Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB220 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/28/2022

                    Page 1 
April 28, 2022  SB 22- 220  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated April 26, 2022)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 22-0907  
Sen. Hansen; Rankin 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 28, 2022 
Senate Appropriations 
Marc Carey | 303-866-4102 
marc.carey@state.co.us  
Bill Topic: PROPERTY TAX DEFERRAL PROGRAM  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
This bill relocates administration of the existing state property tax deferral program 
from county governments to the State Treasury, and allows the Treasurer to contract 
with a third party administrator to administer the program.  It increases state 
expenditures and impacts local government expenditures on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $1,725,883 to the 
Department of the Treasury. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. It has been updated to reflect new 
information.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 22-220 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2022-23 
Out Year 
FY 2023-24 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund $1,725,883  $1,773,782  
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$258,882  	$266,067  
    Page 2 
April 28, 2022  SB 22- 220  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Current law includes a property tax deferral program for qualified property owners whose property 
taxes grow above a certain threshold each year.  Through the program, the state makes secured loans 
to taxpayers to pay property taxes on the taxpayer’s homestead. In 2021, the General Assembly 
statutorily required the Governor and State Treasurer to study the program, and potentially 
recommend changes.  This bill implements some of these recommendations. 
 
The bill shifts administrative responsibilities for the program from county treasurers to the State 
Treasurer, and specifies that the State Treasurer may: 
 
 conduct a public education campaign about the program; 
 contract with a third party to administer the program; 
 promulgate rules for program administration. 
 
As part of the revised program, the bill requires: 
 
 taxpayers to file deferral claims with the State Treasurer; 
 the State Treasurer to issue and record the certificate of tax deferral with the appropriate county 
clerk’s office; 
 the county treasurer to refund any overpayment on an account that has been deferred to person 
that paid the taxes; 
 taxpayers to tender repayment of loans to the state treasurer; and 
 the State Treasurer to send updated deferral notices to taxpayers who have previously deferred 
property taxes reflecting that State Treasurer’s new administrative role. 
 
Finally, the bill creates an exception to the requirement that a loan becomes payable for a property 
that becomes uninhabitable and loses its value as a result of natural causes, including fire, explosion, 
flood, tornado, action of the elements, act of war or terror, or other causes beyond the control of the 
property owner. 
Background 
Senate Bill 21-293. Beginning for 2022 property taxes, SB 21-293 expanded the existing property tax 
deferral program by allowing homeowners to apply to apply for a deferral of a portion of their 
property taxes if their property tax liability grows by more than 4.0 percent from the average liability 
over the previous two years.  At least $100 of any property tax increase exceeding 4.0 percent may be 
deferred. Total deferrals across multiple years is limited to $10,000 for the property. To qualify, 
homeowners must apply with their county treasurer by April 1 of the year when tax is due.  That bill 
also required the Governor’s Office and State Treasurer study the deferral program and recommend 
changes to the General Assembly by January 1, 2022. CoreLogic was retained to conduct the required 
study and produce the final report, submitted on December 30, 2021. 
 
   Page 3 
April 28, 2022  SB 22- 220  
 
 
CoreLogic Study Results. The CoreLogic study found the existing property tax deferral program had 
very low utilization and was not scalable.  Only 17 of 64 Colorado counties had homeowners utilizing 
the program. The study recommended centralizing administration at the state level to scale the 
existing program and expand eligibility. State level administration would create operational 
efficiencies and promote participation. 
Assumptions 
This fiscal note assumes the property tax deferral program will be altered according the 
recommendations from the CoreLogic study. Although the State Treasurer will contract with a third 
party administrator, personnel costs are estimated using the State of Colorado 2022 salary schedule. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in Department of the Treasury by $1,725,883 in FY 2022-23 and 
$1,773,782 in FY 2023-24 from the General Fund to contract with a third party administrator to 
administer the expanded program.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 22-220 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 
Dept. of Treasury - Third Party Administrator  
Personal Services (16.0 FTE) 	$788,184  $859,838  
Operating Expenses and Indirect Costs 	$937,699  $913,944  
Total Cost $1,725,883  $1,773,782  
 
Third party administrator costs.  Estimated personnel costs associated with program administration 
include salaries and benefits for a program manager, office manager, ten customer service specialists, 
two property tax specialists and two accountants.  Salaries were estimated using the Colorado State 
Employee 2022 salary schedule, and have been adjusted in the first year to account for the pay date 
shift. The third party administrator will also require standard operating expenditures, $600,000 per 
year to market the program, and about $55,000 in FY 2023-24 and thereafter to develop and operate 
an online portal for program participants. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve beginning in FY 2022-23.  Based 
on this fiscal note, the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the 
amounts in Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
  Page 4 
April 28, 2022  SB 22- 220  
 
 
Local Government 
Participation in property tax deferral.  Centralization of the property tax deferral program is assumed 
to increase participation in the program.  This would increase property tax deferrals and reduce local 
government property tax revenue in current years by the amount that was deferred to future years.  
The amount of the increased deferrals has not been estimated. 
 
County Treasurers. County treasurers will see reduced workload as they will no longer have to 
administer the existing property tax deferral program for seniors and disabled veterans.  However, 
they will have an increase in workload as they will have to work with the third party administrator to 
market the expanded program and include information on taxpayer’s property tax bill. The net 
workload impact for county treasurers is expected to be minimal. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
In FY 2022-23, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation to the Department of the Treasury of 
$1,725,883. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Governor’s Office  State Treasurer  County Treasurers  
Counties County Assessors 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.