Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1025 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/18/2023

                    Page 1 
May 18, 2023 
 
 HB 23-1025  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0624  
Rep. Taggart;  
Michaelson Jenet 
Sen. Rich  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 18, 2023 
Signed into Law  
John Armstrong | 303-866-6289 
john.armstrong@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CHARTER SCHOOL APPLICATION TIMELINES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☒ School District 
 
The bill changes the application period each year for charter schools to submit 
applications to local boards of education and adjusts associated deadlines.  The bill 
will minimally increase workload for the Department of Education and local school 
districts.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill adjusts various deadlines associated with charter school applications filed with a local school 
board on or after January 1, 2025.  Under the bill, the charter school application process each year is 
as follows: 
 
 from November 15 to January 15, school districts may issue requests for proposals for prospective 
charter schools; 
 between February 1 and April 1, charter school applicants must file an application with a local 
school board (under current law, local school boards must set a filing deadline between August 1 
and October 1); 
 by June 30, local school boards must rule on charter school applications in a public hearing; 
 by September 30, or 90 days after a school board approves a charter school application by 
resolution, whichever is later, the contract negotiation between the charter school and school 
board must be concluded.  
 
    Page 2 
May 18, 2023 
 
 HB 23-1025  
 
Schools districts classified as rural or small rural by the Department of Education (CDE) may accept 
charter school applications with the following modifications: 
 
 The dates for submission for a charter school application are contingent on the school district 
having a method to receive applications. Applications for rural districts are accepted between 
June 1 and August 1.  
 Review of the application by the school district accountability committee is not required. 
 The timeline for the local school boards to rule on the application is extended from June 30 to 
October 15. 
 
Further, the bill requires charter schools to use the fiscal and school year of July 1 to June 30 following 
the filing of an application as a planning year prior to serving students.  A local school board and a 
charter school applicant may jointly extend these deadlines, and a local school board may apply for 
waiver or modification of these deadlines from the State Board of Education. 
State Expenditures 
If local school boards and charter schools request a waiver or extension to the deadlines established 
in the bill, the State Board of Education and the Schools of Choice Unit within the CDE will have an 
increase in workload to process these requests.  This workload can be accomplished within existing 
appropriations. 
School Districts 
Local school boards and school districts may have a minimal increase in workload if they choose to 
request a waiver to the deadlines established by the bill.  Workload for school districts may also shift 
within the fiscal year based on the new application schedule.  Overall, these impacts to school districts 
are assumed to be minimal. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on April 25, 2023, and takes effect August 7, 2023, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. It applies to charter school applications filed after 
December 31, 2023. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education  Information Technology 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.