Colorado 2023 2023 1st Special Session

Colorado House Bill HB1003 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 11/18/2023

                    Page 1 
November 17, 2023  HB 23B-1003 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note also dated November 17, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23B-0021  
Rep. Snyder 
Sen. Mullica  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
November 17, 2023 
House Second Reading 
Kristine McLaughlin | 303-866-4776 
kristine.mclaughlin@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROPERTY TAX TASK FORCE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a legislative commission on property tax to consider causes of rising 
property taxes and potential solutions. The bill increases state expenditures in 
FY 2023-24. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  The Legislative Department Cash Fund is continuously 
appropriated to the Legislative Department.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Appropriations 
Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23B-1003 
 
  
Current Year 
FY 2023-24 
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue 
 
-    -    -    
Expenditures 	Cash Funds $112,771  - - 
 	Centrally Appropriated $14,933  - - 
 	Total Expenditures $127,704  -  -  
 	Total FTE 0.9 FTE - - 
Transfers  	-    -    -    
Other Budget Impacts  	-  - - 
 
   Page 2 
November 17, 2023  HB 23B-1003 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Commission on Property Tax to identify the causes of increasing property 
taxes, review best practices for short- and long-term property tax relief, and make 
recommendations. The Legislative Council Staff, the Office of Legislative Legal Services, and a 
contracted facilitator must assist the task force. 
 
The bill outlines the membership of the task force including legislators, the property tax 
administrator, and a variety of representatives of local governments. The commission may call 
subpanels to assist in forming recommendations. Legislative members receive compensation 
and reimbursement of expenses. 
 
The task force must meet every week between November 27, 2023, and March 1, 2024, and 
report to Legislative Council by March 1, 2024. Following the report, the task force may disband, 
or extend through December 31, 2024. 
State Expenditures 
For the current FY 2023-24, The bill increases state expenditures in the Legislative Department 
by $127,704. Expenditures are from the Legislative Department Cash Fund.  Expenditures are 
shown in Table 2 and detailed below. This estimate assumes that the commission will disband 
after the first report on March 1, 2024. If the task force chooses to continue past this date 
through December 31, 2024, costs will depend on how frequently they meet. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23B-1003 
 
 
FY 2023-24 
current year 
FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Legislative Department           
Personal Services 	$70,627  	- 	- 
Operating Expenses 	$1,152  	- 	- 
Legislator Per Diem 	$4,028  	- 	- 
Legislator Travel Costs 	$4,464  	- 	- 
Facilitator Contract 	$32,500  	- 	- 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$14,933  	- 	- 
Total $127,704  $0  $0  
Total FTE 0.9 FTE 	- 	- 
1 
Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
  Page 3 
November 17, 2023  HB 23B-1003 
 
 
Legislative Department. The Legislative Council Staff (LCS) and the Office of Legislative Legal 
Services (OLLS) will require staff to support the task force and the General Assembly will incur 
additional costs to facilitate meetings and reimburse members. 
 
 Staff. LCS requires temporary 0.8 FTE, including 0.6 FTE for a research analyst and 0.2 FTE for 
an economist to support the task force. Duties include logistical support, research, 
presentations, and analysis of property tax relief proposals. OLLS requires temporary 0.1 FTE 
for an attorney to support the committee. Standard operating expenses are included.  
 
 Legislator per diem and travel costs. The six legislators on the task force are eligible for 
per diem and travel cost compensation for the six meetings that will occur outside of the 
legislative session. Costs are based on standard per diem and interim committee travel 
reimbursements. 
 
 Facilitator Contract. LCS will contract with the facilitator appointed by the commission. The 
is estimated to cost $2,500 per meeting.   
 
Department of Local Affairs. The Division of Property Taxation in the Department of Local 
Affairs will have increased workload for the property tax administrator to serve on the task force. 
No change in appropriations is required. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Local Government 
The bill increase workload and costs for the local governments that have representatives serving 
on the task force or the subpanels, including representatives from municipalities, special 
districts, county assessors, school boards, and county commissioners. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his 
signature. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties     Legislative Council Staff   Legislative Legal Services  
Local Affairs 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.