Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1069 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/30/2023

                    Page 1 
January 27, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0267  
Rep. McCormick 
Sen. Cutter  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
January 27, 2023 
House Energy & Environment  
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: STUDY BIOCHAR IN PLUGGING OF OIL & GAS WELLS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates an advisory group to study the use of biochar in plugging oil and gas 
wells.  It increases state expenditures in the current FY 2022-23 and FY 2023-24, and 
may increase state revenue and local workload. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For the current FY 2022-23 and FY 2023-24, the bill requires a total appropriation of 
$111,200.  See the State Appropriations section for detail. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1069 
 
  
Current Year 
FY 2022-23 
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     -     -     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds up to $100,000     $11,200 	-     
 	Total Expenditures up to $100,000 $11,200 	-     
Transfers  	-  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts     
 
 
    Page 2 
January 27, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Biochar in Oil and Gas Well Plugging Working Advisory Group in the Colorado 
Oil and Gas Conservation Commission (COGCC).  Biochar is a type of charcoal produced by burning 
organic material in a form that resists decay in order to sequester its carbon content. The advisory 
group consists of representatives of COGCC, other state agencies, the federal government, local 
government, private industry, academia, and environmental advocacy.  Appointments must be made 
by July 1, 2023.  Advisory group members serve without compensation but are eligible for expense 
reimbursement. 
 
The advisory group must research the use of biochar in plugging oil and gas wells, including scientific 
articles and existing federal or state regulations. It may recommend the development of a pilot 
program to further study biochar, identify how such well-plugging may be implemented, and monitor 
emissions from selected oil and gas wells.  COGCC provides administrative support to the advisory 
group, which must submit a draft report on its recommendations to the COGCC by September 1, 2023. 
If the recommendations include implementing a pilot program, the advisory group’s final report must 
be published by December 1, 2023, and presented to the legislature by February 1, 2024. 
State Revenue 
The bill potentially increases state revenue to the Oil and Gas Conservation and Environmental 
Response Fund from gifts, grants, or donations; however, no sources have been identified at this time. 
Gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from TABOR revenue limits. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of Natural Resources by up to $100,000 in the 
current FY 2022-23 and $11,200 in FY 2023-24, paid from the Oil and Gas Conservation and 
Environmental Response Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1069 
 
 	FY 2022-23 FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Natural Resources    
Contractor 	$100,000       -       -       
Travel Reimbursements 	-       $11,200      - 
Total Cost $100,000 $11,200 - 
  
   Page 3 
January 27, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
DNR.  The bill increases workload in the COGCC to administer the advisory group and submit 
recommendations to the legislature. 
 
 Contractor.  COGCC will hire a contractor to facilitate meetings of the advisory group and to 
prepare its final report. Based on the reporting deadlines in the bill and similar reporting 
requirements on COGCC, the contract is estimated to cost up to $100,000.  Because the advisory 
group begins meeting in July 2023, the fiscal note assumes that COGCC must solicit the contract 
before this date, with contract expenditures occurring in both the current FY 2022-23 and 
FY 2023-24. 
 
 Travel reimbursements.  Advisory group members, who serve without compensation, are 
entitled to reimbursement for actual expenses incurred for participating.  The fiscal note assumes 
that the 14-member advisory group will meet four times, with average expenses of $200 per person 
per meeting. 
 
State agencies serving on the advisory group. Workload will increase in state agencies that serve on 
the advisory group.  This workload can be accommodated within existing appropriations. 
Local Government 
Similar to the state, workload will increase for any local government represented on the advisory 
group.  This workload is expected to be minimal. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2022-23, the bill requires an appropriation of $100,000 to the Department of Natural Resources 
from the Oil and Gas Conservation and Environmental Response Fund.  Based on the anticipated 
timeline for the contractor, it is assumed that the DNR will require roll-forward spending authority of 
this appropriation through FY 2023-24. 
 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $11,200 to the Department of Natural Resources 
from the Oil and Gas Conservation and Environmental Response Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Colorado Energy Office Counties Forest Service  
Governor's Office  Information Technology Legislative Council Staff 
Municipalities  Natural Resources  Public Health and Environment 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.