Page 1 July 31, 2023 SB 23-014 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 23-0166 Sen. Moreno Rep. Lindsay Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: July 31, 2023 Signed into Law Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov Bill Topic: DISORDERED EATING PREVENTION Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☒ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity The bill creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Program and a research grant program within the Department of Public Health and Environment to better understand the risk factors, impacts, and interventions associated with disordered eating. It increases state expenditures beginning in FY 2023-24 and may increase state revenue. Appropriation Summary: For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $26,679 to the Department of Public Health and Environment. Fiscal Note Status: The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. The bill was recommended by the Colorado Youth Advisory Council Committee. Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-014 Budget Year FY 2023-24 Out Year FY 2024-25 Revenue - - Expenditures General Fund $26,679 $91,398 Centrally Appropriated $5,317 $21,932 Total Expenditures $31,996 $113,330 Total FTE 0.2 FTE 1.0 FTE Transfers - - Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $4,002 $13,710 Page 2 July 31, 2023 SB 23-014 Summary of Legislation The bill creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Program in the Department of Public Health and Environment (CDPHE), to be established by July 1, 2024. The program must create a resource bank for research, intervention methods, treatment resources, crisis services, awareness programs, and educational resources regarding disordered eating prevention and care. In collaboration with the Office of Suicide Prevention, the Behavioral Health Administration, the Department of Education, and other organizations, the program must provide support to individuals with disordered eating, facilitate public outreach, increase awareness regarding prevention and care, and prepare culturally-specific written materials for primary care offices and providers throughout the state. The bill also creates the Disordered Eating Prevention Research Grant Program to provide financial assistance for research related to risk factors, impacts, and root causes of disordered eating. The grant program repeals July 1, 2027. CDPHE is authorized to seek, accept, and expend gifts, grants, or donations from private or public sources, and must report annually beginning November 1, 2025 on recommendations and information regarding disordered eating prevention. State Revenue The bill may increase state revenue to the General Fund from gifts, grants, or donations; however, no sources have been identified at this time. Gifts, grants, and donations are exempt from TABOR revenue limits. State Expenditures The bill increases state expenditures in CDPHE by approximately $32,000 in FY 2023-24 and $113,000 in FY 2024-25 and ongoing from the General Fund. Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. The bill also increases workload in the Behavioral Health Administration and the Department of Education. Table 2 Expenditures Under SB 23-014 FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 Department of Public Health and Environment Personal Services $12,509 $75,048 Operating Expenses - $1,350 Capital Outlay Costs $6,670 - Translation Services $5,000 $10,000 Printing $2,500 $5,000 Centrally Appropriated Costs 1 $5,317 $21,932 Total Cost $31,996 $113,330 Total FTE 0.2 FTE 1.0 FTE 1 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. Page 3 July 31, 2023 SB 23-014 Department of Public Health and Environment. The CDPHE will have costs to staff and implement the new program, as described below. Program staff. The CDPHE will require 1.0 FTE to create and maintain a resource bank for disordered eating, coordinate with other agencies, facilitate public outreach, submit reporting requirements, and develop guidelines for the grant program. The fiscal note assumes an April 1 start date for program support and reflects the General Fund pay date shift. Additional staff may also be required in FY 2024-25 to administer the grant program; however, this depends on whether grant funding is made available, as discussed below. Translation. The office will translate resource bank material and other education and outreach materials into relevant languages for distribution to impacted communities. Printing. The office will print disordered eating prevention materials for primary care offices and patients. Grant program. The bill creates a grant program but does not specify funding for the program, which is subject to available appropriations. If the legislature opts to make funding available, expenditures will increase in CDPHE for grants administration activities and grant awards. Other state agencies. The Department of Education and the Behavioral Health Administration within the Department of Human Services will incur workload impacts to collaborate with CDPHE, which can be accomplished within existing resources. Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. Effective Date The bill was signed into law by the Lieutenant Governor on May 30, 2023, and takes effect on August 7, 2023, assuming no referendum petition is filed. State Appropriations For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $26,679 to the Department of Public Health and Enviornment, and 0.2 FTE. State and Local Government Contacts Education Higher Education Human Services Public Health and Environment Information Technology Law The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit: leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.