Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/12/2023

                    Page 1 
January 12, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0166  
Sen. Moreno 
Rep. Lindsay  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
January 12, 2023 
Senate Health & Human Services  
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov 
Bill Topic: DISORDERED EATING PREVENTION  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the Office of Disordered Eating Prevention in the Department of Public 
Health and Environment.  The office will be advised by a Disordered Eating Prevention 
Commission and will provide grant funding for research on risk factors, impacts, and 
interventions associated with disordered eating. It increases state expenditures 
beginning in FY 2023-24 and may increase state revenue.   
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $42,773 to the Department of 
Public Health and Environment.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, which was recommended by the Colorado 
Youth Advisory Council Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-014 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$42,773  $344,976  
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$6,397  	$31,781  
 	Total Expenditures 	$49,170  $376,757  
 	Total FTE 	0.4 FTE 	1.8 FTE 
Transfers  	-     	-     
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$6,416  	$51,746  
 
 
    Page 2 
January 12, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates a new office, commission, and grant program to address disordered eating prevention, 
as described below. 
 
Office.  The bill creates the Office of Disordered Eating Prevention in the Department of Public Health 
and Environment (CDPHE), to be established by July 1, 2024.  The office must create and maintain a 
resource bank for research, intervention methods, treatment resources, crisis services, awareness 
programs, and educational resources regarding disordered eating prevention and care. In 
collaboration with the Office of Suicide Prevention, the Behavioral Health Administration, the 
Department of Education, and other organizations, the office must provide support to individuals 
with disordered eating, facilitate public outreach, increase awareness regarding prevention and care, 
and prepare culturally-specific written materials for primary care offices and providers throughout 
the state.  CDPHE is authorized to seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from private or 
public sources.    
 
Commission.  By December 31, 2024, the CDPHE director will appoint members to the newly-created 
Disordered Eating Prevention Commission.  The commission will provide leadership, set priorities, 
advise the office on strategy and implementation, and provide a forum for various stakeholders to 
address disordered eating.  The commission must also develop recommendations for legislation.  The 
commission repeals on September 1, 2033, following a sunset review.  
 
Grant program.  The bill also creates the disordered eating prevention research grant program to 
provide financial assistance for research related to risk factors, impacts, and root causes for disordered 
eating.  CDPHE must administer the grant program in consultation with the office.  The grant program 
repeals July 1, 2027.  By November 1, 2024, and every year thereafter, the office must submit to relevant 
legislative committees a report that summarizes recommendations from the commission and 
information related to the grant program.   
State Revenue 
The bill potentially increases state revenue to the General Fund from gifts, grants, or donations; 
however, no sources have been identified at this time.  Gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from 
TABOR revenue limits.     
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDPHE by $49,170 and 0.4 FTE in FY 2023-24 and $376,757 
and 1.8 FTE in FY 2024-25 and ongoing from the General Fund. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 
and detailed below. The bill also increases workload in the Governor’s Office, the Behavioral Health 
Administration, and the Department of Education. 
   Page 3 
January 12, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-014 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Public Health and Environment   
Personal Services 	$21,258  $127,546  
Operating Expenses 	$675 $2,430  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$13,340  	- 
Translation Services 	$5,000  $10,000  
Printing 	$2,500  $5,000  
Grant Awards 	- $200,000  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$6,397  $31,781  
Total Cost $49,170  $376,757  
Total FTE 0.4 FTE 1.8 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
 
Department of Public Health and Environment. The CDPHE will have costs to staff the new office, 
support the new commission, and award grants, as described below. 
 
 Program staff.  The CDPHE will hire 1.8 FTE to create and maintain a resource bank for disordered 
eating, coordinate with the commission and other agencies, facilitate public outreach, support the 
commission, submit reporting requirements, and administer the grant program.  The fiscal note 
assumes an April 1 start date, includes standard capital outlay and operating expenses, and 
reflects the General Fund pay date shift.      
 
 Translation.  The office will translate resource bank material and other education and outreach 
materials into relevant languages for distribution to impacted communities. 
 
 Printing.  The office will print disordered eating prevention materials for primary care offices and 
patients. 
 
 Grant awards.  This fiscal note assumes that $200,000 in grant funding will be made available to 
eligible recipients annually beginning in FY 2024-25.  Funding for the program is at the discretion 
of the General Assembly. The fiscal note will be updated if more information on program funding 
levels become available.   
 
Governor's Office.  Workload will increase in the Governor’s Office of Boards and Commissions to 
facilitate the required appointments under the bill, including recruiting, vetting, and interviewing 
potential appointees.  Based on the cumulative impact of all legislation, the Governor's Office may 
seek funding through the annual budget process, as necessary. 
  Page 4 
January 12, 2023  SB 23-014  
 
 
Other state agencies. The Department of Education and the Behavioral Health Administration within 
the Department of Human Services will incur workload impacts to collaborate with the office and 
serve on the commission, which can be accomplished with existing resources.  
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, which will decrease the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires a General Fund appropriation of $42,773 to CDPHE, and 0.4 FTE.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education  Higher Education Human Services 
Public Health and Environment Information Technology Law  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.