Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB215 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/28/2022

                    Page 1 
April 28, 2022   SB 22-215  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated April 20, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0951  
Sen. Hansen; Zenzinger 
Rep. Herod; McCluskie  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal 
Analyst: 
April 28, 2022  
House Appropriations 
Christina Van Winkle | 303-866-6289 
Christina.VanWinkle@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: INFRASTRUCTURE INVESTMENT & JOBS ACT CASH FUND  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act Cash Fund to be used for 
by state and local governments for non-federal matching funds required to receive 
federal infrastructure funds under the Infrastructure Investment Jobs Act. It increases 
state expenditures beginning in FY 2022-23, and may increase local government 
revenue and expenditures.    
Appropriation 
Summary: 
The bill requires and includes a $60 million appropriation to any principal department 
and the Office of the Governor.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.  This bill was recommended by 
the Joint Budget Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-215 
 
  
Current Year 
FY 2021-22 
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue  	-     	-     	-     
Expenditures
1
 	Cash Funds 	-     $60.0 million 	- 
 	Total Expenditure 	- $60.0 million 	- 
Transfers 	General Fund ($81.5 million)     	-     	-     
 	Cash Funds $81.5 million 	- 	- 
 	Net Transfer 	$0 	- 	- 
Other Budget Impacts  	-     	-     	-     
1
  The bill provides roll-forward spending authority through FY 2026-27. 
 
    Page 2 
April 28, 2022   SB 22-215  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act Cash Fund (fund) to provide non-federal 
matching funds for infrastructure projects allowed under the federal Infrastructure Investment and 
Jobs Act (federal act). The fund is annually appropriated to any principal department and the 
Governor’s Office.  Subject to approval by the Governor, a department may expend money in the fund 
as matching funds for the following infrastructure categories as set forth in the federal act: 
 
 transportation infrastructure projects; 
 water, environmental, and resiliency projects; 
 power, grid, and broadband projects; and 
 any other infrastructure projects explicitly funded and set forth in the federal act.  
 
The Governor’s Office will develop a process for departments to apply for funds and for reviewing 
and approving applications. It will submit a report by October 1, 2022 and each year thereafter to the 
Joint Budget Committee and relevant legislative committees detailing expenditures from the fund.   
 
The bill creates a statutory transfer in FY 2021-22 of $81.5 million from the General Fund to the fund.  
On June 30, 2028, all unexpended money in the fund will be transferred to the General Fund.   
Background 
The Infrastructure Investment Jobs Act (IIJA) includes around 200 programs that impact Colorado.  
Through formula funding, Colorado is expected to receive approximately $3.5 billion from the federal 
government. Colorado may be eligible for additional funding through competitive grants by 
providing non-federal matching funds.  The IIJA legislation specifies that non-federal matching funds 
will be required for at least 40 percent of these programs, but exact matching amounts are not 
specified.   
 
The Office of State Planning and Budgeting estimates the maximum match amount that may be 
required across all programs where non-federal matches are required to be around $971 million.  The 
IIJA funds may be allocated and granted over the next five years, and more information will be 
available on non-federal matching requirements in the coming months.    
State Transfers 
In FY 2021-22, the bill transfers $81.5 million from the General Fund to the Infrastructure Investment 
and Jobs Act Cash Fund.  
State Expenditures 
The bill will affect state agency workload and spending in several ways, as described below. 
 
Administration. Beginning in FY 2022-23, workload will increase in the Governor’s Office to 
administer the cash fund and provide project planning and grant writing support to state agencies.  Page 3 
April 28, 2022   SB 22-215  
 
The office will develop an application process for departments, review and approve applications, 
disburse matching funds for approved projects, and prepare annual reports.  This workload will vary 
based on the number of applicants and level of grant writing and project planning support required 
by the departments. Any additional staffing required will be paid from the cash fund. 
 
Infrastructure funding. Spending from the Infrastructure Investment and Jobs Act Cash Fund will 
increase by up to $60 million from FY 2022-23 through FY 2026-27 to pay for the non-federal portion 
of project funding.  By providing the state share of project funding, additional federal matching funds 
will also be available for projects, which will increase expenditure of federal funds on eligible projects 
conducted by the state.  The timing of spending from the fund will depend on when projects are 
approved, and the amount of federal funds available will depend of the matching rate for specific 
projects. If the remaining $21.5 million in the cash fund is appropriated in future fiscal years, spending 
will increase by the appropriated amount.  
Local Government  
Revenue and expenditures in local governments will increase to the extent matching funding is 
provided from the fund for an infrastructure project that will be conducted by a local government. 
State Appropriation 
The bill requires and includes an appropriation of $60 million from the Infrastructure Investment and 
Jobs Act Cash Fund to a principal department of the state and to the Office of the Governor.  
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Office of State Planning and Budgeting 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.