Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB029 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/06/2023

                    Page 1 
April 6, 2023  SB 23-029  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated January 10, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0170  
Sen. Moreno 
Rep. Lindsay 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 6, 2023 
Senate Appropriations 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: DISPROPORTIONATE DISCIPLINE IN PUBLIC SCHOOLS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ School District 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates the School Discipline Task Force to study and make recommendations 
regarding state and local school discipline policies.  The bill increases state 
expenditures in FY 2023-24 only, and school district workload on an ongoing basis. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires an appropriation of $165,295 to multiple state 
agencies. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This revised fiscal note reflects the introduced bill, as amended by the Senate 
Education Committee.  The bill was recommended by the Colorado Youth Advisory 
Council Committee.  
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB23-029 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$165,295  	-       
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$8,990  	-       
 	Total Expenditures 	$174,285  	-       
 	Total FTE   0.5 FTE  	-       
Transfers  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$25,617       	-       
 
 
    Page 2 
April 6, 2023  SB 23-029  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the School Discipline Task Force in the Colorado Department of Education (CDE) to 
study and make recommendations regarding school discipline policies, state and local discipline 
reporting requirements, and local engagement.  The bill specifies the composition of the task force and 
that members serve without compensation, but may receive reimbursement for expenses.  
 
The task force must meet by September 15, 2023 and at least six times between September 15, 2023 and 
the first Colorado Youth Advisory Review Commission meeting in 2024.  CDE must provide staff 
assistance to the task force, which must also consult with stakeholders and experts.  The task force 
must report on its findings and recommendations to the legislature, State Board of Education, and 
CDE, and must present at the first COYAC meeting in 2024. 
 
Student suspension or expulsion.  Under current law, school districts are encouraged to consider 
certain factors before suspending or expelling a student.  The bill requires these factors to be 
considered, and further requires that a school district document alternative disciplinary measures 
used prior to suspension or expulsion in both the student’s record and in the data reported to CDE. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDE and the Legislative Department by $174,285 in FY 2023-24 
only, paid from the General Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and discussed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-029 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Colorado Department of Education             
Personal Services 	$37,147  	-       
Operating Expenses 	$675  	-       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670  	-       
Request for Proposals 	$17,850  	- 
Facilitator Costs 	$77,400  	- 
Meeting Costs 
 
$24,138  	- 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$8,990  	-       
FTE – Personal Services 	0.5 FTE 	- 
Dept. Subtotal 	$172,870 	- 
Legislative Department   
Per Diem and Expenses 	$1,415       	-       
Dept. Subtotal 	$1,415 	- 
Total $174,285 	- 
Total FTE 0.5 FTE 	- 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation.  Page 3 
April 6, 2023  SB 23-029  
 
 
Colorado Department of Education.   
 
CDE will incur costs to support the task force, including staffing, contract, and meeting costs.  The 
fiscal note assumes that 13 meetings will be required to fulfill the committee’s charge, of which 10 will 
be in-person and 3 are assumed to be remote. 
 
Personal services.  CDE will require 0.5 FTE in FY 2023-24 only to provide staff support to the task 
force, including managing the vendor contract, supporting task force meetings, and managing the 
resource bank.  Staffing costs are prorated for the General Fund paydate shift, and a September 1, 2023 
start date.  The fiscal note assumes that any work that continues into FY 2024-25 can be accomplished 
within current appropriations. 
 
Facilitator costs and request for proposals.  CDE requires $77,400 in FY 2023-24 for contract costs for 
a facilitator and expert to support the committee, in addition to standard costs for a request for 
proposal process. The estimate assumes 24 hours per meeting at a rate of $200 per hour. 
 
Meeting costs.  The task force will require approximately $24,000 for meeting costs for ten in-person 
meetings, which include food, room, and travel costs for 13 meetings in FY 2023-24 only.  Costs to 
stream the meetings will be incurred for all 13 meetings. 
 
Legislative Department.  
 
The legislative member on the task force will be paid per diem and travel reimbursement, estimated 
at $1,415.  This is based on standard legislative reimbursement rates and assumes six meetings that 
will occur outside the legislative session. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
School District  
The bill increases workload and costs for school districts to participate in the task force, and to consider 
certain factors in school discipline that are currently only encouraged.  The impact will vary by district.  
 
  Page 4 
April 6, 2023  SB 23-029  
 
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
In FY 2023-24, the bill requires the following General Fund appropriations: 
 
 $163,880 to the Colorado Department of Education, and 0.5 FTE; and 
 $1,415 to the Legislative Department. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education  Information Technology Legislative Council Staff 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.