Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB076 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 02/24/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 23-0321.01 Chelsea Princell x4335
SENATE BILL 23-076
Senate Committees House Committees
Education
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE COLORADO YOUTH101
ADVISORY COUNCIL, AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING
102
AN APPROPRIATION.103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Sunset Process - Senate Education Committee. The Colorado
youth advisory council (advisory committee) is set to repeal September
1, 2023. The bill implements the department of regulatory agencies'
recommendation to continue the advisory committee indefinitely.
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 24, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 23, 2023
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Coleman and Marchman, Buckner, Fields, Kolker, Rich, Bridges, Cutter, Exum, Ginal,
Hansen, Jaquez Lewis, Moreno, Mullica, Roberts, Simpson, Winter F., Zenzinger
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McLachlan and Vigil, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 2-2-1307 as2
follows:3
2-2-1307.  Repeal of part. This part 13 is repealed, effective4
September 1, 2023 SEPTEMBER 1, 2028. Prior to the repeal of this part 13,5
the council must be reviewed as provided for in section 2-3-1203.6
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1203, repeal7
(14)(a)(VI); and add (19)(a)(II) as follows:8
2-3-1203.  Sunset review of advisory committees - legislative9
declaration - definition - repeal. (14) (a)  The following statutory10
authorizations for the designated advisory committees are scheduled for11
repeal on September 1, 2023:12
(VI)  The Colorado youth advisory council created in section13
2-2-1302;14
(19) (a)  The following statutory authorizations for the designated15
advisory committees will repeal on September 1, 2028:16
(II)  T
HE COLORADO YOUTH ADVISORY COUNCIL CREATED IN
17
SECTION 2-2-1302.18
SECTION 3. Appropriation. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year,19
$50,000 is appropriated to the youth advisory council cash fund created20
in section 2-2-1306, C.R.S. This appropriation is from the general fund.21
The legislative department is responsible for the accounting related to this22
appropriation.23
SECTION 4. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act24
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the25
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except26
076-2- that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V1
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this2
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take3
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in4
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the5
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.6
076
-3-