Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1014 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/28/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 23-0108.01 Yelana Love x2295
HOUSE BILL 23-1014
House Committees Senate Committees
Transportation, Housing & Local Government Transportation & Energy
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING YIELDING TO LARG ER VEHICLES IN ROUNDABOUTS	.101
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Transportation Legislation Review Committee. The bill
requires a driver to yield the right-of-way to a driver of a vehicle having
a total length of at least 40 feet or a total width of at least 10 feet (large
vehicle) when driving through a roundabout. The bill also requires that
when 2 drivers of large vehicles approach or drive through a roundabout
at the same time, the driver on the right must yield the right-of-way to the
driver on the left.
A person who fails to yield commits a class A traffic infraction and
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 28, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 27, 2023
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 7, 2023
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 6, 2023
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Boesenecker, Lindsay, Duran, Jodeh, Lindstedt, Michaelson Jenet
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Winter F. and Hinrichsen, Sullivan
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. is subject to a fine of $70 and an $11 surcharge.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 42-4-715 as2
follows:3
42-4-715.  Yielding right-of-way in roundabouts - definitions.4
(1)  AS USED IN THIS SECTION:5
(a) "LARGE VEHICLE" MEANS A TRUCK, BUS, EMERGENCY VEHICLE,6
OR RECREATIONAL VEHICLE THAT GENERALLY HAS A TOTAL LENGTH OF7
MORE THAN THIRTY-FIVE FEET OR A TOTAL WIDTH OF MORE THAN TEN8
FEET.9
(b) "ROUNDABOUT" MEANS A CIRCULAR INTERSECTION OR10
JUNCTION IN WHICH ROAD TRAFFIC FLOWS ALMOST CONTINUOUSLY IN ONE11
DIRECTION AROUND A CENTRAL ISLAND .12
(2) (a)  W
HEN 
ENTERING, EXITING, OR DRIVING IN THE13
CIRCULATORY LANES IN A ROUNDABOUT , A PERSON DRIVING A VEHICLE14
SHALL:15
(I)  Y
IELD THE RIGHT-OF-WAY TO THE DRIVER OF A 
LARGE VEHICLE16
THAT IS ENTERING, EXITING, OR DRIVING IN THE CIRCULATORY LANES IN17
A ROUNDABOUT AT THE SAME TIME OR SO CLOSELY AS TO PRESENT AN18
IMMEDIATE HAZARD; AND19
(II)  S
LOW DOWN OR 
      YIELD TO THE OTHER VEHICLE AS REQUIRED20
BY SUBSECTION (2)(a)(I) OF THIS SECTION.21
(b)  T
HIS SUBSECTION (2) DOES NOT REQUIRE A PERSON WHO IS22	ENTERING, EXITING, OR DRIVING IN THE CIRCULATORY LANES IN A23
ROUNDABOUT TO YIELD THE RIGHT -OF-WAY TO THE DRIVER OF A LARGE24
VEHICLE      THAT IS APPROACHING, BUT HAS NOT YET ENTERED , THE25
1014-2- ROUNDABOUT.1
(c) THIS SUBSECTION (2) DOES NOT REQUIRE A PERSON WHO IS2
DRIVING A VEHICLE THAT IS ENTERING, EXITING, OR DRIVING IN THE3
CIRCULATORY LANES IN A ROUNDABOUT TO YIELD THE RIGHT-OF-WAY TO4
A LARGE VEHICLE THAT IS DRIVING BEHIND THE PERSON 'S VEHICLE AND5
ALLOW THE LARGE VEHICLE TO PASS THE PERSON 'S VEHICLE.6
(3) IF TWO VEHICLES THAT ARE LARGE VEHICLES ENTER , EXIT, OR7
DRIVE IN THE CIRCULATORY LANES IN A ROUNDABOUT AT THE SAME TIME8
OR SO CLOSELY AS TO PRESENT AN IMMEDIATE HAZARD , THE DRIVER ON9
THE RIGHT SHALL YIELD THE RIGHT-OF-WAY TO THE DRIVER ON THE LEFT10
AND SHALL SLOW DOWN OR      YIELD TO THE DRIVER ON THE LEFT.11
(4)  A
 PERSON WHO VIOLATES THIS SECTION COMMITS A CLASS A12
TRAFFIC INFRACTION.13
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 42-4-1701, amend14
(4)(a)(I)(H) as follows:15
42-4-1701.  Traffic offenses and infractions classified -16
penalties - penalty and surcharge schedule - repeal. (4) (a) (I)  Except17
as provided in subsection (5)(c) of this section, every person who is18
convicted of, who admits liability for, or against whom a judgment is19
entered for a violation of this title 42 to which subsection (5)(a) or (5)(b)20
of this section applies shall be fined or penalized and have a surcharge21
levied in accordance with sections 24-4.1-119 (1)(f) and 24-4.2-10422
(1)(b)(I), in accordance with the penalty and surcharge schedule set forth23
in subsections (4)(a)(I)(A) to (4)(a)(I)(S) of this section; or, if no penalty24
or surcharge is specified in the schedule, the penalty for class A and class25
B traffic infractions is fifteen dollars, and the surcharge is four dollars.26
These penalties and surcharges apply whether the defendant27
1014
-3- acknowledges the defendant's guilt or liability in accordance with the1
procedure set forth by subsection (5)(a) of this section, is found guilty by2
a court of competent jurisdiction, or has judgment entered against the3
defendant by a county court magistrate. Penalties and surcharges for4
violating specific sections are as follows:5
Section Violated Penalty Surcharge6
(H)  Rights-of-way violations:7
42-4-701 $ 70.00 $ 10.008
42-4-702    70.00   10.009
42-4-703    70.00   10.0010
42-4-704    70.00   10.0011
42-4-705    70.00   16.0012
42-4-706    70.00   10.0013
42-4-707    70.00   10.0014
42-4-708    35.00   10.0015
42-4-709    70.00   10.0016
42-4-710    70.00   10.0017
42-4-711  100.00   10.0018
42-4-712    70.00   10.0019
42-4-714    70.00   10.0020
42-4-715    70.00   11.0021
SECTION 3. Act subject to petition - effective date -22
applicability. (1)  This act takes effect October 1, 2023; except that, if a23
referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V of the24
state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this act25
within the ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general26
assembly, then the act, item, section, or part will not take effect unless27
1014
-4- approved by the people at the general election to be held in November1
2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the official2
declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.3
(2)  This act applies to offenses committed on or after the4
applicable effective date of this act.5
1014
-5-