Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB198 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/18/2022

                    Page 1 
July 18, 2022  SB 22-198  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0801  
Sen. Fenberg; Scott 
Rep. Weissman; Will  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 18, 2022 
Signed into Law  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
Josh.Abram@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: ORPHANED OIL & GAS WELLS ENTERPRISE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise in the Department of Natural 
Resources to fund the plugging, reclaiming, and remediation of orphaned oil and gas 
wells by charging mitigation fees to oil and gas operators.  The bill increases state 
revenue and expenditures beginning FY 2022-23, and are ongoing. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required; the Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise Cash Fund, is 
continuously appropriated to the Department of Natural Resources. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-198 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 	Cash Funds $10.4 million     $10.4 million         
Expenditures 	Cash Funds $10.4 million         $10.4 million         
Transfers  	-     	-     
Other Budget Impacts  	-     	-     
 
 
    Page 2 
July 18, 2022  SB 22-198  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise in the Department of Natural Resources 
(DNR) to fund the plugging, reclaiming, and remediation of orphaned wells by charging mitigation 
fees to oil and gas operators.  The bill creates the five member Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise 
Board to administer the enterprise in consultation with the Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation 
Commission (COGCC).  Enterprise board members may receive compensation from the DNR on a 
per diem basis for reasonable expenses. 
 
The enterprise board may adopt procedures for conducting its affairs; purchasing and disposing of 
real and personal property; issuing revenue bonds, hiring staff and employing professional 
consultants and contractors; contracting with other state agencies; and, seeking, accepting, and 
spending gifts, grants, or donations from private or public sources.  
 
By August 1, 2022, April 30, 2023, and April 30 each year thereafter, each operator must pay to the 
enterprise a mitigation fee for each well that has been spud (drilling operations began) but is not yet 
plugged and abandoned.  Mitigation fees due by August 1, 2022, shall be paid in the following 
amounts: 
 
 for operators with production that is equal to or less than a threshold to be determined by rules of 
the COGCC, $125 for each well; and 
 for operators with production that exceeds the threshold determined by COGCC, $225 for each 
well. 
 
Mitigation fees paid after August 1, 2022, may be increased or reduced by the enterprise board based 
on current circumstances and anticipated future expenditures from the fund. 
 
The bill creates the Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise Cash Fund to consist of mitigation fees, 
money received from the issuance of revenue bonds, gifts, grants, or donations, and any other money 
that the General Assembly may appropriate or transfer to the fund.  The total amount of money 
credited to the fund as mitigation fees may not exceed $100 million dollars in the first five fiscal years 
of the enterprise. The cash fund is continuously appropriated for use by the enterprise. 
State Revenue 
The new enterprise is funded with mitigation fees charged to oil and gas operators.  For FY 2022-23 
fee revenue is estimated to be at least $10.4 million, based on the statutory fee amounts, calendar year 
2020 oil and gas production data, the number of active wells, and production thresholds established 
in COGCC rules.  Actual revenue will be determined based on calendar year 2021 production data, 
which is still being finalized by the COGCC.  
 
The bill requires that mitigation fees be collected at the statutory rates by August 1, 2022, and that the 
amount of the mitigation fees thereafter be adjusted by the enterprise board.  Mitigation fees due to 
the enterprise on April 1, 2023 (in FY 2022-23) have not been estimated, but will add to the total 
amount of revenue collected in the first fiscal year.  Beginning in FY 2023-24, actual fee revenue will 
be based on the annual mitigation fees determined by the enterprise board, and based on 2022 oil and 
gas production data.  This fee revenue is exempt from TABOR.  Page 3 
July 18, 2022  SB 22-198  
 
Voter approval of new state enterprises.  Current law requires voter approval for a state enterprise 
with projected or actual revenue from fees and surcharges over $100 million in its first five fiscal years. 
The new enterprise in this bill will begin operating in FY 2022-23.  Through FY 2027-28, the enterprise 
is projected to collect under $100 million in mitigation fees.  While the bill specifies statutory amounts 
for FY 2022-23, actual fee amounts will be set by the enterprise board.  Should fee revenue to the new 
enterprise approach the $100 million threshold, it is assumed that the enterprise board will adjust 
mitigation fees so as not to exceed this amount. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures by $110,023 in FY 2022-23 and $103,823 in FY 2023-24 from the 
Orphaned Wells Mitigation Enterprise Cash Fund for administration of the enterprise.  These costs 
are shown in Table 2 and explained below.  Costs to plug, reclaim, and remediate orphaned oil and 
gas wells are not estimated.  . 
 
Table 2 
Administrative Staff Expenses Under SB 22-198 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Orphaned Well Mitigation Enterprise - DNR   
Personal Services 	$84,834       $84,834       
Operating Expenses 	$1,350      $1,350       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,200      	-       
Employee Supplemental Insurance and Disability $17,639       $17,639       
Total Cost $110,023 $103,823 
Total FTE 1.0 FTE 1.0 FTE 
 
The COGCC will add 1.0 FTE Budget and Policy Analyst III to oversee the enterprise.  This includes 
collecting fee revenue, auditing annual fee submittals, managing the budget, and coordinating the 
procurement of services to plug, reclaim, and remediate orphaned oil and gas wells.  Costs in future 
years will increase to fund services, provide compensation to the enterprise board and to oversee 
expanded enterprise operations.  Standard operating, capital expenditures, and employee benefits are 
included. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 2, 2022.  The bill took effect July 1, 2022. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology   Law   Natural Resources    Personnel 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.