Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1013 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/13/2023

                    Page 1 
July 13, 2023  HB 23-1013  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0162  
Rep. Amabile 
Sen. Fields; Rodriguez  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst:  
July 13, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Erin Reynolds | 303-866-4146 
erin.reynolds@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: USE OF RESTRICTIVE PRACTICES IN PRISONS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
This bill modifies how clinical restraints may be used in correctional facilities by 
requiring the Department of Corrections to adhere to National Commission on 
Correctional Health Care standards. It also creates involuntary medication 
committees.  It increases state expenditures beginning in FY 2023-24. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $18,872 to the 
Department of Corrections. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  It was recommended by the Legislative 
Oversight Committee Concerning the Treatment of Persons with Behavioral Health 
Disorders in the Criminal and Juvenile Justice Systems.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1013 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$18,872        	-       
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$2,831        	-       
 
 
 
 
 
    Page 2 
July 13, 2023  HB 23-1013  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
This bill modifies how clinical restraints may be used in correctional facilities by requiring the 
Department of Corrections (DOC) to adhere to National Commission on Correctional Health Care 
(NCCHC) standards, and creates involuntary medication committees, as outlined below.  
 
Clinical restraint use.  By July 1, 2027, the bill requires the Department of Corrections (DOC) to 
implement policies and practices that conform to the minimum standards prescribed by the most 
updated restraint and seclusion standards of the National Commission on Correctional Health Care.   
 
DOC facilities must ensure the use of restraint is documented and maintained in the electronic health 
record of the inmate, following specific guidelines that include, among other requirements, 
documenting who issued, modified, and terminated the order, and an explanation of the clinical basis 
for the use of restraint.   
 
DOC facilities are required to perform an intake evaluation to assess an inmate’s risk of self-harm 
behaviors and initiate appropriate safety planning to address any concerns and attempt to avoid the 
use of clinical restraints, if possible. 
 
Involuntary medication.  The bill prohibits the use of involuntary medication unless certain 
conditions are met.  Each facility is required to convene an involuntary medication committee, and 
may not prescribe involuntary medication to an inmate for a period in excess of 180 days.  The use of 
involuntary medication must be documented in the inmate’s electronic health record. 
 
Reporting.  By January 1, 2024, the DOC must make an annual legislative report on the use of 
restraints and involuntary medication in the preceding calendar year, following criteria outlined in 
the bill. The DOC must also create an implementation plan to meet NCCHC standards and present 
the plan during its SMART Act hearings beginning in 2024 and each year thereafter. 
Background  
DOC accreditation.  The DOC is currently accredited with the American Correctional Association.  It 
is in contract negotiations to become accredited with the NCCHC, with a contract expected by 
July 2023.  As such, the department has budgeted for the modified use of clinical restraints, which 
includes additional staffing at facilities that specialize in inmate health.  For these facilities, additional 
staff include correctional officers to facilitate inmate movement, as well as health professionals, 
nurses, and psychologists to perform assessments, including behavior assessments upon intake.  Also 
included in the budget are soft restraint material its 19 facilities, with an estimated 68 units total, with 
replacement costs estimated for one-third of materials each year. Each DOC facility will train 
21 instructors on the use of soft restraints, who will then train DOC staff on-site.   
 
Restraint event data.  In the past three years, the DOC has averaged 73 four-point restraint events per 
year in five facilities, as shown in Figure 1.  The majority of restraint events occurred at the San Carlos 
Correctional Facility and Colorado Territorial Correctional Facility, and often involved multiple 
restraint events with the same individuals. There are 11 total four-point restraint beds at these 
facilities.  Ambulatory restraint events have largely occurred at the same facilities at a lesser rate.  
  Page 3 
July 13, 2023  HB 23-1013  
 
 
Figure 1 
Restraint Events at DOC Facilities 
 
 
Involuntary medication.  There are currently 90 DOC inmates who are receiving involuntary 
medications, such as mental health medications.   
State Expenditures 
In FY 2023-24 only, the bill increases state General Fund expenditures by $18,872 in the Department 
of Corrections.  The DOC requires four laptops and updates to its offender management system to 
meet the reporting requirements in the bill. 
 
On an ongoing basis, the bill will increase workload in the DOC.  As discussed in the Background 
section, because the DOC is currently seeking NCCHC accreditation, which requires soft restraints to 
be used and that health staff monitor a restrained inmate every 15 minutes, related staffing and 
restraint costs are already accounted for in DOC’s budget.   
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on June 5, 2023. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $18,872 to the DOC. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Corrections  Information Technology Judicial 
Law  Public Defender 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes. 
0
18
71
0
2
0
18
40
5
21
25
35
1	1
C e n t e n n i a l 
C o r r e c t i o n a l 
F a c i l i t y
C o l o r a d o 
T e r r i t o r i a l 
C o r r e c t i o n a l 
F a c i l i t y
S a n C a r l o s 
C o r r e c t i o n a l 
F a c i l i t y
D e n v e r 
W o m e n ' s 
C o r r e c t i o n a l 
F a c i l i t y
D e n v e r 
R e c e p t i o n a n d 
D i a g n o s t i c 
C e n t e r 
2020 incident2021 incident2022 incident