Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1188 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/31/2023

                    Page 1 
March 31, 2023  HB 23-1188  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated February 24, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0399  
Rep. Soper 
Sen. Rich  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
March 31, 2023 
House Appropriations  
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: INDIVIDUALIZED LEARNING SCHOOLS & PROGRAMS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ School District 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill allows students in certain independent study programs at charter schools to 
be funded through the School Finance Act.  The bill may impact state expenditures 
and school funding in FY 2023-24 only.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the House Education 
Committee. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill specifies that a student in kindergarten through 8
th
 grade who is enrolled in independent 
study at a charter school is eligible for funding through the School Finance Act.  The independent 
study must be offered through a charter contract approved by its authorizer as of June 1, 2020, based 
on guidance at that time from the Colorado Department of Education (CDE), and must remain 
authorized by its charter contract.  The bill is repealed July 1, 2024. 
Background and Assumptions 
The fiscal note assumes that the bill applies to two charters schools that operate independent study 
programs in line with the bill’s parameters.  Under current law, students enrolled in these programs 
are funded through the school finance formula as full-time, traditional students under a waiver from 
CDE that ends in FY 2022-23.  In FY 2023-24, the waiver is set to expire, and the State Board of 
Education may consider rule changes, including possible modifications to the definition of 
independent study.  Any changes to state rules and alignment of current programs with those rules 
would impact how students in these independent study programs are funded. 
   Page 2 
March 31, 2023  HB 23-1188  
 
As a result, it is unknown how these students will be funded under current law in FY 2023-24.  They 
could continue to be counted as full-time traditional students, or be counted as part-time, online, or 
homeschool enrichment students, depending on rule changes and whether the programs align with 
the definition of independent study or receive a new waiver.  
State Expenditures 
The bill may impact the state share of school finance by a minimal amount in FY 2023-24 only.  Because 
it is unknown how students in these two programs will be funded in FY 2023-24 under current law, 
the bill may continue current expenditures for those students, or it may increase funding for those 
students compared to potentially lower funding in FY 2023-24 without the bill.  For this reason, and 
because the bill is assumed to apply to a limited population of students, the fiscal note assumes that 
any changes to the state share of total program will occur through the 2024 October Count and school 
finance mid-year adjustment.  The state share of school finance is typically paid from the General Fund 
and State Education Fund. 
School District 
As discussed in the state expenditures section, the bill may impact funding for the school districts that 
authorize charter schools with eligible programs in FY 2023-24 only. This fiscal note assumes that the 
provisions of this bill will apply to students attending one of two charter schools in two school 
districts. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education  Law  School Districts 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.