Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1161 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/28/2023

                    Page 1 
July 28, 2023  HB 23-1161  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0016  
Rep. Kipp; Willford 
Sen. Cutter; Winter F. 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 28, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Kristine McLaughlin | 303-866-4776 
kristine.mclaughlin@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: ENVIRONMENTAL STANDARDS FOR APPLIANCES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill sets environmental standards on certain appliances and requires the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment to verify compliance.  The bill increases 
state expenditures and may increase state revenue on an ongoing basis starting in 
FY 2023-24. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $49,730 to the 
Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1161 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$49,730  $23,291  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$1,648  	$5,487  
 
Total Expenditures 	$51,378  $28,778  
 	Total FTE 	0.3 FTE 0.3 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$7,460  	$3,494  
 
 
    Page 2 
July 28, 2023  HB 23-1161  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill expands the list of appliances subject to statutory Water and Energy Efficiency Standards.  It 
requires the Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE) to update the list in 
accordance with the standards that exist in at least three other states or are published by the Energy 
Star Program or the WaterSense Program and promulgate other rules as necessary every five years 
beginning January 1, 2026.  CDPHE must allow a one-year compliance grace period. 
 
The bill phases in prohibitions on the manufacture, distribution, or sale of certain fluorescent lights 
and heating appliances.  Manufacturers of heating appliances are subject to disclosure and testing 
requirements.  The Air Quality Control Commission in CDPHE is required to lower the emission 
limits for new water heaters, boilers, and certain furnaces by 2029. 
 
The bill requires CDPHE to verify compliance, report findings to the General Assembly, and deliver 
any violation findings to the Attorney General.  
State Revenue 
Civil penalties.  The bill imposes a civil penalty of not more than $2,000 for each transaction or online 
for-sale product listing to any person who sells or offers to sell any new consumer product that is 
subject to the efficiency standards.  The bill requires CDPHE to inspect products for compliance and 
submit findings to the Attorney General, which may result in an increase in caseload and revenue 
from penalties. This revenue is classified as a damage award and not subject to TABOR.  Given the 
uncertainty about the number of cases that may be pursued by the Attorney General and district 
attorneys, as well as the wide range in potential penalty amounts, the fiscal note cannot estimate the 
potential impact of these civil penalties. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment by 
approximately $51,000 in FY 2023-24 and $29,000 in FY 2024-25, paid from the General Fund.  
Additionally, the bill increases workload in the Department of Law. Expenditures are shown in 
Table 2 and detailed below. 
   Page 3 
July 28, 2023  HB 23-1161  
 
 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1161 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Public Health and Environment   
Personal Services 	$5,848  $23,291  
Legal Services 	$43,882  	-     
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$1,648  $5,487  
FTE – Personal Services 	0.1 FTE 0.3 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.2 FTE 	-     
Total Cost $51,378  $28,778  
Total FTE 0.3 FTE 0.3 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Colorado Department of Public Health and Environment. CDPHE will have staffing and legal costs 
to implement the bill. 
 
 Staffing.  CDPHE requires 0.1 FTE in FY 2023-24 and 0.3 FTE in FY 2024-25 to conduct regular 
research around environmental standards and promulgate rules as result of the findings. 
First-year costs are prorated to account for the General Fund pay date shift and the bill’s effective 
date.   
 
 Legal services.  CDPHE will require 415 hours (0.2 FTE) in FY 2023-24 only of legal services to 
support rulemaking.  Legal services are provided by the Department of Law at a rate of $105.74 
per hour. 
 
 Rulemaking.  The fiscal note assumes that CDPHE is not required to go through its usual 
stakeholder engagement process but can instead rely on research of work done in other states and 
at the federal level. 
 
Department of Law.  The bill minimally increases workload to the extent that violations are 
discovered through the verification process.  The department will review violations under the bill and 
prioritize investigations as necessary within available resources. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 1, 2023, and takes effect August 7, 2023, assuming 
no referendum petition is filed.  Page 4 
July 28, 2023  HB 23-1161  
 
 
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $49,730 to the Colorado 
Department of Public Health and Environment and 0.1 FTE. Of this amount, $43,882 is reappropriated 
to the Department of Law with 0.2 FTE. 
Departmental Difference 
CDPHE estimates the bill requires an additional $23,000 in FY 2023-24 only, paid from the General 
Fund, assuming that the rulemaking requirements in the bill will trigger a formal rulemaking process. 
As discussed in the State Expenditures section, the fiscal note uses different assumptions about 
rulemaking. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law  Public Health and Environment         Regulatory Agencies 
Secretary of State Information Technology 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.