Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1174 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/01/2023

                    Page 1 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 23, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0133  
Rep. Amabile 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 28, 2023 
House Business 
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: HOMEOWNER'S INSURANCE UNDERINSURANCE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Diversion 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires insurers to offer guaranteed replacement cost coverage to 
homeowners, and requires the Division of Insurance to publish an annual report on 
replacement costs.  It increases state expenditures, which requires a General Fund 
diversion, on an ongoing basis beginning in FY 2023-24. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $454,088 to the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill and has been revised to reflect new 
information.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1174 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$454,088      $685,340  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$29,944  $18,587  
 
Total Expenditures 	$484,032  $703,927  
 	Total FTE 	1.9 FTE  2.9 FTE  
Diversions 	General Fund 	($484,032) ($703,927) 
 	Cash Funds 	$484,032  $703,927  
 	Net Diversion 	$0  	$0  
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
 
   Page 2 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires insurance companies to offer guaranteed replacement cost coverage to homeowners.  
If the homeowner rejects this coverage, the insurer must offer extended replacement coverage, law 
and ordinance coverage, and inflation protection coverage.  The bill specifies what factors must be 
considered in determining replacement value. The Division of Insurance (DOI) in the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies must promulgate rules to implement these requirements. 
 
DOI must contract with an independent third-party to prepare an annual report on the cost of 
rebuilding homes in Colorado.  The first report is due April 1, 2024.  Beginning July 1, 2024, certain 
insurers must report to DOI on properties it insures for a coverage amount at least 10 percent below 
the estimate in the annual report. 
 
Under current law, an insurer cannot cancel or refuse to renew a homeowner’s insurance without 
notifying them at least 30 days in advance.  The bill extends this notification deadline to 60 days. 
State Diversion 
The bill diverts $484,032 from the General Fund in FY 2023-24 and $703,927 in FY 2024-25.  This occurs 
because the bill increases costs in the Department of Regulatory Agencies, Division of Insurance, 
which is funded with premium tax revenue that would otherwise be credited to the General Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of Regulatory Agencies by $484,032 in 
FY 2023-24 and $703,927 in FY 2024-25, paid from the Division of Insurance Cash Fund.  Expenditures 
are detailed below and shown in Table 2. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1174 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Regulatory Agencies   
Personal Services 	$131,488       $80,818       
Standard Operating 	$2,160 $1,350 
Capital Outlay 	$13,340 	- 
Legal Services 	$57,100       $353,172       
Contractor  	$250,000 $250,000 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$29,944       $18,587       
FTE – Personal Services 	1.6 FTE 1.0 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.3 FTE 1.9 FTE 
Total Cost $484,032 $703,927 
Total FTE 1.9 FTE 2.9 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation.  Page 3 
February 28, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  The bill increases expenditures to generate the annual report, 
facilitate reporting requirements with insurers, and update rules.  
 
 Staff.  Managing the contract with the third party, facilitating the reporting process for insurers, 
and conducting compliance audits requires 1.0 FTE beginning in FY 2022-23.  DORA requires an 
additional 1.0 FTE in FY 2023-24 to support rulemaking, policy development, and outreach.  If 
changes to the rules are required in subsequent years, workload will increase; this will be 
addressed through the annual budget process.  Standard operating and capital outlay costs are 
included, and costs are prorated to reflect the bill’s effective date. 
 
 Legal services.  DORA requires legal support to execute the contract and conduct rulemaking in 
FY 2023-24, estimated at 540 hours.  In subsequent years, DORA requires an estimated 3,340 hours 
of additional legal services for general counsel and representation due to the anticipated disputes 
between insurers and homeowners related to DOI’s replacement cost benchmarks published in 
the annual report, and the high level of confidential consumer data DOI receives from insurers. 
 
 Contractor. The cost to solicit a contract for the annual report is estimated at $250,000 in 
FY 2023-24 and FY 2024-25, consisting of 625 hours to create the initial report and to update it 
annually. This workload is expected to decrease over time as data collection and evaluation 
methodologies are established. 
 
 Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $454,088 from the Division of Insurance Cash 
Fund to the Department of Regulatory Agencies, and 1.6 FTE.  Of this, $57,100 is reappropriated to 
the Department of Law, with 0.3 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Law  Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.