Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1139 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/21/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 23-0753.01 Alison Killen x4350
HOUSE BILL 23-1139
House Committees Senate Committees
Transportation, Housing & Local Government Local Government & Housing
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE MODIFICATION OF THE SALARY CATEGORIZATION OF101
LOCALLY ELECTED OFFICERS IN SPECIFIED COUNTIES .102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
Current law categorizes each county for purposes of establishing
the salaries of elected officials in the county. The statutory salary amounts
are adjusted every 2 years for inflation and take effect for terms
commencing after any change is made. The bill modifies the categories
of 4 counties with the accompanying percentage increase in salary as
follows:
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
March 10, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 9, 2023
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 24, 2023
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 23, 2023
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Martinez, Duran, English, Lukens, Mabrey, Marshall, Mauro, McCluskie, Ortiz, Pugliese,
Ricks, Snyder, Taggart, Velasco
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Simpson, Pelton R.
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. ! Archuleta county changes from category III-B to category
III-A (8% increase);
! Delta county changes from category III-B to category III-A
(8% increase);
! Saguache county changes from category V-B to category
V-A (8% increase); and
! Summit county changes from category II-A to category I-A
(18.5% increase for commissioners, treasurers, assessors,
and clerks; 22.2% increase for surveyors; 23.5% increase
for sheriffs; 65.5% increase for coroners).
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 30-2-102, amend2
(1.5)(a)(I)(A), (1.5)(a)(II), (1.5)(a)(III), (1.5)(a)(IV)(A), (1.5)(a)(V)(A),3
and (1.5)(a)(V)(B) as follows:4
30-2-102.  Categorization of counties for fixing salaries of5
county officers - salary amounts - legislative declaration. (1.5) (a)  For6
the purpose of establishing the salaries of county officers whose terms of7
office begin on or after January 1, 2016:8
(I) (A)  Category I-A counties consist of the counties of Adams,9
Arapahoe, Boulder, Douglas, EAGLE, El Paso, Jefferson, Larimer, Pueblo,10
R
OUTT,
 SUMMIT, and Weld;11
(II) (A)  Category II-A counties consist of the counties of Eagle,12
Garfield, GRAND, AND La Plata; Routt, and Summit;13
(B) CATEGORY II-B COUNTIES CONSIST OF THE COUNTY OF PITKIN;14
(B) (C) Category II-C counties consist of the counties of Fremont15
and Pitkin COUNTY OF FREMONT.16
(III) (A)  Category III-A counties consist of the counties of17
A
RCHULETA, Chaffee, Clear Creek, DELTA, Gunnison, Moffat,18
M
ONTEZUMA,
 Montrose, Morgan, OURAY, Park, Rio Blanco, San Miguel,19
and Teller;20
1139-2- (B)  Category III-B counties consist of the counties of Alamosa,1
Archuleta, Delta, Gilpin, Grand, and Logan;2
(C) Category III-C counties consist of the county COUNTIES of3
LAS ANIMAS AND Otero;4
(D)  Category III-D counties consist of the counties of Las Animas5
and Montezuma.6
(IV) (A) Category IV-A counties consist of the counties of Custer,7
Elbert, Ouray, and Prowers;8
(V) (A)  Category V-A counties consist of the counties of Baca,9
Conejos, Costilla, Lincoln, Mineral, Phillips, S
AGUACHE, and San Juan;10
(B)  Category V-B counties consist of the counties of Crowley 
AND11
Hinsdale; and Saguache;
12
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act13
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the14
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except15
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V16
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this17
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take18
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in19
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the20
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.21
1139
-3-