Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1108 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/13/2023

                    Page 1 
February 10, 2023  HB 23-1108  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0077  
Rep. Duran; Evans 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 10, 2023 
House Judiciary  
John Armstrong | 303-866-6289 
john.armstrong@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: VICTIM & SURVIVOR TRAINING FOR JUDICIAL PERSONNEL  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a task force to study victim and survivor training for judicial personnel. 
The bill will increase state expenditures in FY 2023-24 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $11,900 to the Department of 
Public Safety. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1108 
 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-       -       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$11,900            -       
Transfers  	-       -       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$1,785        -       
 
 
 
 
 
    Page 2 
February 10, 2023  HB 23-1108  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates a task force within the Division of Criminal Justice to study requirements for judicial 
personnel related to victim and survivor awareness and responsiveness training. The task force 
has seventeen members and must meet between four and ten times between July 1, 2023, 
and October 15, 2023. The task force must submit a report on topics outlined in the bill by 
November 1, 2023.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of Public Safety by $11,900 in FY 2023-24 paid 
from the General Fund. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1108 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Public Safety   
Mileage Reimbursement 	$5,900  	-       
Per-Diem Costs for Task Force Members 	$6,000  	-       
Total Cost $11,900 	- 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
  
Mileage reimbursement.  The fiscal note estimates that four members of the task force will live 
outside the Denver Metropolitan Area and will file mileage reimbursement at a rate of 0.59 cents per 
mile. The fiscal note assumes 10,000 total miles filed for reimbursement for the length of the task force.  
 
Per-diem costs.  The fiscal note estimates that four members of the task force will live outside the 
Denver Metropolitan Area may and will claim per-diem expenses for meals and hotels for 10 meetings 
at $150 per day.  
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
 
  Page 3 
February 10, 2023  HB 23-1108  
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $11,900 from the General Fund to the Department 
of Public Safety.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Judicial  Law  Public Safety  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.