First Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the Second House LLS NO. 23-0144.01 Sarah Lozano x3858 HOUSE BILL 23-1060 House Committees Senate Committees Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING UPDATES TO THE COLORADO STATE FOREST SERVICE101 SEEDLING TREE NURSERY, AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH ,102 MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov/ .) Wildfire Matters Review Committee. The bill requires the Colorado state forest service to make certain upgrades and improvements to its seedling tree nursery in order to expand its capacity and its ability to contribute to reforestation efforts in the state. The general assembly is required to appropriate money to the Colorado state university system for SENATE 2nd Reading Unamended May 3, 2023 HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended April 11, 2023 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading April 10, 2023 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Story, Lynch, Amabile, Bird, Boesenecker, Brown, deGruy Kennedy, Dickson, English, Froelich, Hamrick, Herod, Jodeh, Lieder, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Lukens, Marshall, Martinez, McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Michaelson Jenet, Sirota, Snyder, Soper, Velasco, Weinberg, Young SENATE SPONSORSHIP Cutter, Danielson, Jaquez Lewis Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. the 2023-24 state fiscal year for allocation to the state forest service. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-31-319, amend2 (6) and (8); and add (2.5), (3.5), and (4.5) as follows:3 23-31-319. Forest service seedling tree nursery - necessary4 upgrades and improvements - definition - funding - reports - repeal.5 (2.5) Field upgrades. T O UPGRADE THE FIELDS WHERE THE NURSERY6 GROWS BARE-ROOT TREES AND SHRUBS, THE NURSERY SHALL:7 (a) I NSTALL A NEW PUMP AND PUMP HOUSE ;8 (b) O VERHAUL THE IRRIGATION SYSTEM ; AND9 (c) G RADE AND IMPROVE THE ROADS TO AND WITHIN THE FIELDS .10 (3.5) Seed storage cooler. T O IMPROVE THE CAPACITY, SECURITY,11 AND ENERGY EFFICIENCY OF SEED STORAGE , THE NURSERY SHALL12 PURCHASE A NEW SEED STORAGE COOLER .13 (4.5) Delivery trucks. T O IMPROVE THE TIMELINESS OF14 DELIVERIES AND ELIMINATE THE COST OF RENTING DELIVERY TRUCKS , THE15 NURSERY SHALL PURCHASE TWO REFRIGERATED BOX TRUCKS .16 (6) Appropriation. For the 2022-23 AND 2023-24 state fiscal year17 YEARS, the general assembly shall appropriate money to the Colorado18 state university system for allocation to and expenditure by the Colorado19 state forest service to fund improvements to the nursery, to hire20 professional staff, and to conduct the capacity, expertise, and21 infrastructure analysis as specified in subsection (5) of this section FOR22 THE PURPOSES SPECIFIED IN THIS SECTION. ANY MONEY APPROPRIATED BY23 THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY PURSUANT TO THIS SUBSECTION (6) THAT IS NOT24 EXPENDED BEFORE THE END OF THE FISCAL YEAR FOR WHICH IT IS25 1060-2- APPROPRIATED REMAINS AVAILABLE FOR EXPENDITURE FOR THE SAME1 PURPOSES UNTIL THE CLOSE OF THE 2024-25 STATE FISCAL YEAR.2 (8) Repeal. This section is repealed, effective January 1, 20253 2026.4 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-3.3-103, add (12)5 as follows:6 23-3.3-103. Annual appropriations - repeal. (12) (a) THE7 PROVISIONS OF SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION CONCERNING8 APPROPRIATIONS FOR STUDENT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE UNDER THIS9 ARTICLE 3.3 DO NOT APPLY TO APPROPRIATIONS MADE PURSUANT TO10 SECTION 23-31-319 TO FUND IMPROVEMENTS TO THE COLORADO STATE11 FOREST SERVICE SEEDLING TREE NURSERY .12 (b) THIS SUBSECTION (12) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2026.13 SECTION 3. In Session Laws of Colorado 2022, amend section14 3 of chapter 434 (HB22-1323) as follows:15 Section 3. Appropriation. For the 2022-23 state fiscal year,16 $5,000,000 is appropriated to the department of higher education for use17 by the board of governors of the Colorado state university system. This18 appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the board19 of governors may use this appropriation for the Colorado state forest20 service tree nursery. Any money appropriated in this section not expended21 prior to July 1, 2023, is further appropriated to the board of governors for22 the 2023-24 AND 2024-25 state fiscal year YEARS for the same purpose.23 SECTION 4. Appropriation. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year,24 $5,382,500 is appropriated to the department of higher education for use25 by the board of governors of the Colorado state university system. This26 appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the board27 1060 -3- of governors may use this appropriation for the Colorado state forest1 service tree nursery.2 SECTION 5. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act3 takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the4 ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except5 that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V6 of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this7 act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take8 effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in9 November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the10 official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.11 1060 -4-