First Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO ENGROSSED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the House of Introduction LLS NO. 23-0759.01 Alana Rosen x2606 HOUSE BILL 23-1168 House Committees Senate Committees Education Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING LEGAL REPRESENTATION IN DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT101 HEARINGS FOR THE PARENTS OF A STUDENT WHO MAY BE102 ELIGIBLE FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION SERVICES, AND, IN103 CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .104 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov.) Current law entitles a parent, guardian, or legal custodian of, or entity with educational decision-making authority for, a student with a disability, or a student who may be eligible for special education services HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading March 11, 2023 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Sharbini and Joseph, SENATE SPONSORSHIP Winter F., Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. (parent), to file a state complaint in the event of a dispute with an administrative unit or a state-operated program (education provider). If the parent prevails in a state complaint decision, the education provider may file a due process complaint against the parent regarding the issues disputed in the state complaint. The bill requires the department of education (department) to create and maintain a list of attorneys qualified to represent a parent in a due process complaint hearing filed by an education provider concerning issues disputed in the state complaint in which the parent prevailed. The department shall appoint an attorney to defend a parent against due process complaints filed by an education provider. The parent may waive the appointment of the attorney. The bill requires the department to include information on attorney appointments in the procedural safeguard notice and in materials distributed to parents describing due process complaint procedures. The bill creates a fund to pay attorneys defending parents against due process complaints filed by an education provider. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 22-1-140 as2 follows:3 22-1-140. Legal representation - due process complaints -4 appointments - report - definitions - repeal. (1) A S USED IN THIS5 SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT OTHERWISE REQUIRES :6 (a) "A DMINISTRATIVE UNIT" HAS THE SAME MEANING SET FORTH7 IN SECTION 22-20-103.8 (b) "COLORADO NONPROFIT LEGAL ORGANIZATION" OR9 "NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION" MEANS A COLORADO NONPROFIT LEGAL10 ORGANIZATION THAT FOCUSES ON SPECIAL EDUCATION LAW , PROVIDES11 AFFORDABLE LEGAL SERVICES, AND OPERATES PURSUANT TO SECTION 50112 (c)(3) OF THE FEDERAL "INTERNAL REVENUE CODE OF 1986", 26 U.S.C.13 SEC. 501, AS AMENDED.14 (c) "DEPARTMENT" MEANS THE DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION15 CREATED IN SECTION 24-1-115.16 1168-2- 1 (d) "P ARENT" MEANS A PARENT, GUARDIAN, OR LEGAL CUSTODIAN2 OF, OR ENTITY WITH EDUCATIONAL DECISION-MAKING AUTHORITY FOR, A3 STUDENT WITH A DISABILITY OR A STUDENT WHO MAY BE ELIGIBLE FOR4 SPECIAL EDUCATION SERVICES.5 (e) "P ROCEDURAL SAFEGUARD NOTICE " MEANS THE REQUIRED6 NOTICE PROVIDED TO PARENTS CONTAINING AN EXPLANATION OF THE7 AVAILABLE PROCEDURAL SAFEGUARDS PURSUANT TO THE FEDERAL8 "I NDIVIDUALS WITH DISABILITIES EDUCATION ACT", 20 U.S.C. SEC. 14009 ET SEQ., AS AMENDED, AND FEDERAL DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION10 REGULATIONS.11 (f) "S TATE-OPERATED PROGRAM " HAS THE SAME MEANING SET12 FORTH IN SECTION 22-20-103.13 (g) "S TUDENT WITH DISABILITIES" HAS THE SAME MEANING AS14 " CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES" SET FORTH IN SECTION 22-20-103.15 (2) ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 1, 2023, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL16 ENTER INTO A SERVICE AGREEMENT WITH A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION