and Environment, and 0.1 FTE.   
State and Local Government Contacts 
Corrections  Information Technology Judicial  
Law  Public Health and Environment Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.