Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1069 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/01/2023

                    Page 1 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
  (replaces the fiscal note dated January 27, 2023) 
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0267  
Rep. McCormick 
Sen. Cutter  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 28, 2023 
House Appropriations  
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: STUDY BIOCHAR IN PLUGGING OF OIL & GAS WELLS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a work group to study the use of biochar in plugging oil and gas wells.  
It increases state expenditures in FY 2023-24, may increase state expenditures in 
FY 2024-25, and may increase state revenue and local workload. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires appropriations totaling $375,740 to the Department 
of Higher Education for Colorado State University and to the Department of Natural 
Resources.   
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Energy 
and Environment Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1069 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$370,140 $175,065 
 
Cash Funds 	$5,600 $5,600 
 	Total Expenditures 	$375,740 $180,665 
 	Total FTE 	3.0 FTE 1.5 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$55,521 $26,260 
 
 
    Page 2 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Biochar in Oil and Gas Well Plugging Working Advisory Group in the Colorado 
Oil and Gas Conservation Commission (COGCC) in the Department of Natural Resources (DNR).  
Biochar is a type of charcoal produced by burning organic material in a form that resists decay in order 
to sequester its carbon content. The work group consists of representatives of COGCC, other state 
agencies, the federal government, local government, private industry, academia, and environmental 
advocacy.  Appointments must be made by July 1, 2023.  Work group members serve without 
compensation but are eligible for expense reimbursement. 
 
The bill directs Colorado State University (CSU) to research the use of biochar in plugging oil and gas 
wells, including studying scientific articles and existing federal or state regulations and conducting 
laboratory research. By June 1, 2024, CSU must submit a final report on its recommendations to the 
work group. If the work group determines that a pilot program to study the use of biochar is 
warranted, CSU must make recommendations regarding the development of a program by December 
15, 2024. Recommendations must include standards for using biochar to plug oil and gas wells, 
selecting study sites, monitoring emissions, comparing data, estimating program costs, and preparing 
a detailed plan for implementation of the program by COGCC.  The bill is repealed September 1, 2025. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures, primarily in Colorado State University by $375,740 in FY 2023-24, 
paid primarily from the General Fund.  State expenditures may increase by $180,665 in FY 2024-25, 
conditional on decisions made by the work group.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed 
below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1069 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Colorado State University   
Personal Services 	$220,390 $110,195 
Laboratory Equipment 	$72,000 $36,000 
Indirect Costs 	$53,690 $26,845 
FTE—Personal Services 	3.0 FTE 1.5 FTE 
CSU Subtotal 	$370,140 $175,065 
Department of Natural Resources   
Travel Reimbursements 	$5,600      $5,600 
DNR Subtotal 	$4,400 $5,600 
Total Cost $375,740 $180,665 
Total FTE 3.0 FTE 1.5 FTE  Page 3 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1069  
 
 
Colorado State University. The bill increases expenditures for CSU to conduct the required research 
of biochar and prepare the required reports for the work group. This requires 3.0 FTE post-doc 
researchers beginning in FY 2023-24. If the work group requests recommendations for a pilot 
program, these positions continue until December 31, 2024.  These positions require laboratory 
equipment to conduct the required research.  Expenditures are paid from the General Fund. 
 
Department of Natural Resources.  Work group members, who serve without compensation, are 
entitled to reimbursement from the COGCC for actual expenses incurred for participating, paid from 
the Colorado Oil and Gas Conservation and Environmental Response Fund.  The fiscal note assumes 
that the 14-member work group will meet four times, with average expenses of $200 per person per 
meeting. 
 
State agencies serving on the work group. Workload will increase in state agencies that serve on the 
work group.  This workload can be accommodated within existing appropriations. 
Local Government 
Similar to the state, workload will increase for any local government represented on the work group.  
This workload is expected to be minimal. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires the following appropriations: 
 
 $370,140 from the General Fund to the Department of Higher Education for use by the Board of 
Governors of the Colorado State University System; and 
 $5,600 from the Oil and Gas Conservation and Environmental Response Fund to the Department 
of Natural Resources. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Colorado Energy Office Counties Forest Service  
Governor's Office  Information Technology Legislative Council Staff 
Municipalities  Natural Resources  Public Health and Environment 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.