Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB213 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/22/2022

                    Page 1 
April 22, 2022  SB 22-213  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0931  
Sen. Fields; Sonnenberg 
Rep. Valdez A.; Tipper  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 22, 2022 
Senate HHS  
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
Anna.Gerstle@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: CHILD CARE SUPPORT PROGRAMS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill provides funding for a variety of early childhood programs and creates an 
advisory group and training program for family, friend, and neighbor providers. The bill 
increases state expenditures in FY 2022-23 and FY 2023-24.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $99.5 million to the Department 
of Early Childhood. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. Due to time constraints, this analysis is 
preliminary and will be updated following further review and any additional information 
received. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-213 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds $49,500,000  	-       
 	Federal Funds $50,000,000  	- 
 	Total Expenditures $99,500,000       	-       
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts  	-       	-       
 
 
    Page 2 
April 22, 2022  SB 22-213  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill provides funding for a variety of early childhood programs and creates an advisory group 
and training program for family, friend, and neighbor (FFN) providers.  
 
Funding for early childhood programs.  The bill makes the following appropriations to child 
care-related programs, assumed to be located in the Department of Early Childhood (DEC): 
 
 $50.0 million from federal funds for the Child Care Sustainability Grant Program;  
 
 $19.0 million from the Economic Recovery and Relief Cash Fund (ERRCF) for the Emerging And 
Expanding Child Care Grant Program, of which $2.2 million is for early childhood councils; 
 
 $10.0 million from the ERRCF for the Employer-Based Child Care Facility Grant Program, and 
extension of  the program through September 1, 2024;  
 
 $1.0 million from the ERRCF to create and implement family-strengthening grant programs; and 
 
 $15.0 million from the ERRCF for the Early Care Recruitment and Retention Grant and Scholarship 
Program.  Of that amount, $2.0 million must be dedicated for the home visiting workforce, early 
childhood mental health consultants, and early intervention providers, divided between 
non-educator workforce scholarships and loan forgiveness, and workforce pathways. 
 
The appropriations listed above are for FY 2022-23.  ERRCF appropriations must be obligated by 
December 1, 2024, and the CCDF appropriation is available to be spent through FY 2023-24.  
 
Emerging and Expanding Child Care Grant Program.  The bill requires that, to the extent practicable, 
early childhood councils may receive up to 25 percent of an emerging and expanding child care grant 
in advance to administer grant programs and maintain business operations.  It also requires the DEC 
to offer technical assistance to applicants and grant recipients.  
 
FFN advisory group.  The bill creates the FFN advisory group in the DEC to advise the department 
on the needs of FFN providers and make recommendations on regulations, policies, funding and 
procedures that would benefit the community.  The bill specifies the compensation of the group, and 
that members may receive compensation and reimbursement for expenses.  
 
FFN training program. The bill creates the FFN training program in the DEC to support community-
based and non-profit organizations that provide information, training programs, and technical 
assistance accessing state programs to FFN providers.  The DEC must create a website for the FFN 
community to access training, technical assistance, and resources, and must make existing state 
programs available to the FFN community.  Existing state programs include home visitation, early 
intervention, early childhood mental health consultants, workforce recruitment and retention, and 
family resource center services.  
 
The bill provides $4.5 million from the ERRCF to the DEC for the FFN advisory group and training 
program.   Page 3 
April 22, 2022  SB 22-213  
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the DEC by $99.5 million in FY 2022-23 from the ERCCF and 
federal funds. This amount may be spent over two years. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and 
detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB22-213 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Department of Early Childhood   
Child Care Sustainability Grant Program 	$50,000,000  	-       
Emerging & Expanding Child Care Grant Program $19,000,000  	- 
Employer-Based Child Care Facility Grant Program $10,000,000  	- 
Family Strengthening Programs 	$1,000,000  	- 
Early Care Recruitment & Retention Grant Program $15,000,000  	- 
Family, Friend, and Neighbor Program 	$4,500,000  	- 
Total Cost $99,500,000 	- 
   
 Department of Early Childhood. The bill specifies the funding amounts for each program, as shown 
in Table 2, which are assumed to be spent over two years.  The fiscal note assumes that a portion of 
the amounts will be used for administrative expenses, and will be updated if more information 
becomes available on these costs.  
 
 Emerging and Expanding Child Care Grant Program. Of the funding for the Emerging And 
Expanding Child Care Grant Program, up to $2.2 million must be used for early childhood 
councils. The DEC will also incur new workload to provide additional technical assistance.  
 
 Early Care Recruitment and Retention Grant Program. Of the funding for the Early Care 
Recruitment and Retention Grant Program, $2.0 million must be dedicated to home visiting 
workforce, early childhood mental health consultants, and early intervention providers.  That 
amount is further divided between non-educator workforce scholarships and loan forgiveness 
($1.4 million), and workforce pathways ($600,000). 
 
 FFN program costs.  Costs for the FFN program will include staff, per diem and travel for the 
advisory group, meeting and website costs, and grants to community organizations for training 
and informational resources.  Workload may also increase to modify existing programs to make 
them available for the FFN community. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect July 1, 2022. 
  Page 4 
April 22, 2022  SB 22-213  
 
State Appropriations 
In FY 2022-23, the bill requires the following appropriations to the Department of Early Childhood: 
 
 $50,000,000 from federal Child Care Development Funds; and 
 $49,500,000 from the Economic Recovery and Relief Cash Fund.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Human Services 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.