TO17 CREATE AND MAINTAIN A LIST OF ATTORNEYS QUALIFIED TO REPRESENT18 A PARENT IN A DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT FILED BY AN ADMINISTRATIVE19 UNIT OR STATE-OPERATED PROGRAM PURSUANT TO SECTION 22-20-108 (3)20 CONCERNING ISSUES DISPUTED IN A STATE COMPLAINT IN WHICH THE21 PARENT PREVAILED. THE SERVICE AGREEMENT IS FOR FIVE YEARS. THE22 NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION SHALL CONSIDER AN ATTORNEY TO BE23 QUALIFIED IF THE ATTORNEY DEMONSTRATES A HISTORY OF PRACTICE IN24 SPECIAL EDUCATION LAW. THE NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION SHALL UPDATE25 THE LIST ON AN ANNUAL BASIS.26 (3) A PARENT DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION (2) OF THIS SECTION MAY27 1168 -3- CONTACT THE NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION FOR AN ATTORNEY1 APPOINTMENT. THE NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION SHALL APPOINT AN2 ATTORNEY FROM THE LIST OF ATTORNEYS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION (2)3 OF THIS SECTION TO REPRESENT THE PARENT IN A DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT4 THAT AN ADMINISTRATIVE UNIT OR A STATE-OPERATED PROGRAM FILES5 PURSUANT TO SECTION 22-20-108 (3) CONCERNING ISSUES DISPUTED IN A6 STATE COMPLAINT IN WHICH THE PARENT PREVAILED. THE NONPROFIT7 ORGANIZATION SHALL ROTATE THE ATTORNEYS ON THE LIST TO8 DISTRIBUTE DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT CASES EVENLY AMONG THE9 ATTORNEYS ON THE LIST.10 (4) (a) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ANNUALLY PROVIDE THE11 NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION TWENTY THOUSAND DOLLARS TO PAY12 ATTORNEYS APPOINTED PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS SECTION13 AND TO CREATE, MAINTAIN, AND ADMINISTER THE LIST OF ATTORNEYS14 PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (2) OF THIS SECTION. THE NONPROFIT15 ORGANIZATION MAY RETAIN UNSPENT MONEY AT THE END OF A BUDGET16 YEAR.17 (b) IF THERE IS ANY UNSPENT MONEY AT THE END OF THE18 FIVE-YEAR SERVICE AGREEMENT, THE NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION SHALL19 RETURN THE UNSPENT MONEY TO THE DEPARTMENT . THE DEPARTMENT20 SHALL TRANSMIT ALL MONEY RECEIVED FROM THE NONPROFIT21 ORGANIZATION TO THE STATE TREASURER, WHO SHALL CREDIT THE MONEY22 TO THE GENERAL FUND.23 (5) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL INCLUDE INFORMATION REGARDING24 THE APPOINTMENT OF ATTORNEYS DESCRIBED IN SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS25 SECTION IN THE PROCEDURAL SAFEGUARD NOTICE , IN MATERIALS26 DISTRIBUTED TO PARENTS DESCRIBING DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT27 1168 -4- PROCEDURES, AND FOLLOWING A DECISION THE DEPARTMENT RENDERS1 CONCERNING A DISPUTE PURSUANT TO SECTION 22-20-108 (3). THE2 DEPARTMENT SHALL PROMINENTLY DISPLAY THE NONPROFIT3 ORGANIZATION'S WEBSITE ON THE DEPARTMENT 'S WEBSITE.4 (6) ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 1, 2024, AND EACH SEPTEMBER 15 THEREAFTER THROUGH SEPTEMBER 1, 2028, THE NONPROFIT6 ORGANIZATION SHALL REPORT TO THE DEPARTMENT THE FOLLOWING :7 (a) THE NUMBER OF ATTORNEYS APPOINTED TO PARENTS IN DUE8 PROCESS COMPLAINT PROCEDURES PURSUANT TO SECTION 22-20-108 (3);9 (b) THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH EACH DUE PROCESS COMPLAINT10 CASE; AND11 (c) THE AMOUNT OF UNSPENT MONEY THE NONPROFIT12 ORGANIZATION RETAINS AT THE END OF THE BUDGET YEAR .13 (7) THIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2029.14 15 SECTION 2. Appropriation. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year,16 $33,260 is appropriated to the department of education. This17 appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the18 department may use this appropriation for legal representation for due19 process complaints pursuant to section 22-20-108 (3), C.R.S.20 SECTION 3. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,21 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate22 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.23 1168 -5-