Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1210 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/20/2023

                    Page 1 
February 20, 2023  HB 23-1210  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0784  
Rep. Dickson 
Sen. Hansen 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
February 20, 2023 
House Energy and Environment 
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CARBON MANAGEMENT  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill directs the Colorado Energy Office to contract with an organization to develop 
a carbon management roadmap.  It increases state expenditures from FY 2023-24 to 
FY 2026-27. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $135,533 to the Colorado Energy 
Office. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 23-1210 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$135,533 $139,159 
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$7,110     $9,112     
 
Total Expenditures 	$142,643     $148,271     
 	Total FTE 	0.4 FTE  0.5 FTE  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$20,330 $20,874 
 
 
    Page 2 
February 20, 2023  HB 23-1210  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill directs the Colorado Energy Office to contract with a qualified organization to develop a 
carbon management roadmap.  Carbon management is any combination of capturing carbon dioxide 
emissions before they reach the atmosphere or removing carbon dioxide from the atmosphere for use 
or storage.  The bill specifies guidelines for the roadmap, including sectors to study and stakeholders 
to consult. 
 
The CEO must enter into a contract for developing the roadmap by January 1, 2024, and this 
organization must create the roadmap and submit it to CEO for feedback by September 1, 2024.  After 
receiving public feedback, the contractor must finalize the roadmap by February 28, 2025, and CEO 
must present it to the legislature during the 2025 legislative session.  During the subsequent two years, 
CEO must update the legislature on any progress made in achieving the roadmap’s goals and any 
recommendations to improve its implementation. 
 
In addition, the bill expands the eligibility criteria of CEO’s Industrial and Manufacturing Operations 
Clean Air Grants Program to include some types of carbon management projects. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CEO by $142,643 in FY 2023-24 and $148,271 in FY 2024-25, 
paid from the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 23-1210 
 
  FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Colorado Energy Office   
Personal Services 	$28,863       $38,484       
Operating Expenses 	-       $675       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670       -       
Roadmap Contract 	$100,000       $100,000 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$7,110       $9,112       
Total Cost $142,643 $148,271 
Total FTE 0.4 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Colorado Energy Office.  Administering the contract with the qualified organization and fulfilling 
the bill’s reporting requirements requires 0.5 FTE in FY 2023-24 and FY 2024-25.  Standard operating 
and capital outlay costs are included, and account for the General Fund pay date shift and the bill’s 
effective date.  The cost of the contract is estimated at $200,000, with costs occurring over two fiscal 
years.  Page 3 
February 20, 2023  HB 23-1210  
 
 
 
Other state agencies. The bill requires the contractor to consult stakeholders when creating the 
roadmap, some of which are state entities.  Workload will minimally increase in these agencies in 
FY 2024-25, and no change in appropriations is required. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $135,533 from the General Fund to the Colorado 
Energy Office, and 0.4 FTE. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Agriculture  Colorado Energy Office  Economic Development 
Labor  Legislative Council Staff  Natural Resources  
Personnel  Public Health and Environment  Transportation 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.