Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB008 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/17/2023

                    Page 1 
May 17, 2023 	SB 23-008 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0470  
Sen. Moreno 
Rep. Lindsay  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 17, 2023 
Signed into Law  
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: YOUTH INVOLVEMENT EDUCATION STANDARDS REVIEW  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☒ School Districts 
 
The bill adds student representatives to several review processes related to K-12 
educational standards.  The bill increases state and school district workload and 
expenditures on an ongoing basis.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $7,650 to the 
Colorado Department of Education.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-008 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$7,650     $7,650     
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$1,148 	$1,148 
 
 
    Page 2 
May 17, 2023 	SB 23-008 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
Beginning September 1, 2023, the bill adds student members to:  
 
 the state K-12 education standards development process;  
 the regional educator meetings convened by the Colorado Department of Education (CDE) and 
the Department of Higher Education to align the preschool through postsecondary educational 
system; and  
 local review of education standards.  
 
Students must be between 14 and 19 years old, and from both urban and rural areas whenever 
possible.  Student members may be reimbursed for expenses incurred in participating, and may 
receive a stipend for participation in the education standards development process.  CDE must 
promote the opportunity for student involvement and request that schools nominate students for 
participation.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDE by $7,650 per year beginning in FY 2023-24 from the 
General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-008 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Education   
Expense Reimbursement 	$5,850  $5,850  
Stipends 	$1,800  $1,800  
Total Cost $7,650  $7,650  
   
Expense reimbursement.  The fiscal note assumes that CDE will reimburse the two participating 
students for travel and expenses to participate in each meeting.  Based on current law and practice, 
18 annual meetings are expected to involve student members.  Expense reimbursements are estimated 
at $250 for students from rural areas and $75 for students from urban areas, based on the current 
average reimbursements for CDE standards review committee members.  If a different number of total 
or in-person meetings occur, CDE will request funding changes through the annual budget process.  
 
Stipends.  The bill allows CDE to determine the amount of stipends for students participating in the 
CDE education standards review process.  The fiscal note estimates $60 per student per meeting, based 
on stipend amounts for youth advisory committees in other state agencies.  Students will receive a 
stipend for both in-person and remote meetings.  
 
Student selection.  The bill increases workload for CDE to promote the opportunity for students to 
participate, receive nominations from local education providers, and appoint participants.  No change 
in appropriations is required.   Page 3 
May 17, 2023 	SB 23-008 
 
 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
School District 
The bill increases workload for local education providers to nominate students, and increases 
workload and costs to include students in the local review of education standards.   
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on April 26, 2023, and takes effect August 7, 2023, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $7,650 to the Colorado 
Department of Education.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.