Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1174 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/01/2023

                    Page 1 
May 1, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 28, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0133  
Rep. Amabile; Brown 
Sen. Baisley; Roberts  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 1, 2023 
Senate Business 
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: HOMEOWNER'S INSURANCE UNDERINSURANCE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☒ State Diversion 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill specifies what insurers must consider in establishing replacement cost 
coverage for homeowners, and requires the Division of Insurance to publish an annual 
report on replacement costs.  It increases state expenditures, which requires a General 
Fund diversion, on an ongoing basis beginning in FY 2023-24. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $109,955 to the Department of 
Regulatory Agencies. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1174 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$109,955      $770,326  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$14,821  $36,812  
 
Total Expenditures 	$124,776  $807,138  
 	Total FTE 	1.0 FTE  3.9 FTE  
Diversions 	General Fund 	($124,776) ($807,138) 
 	Cash Funds 	$124,776  $807,138  
 	Net Diversion 	$0  	$0  
Other Budget Impacts  	- 	- 
 
   Page 2 
May 1, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill specifies what factors insurers must consider in determining replacement value 
in replacement cost homeowner’s insurance policies. For policies issued or renewed as of 
January 1, 2025, insurers must provide homeowners with additional information about replacement 
costs.  The Division of Insurance (DOI) in the Department of Regulatory Agencies must promulgate 
rules to implement these requirements.  
 
DOI must contract with an independent third-party to prepare an annual report on the cost of 
reconstructing homes in Colorado.  The first report is due April 1, 2025. After a stakeholder process, 
DOI may contract for an evaluation of policies to address homeowner’s insurance affordability. 
 
Under current law, an insurer cannot cancel or refuse to renew a homeowner’s insurance without 
notifying them at least 30 days in advance.  The bill extends this notification deadline to 60 days. 
State Diversion 
The bill diverts $124,776 from the General Fund in FY 2023-24 and $807,138 in FY 2024-25.  This occurs 
because the bill increases costs in the Department of Regulatory Agencies, Division of Insurance, 
which is funded with premium tax revenue that would otherwise be credited to the General Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the Department of Regulatory Agencies by $124,776 in 
FY 2023-24 and $807,138 in FY 2024-25, paid from the Division of Insurance Cash Fund.  Expenditures 
are detailed below and shown in Table 2. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1174 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Regulatory Agencies   
Personal Services 	$64,139       $157,784       
Standard Operating 	$1,080 $2,700 
Capital Outlay 	$6,670 $6,670 
Legal Services 	$38,066       $353,172       
Contractor  	- $250,000 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$14,821       $36,812       
FTE – Personal Services  0.8 FTE 2.0 FTE 
FTE – Legal Services 	0.2 FTE 1.9 FTE 
Total Cost $124,776 $807,138 
Total FTE 1.0 FTE 3.9 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation.  Page 3 
May 1, 2023  HB 23-1174  
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  The bill increases expenditures to generate the annual report, 
facilitate reporting requirements with insurers, and update rules.  
 
 Staff.  Managing the contract with the third party, facilitating the reporting process for insurers, 
and conducting compliance audits requires 1.0 FTE beginning in FY 2024-25.  DORA requires an 
additional 1.0 FTE in FY 2023-24 and FY 2024-25 to support rulemaking, policy development, and 
outreach.  Workload in subsequent years will depend on the extent to which rules must be 
updated; this will be addressed through the annual budget process. Standard operating and 
capital outlay costs are included, and costs are prorated to reflect the bill’s effective date. 
 
 Legal services.  DORA requires legal support to execute the contract and conduct rulemaking in 
FY 2023-24, estimated at 360 hours (0.2 FTE).  In subsequent years, DORA requires an estimated 
3,340 hours (1.9 FTE) of additional legal services for general counsel and representation due to the 
anticipated disputes between insurers and homeowners related to DOI’s replacement cost 
benchmarks published in the annual report, and the high level of confidential consumer data DOI 
receives from insurers. Legal services are provided by the Department of Law at of $105.47 per 
hour. 
 
 Contractor. The cost to solicit a contract for the annual report is estimated at $250,000 beginning 
in FY 2024-25, consisting of 625 hours at $400 per hour to create the initial report and to update it 
annually. This workload is expected to decrease over time as data collection and evaluation 
methodologies are established. 
 
 Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed, except that the Section 3 of the bill, pertaining to requirements of insurers, 
takes effect January 1, 2025. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $109,955 from the Division of Insurance Cash 
Fund to the Department of Regulatory Agencies, and 0.8 FTE.  Of this, $38,066 is reappropriated to 
the Department of Law, with an additional 0.2 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Information Technology Law  Regulatory Agencies 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.