Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB076 Amended / Bill

Filed 05/07/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REREVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the Second House
LLS NO. 23-0321.01 Chelsea Princell x4335
SENATE BILL 23-076
Senate Committees House Committees
Education Education
Appropriations Legislative Council
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE COLORADO YOUTH101
ADVISORY COUNCIL, AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , MAKING
102
AN APPROPRIATION.103
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Sunset Process - Senate Education Committee. The Colorado
youth advisory council (advisory committee) is set to repeal September
1, 2023. The bill implements the department of regulatory agencies'
recommendation to continue the advisory committee indefinitely.
HOUSE
3rd Reading Unamended
May 6, 2023
HOUSE
Amended 2nd Reading
May 3, 2023
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 24, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
February 23, 2023
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Coleman and Marchman, Buckner, Fields, Kolker, Rich, Bridges, Cutter, Exum, Ginal,
Hansen, Jaquez Lewis, Moreno, Mullica, Roberts, Simpson, Winter F., Zenzinger
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McLachlan and Vigil, Amabile, Bacon, Bird, Brown, deGruy Kennedy, Duran, English,
Froelich, Garcia, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Hamrick, Herod, Jodeh, Joseph, Kipp, Lindsay, Lukens,
Martinez, McCluskie, Michaelson Jenet, Ricks, Sirota, Snyder, Story, Titone, Velasco,
Weissman, Willford, Young
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1304, amend2
(4)(a) and (6)(b) as follows:3
2-2-1304. Duties - meetings - community outreach -4
designation of organization to accept donations - authority to5
contract.6
(4) (a) On or before September 1, 2013, and every third7
September 1 thereafter THROUGH SEPTEMBER 1, 2019, the council shall,8
in conjunction with the director of the legislative council, use a request9
for proposal process to contract with and designate one or more nonprofit10
organizations to provide staffing and operational assistance and to serve11
as the custodian of moneys MONEY donated to the council through the12
designated organization. THE CONTRACTOR SELECTED FOLLOWING THE13
2019 REQUEST FOR PROPOSAL PROCESS SHALL, PURSUANT TO ONE OR14
MORE CONTRACTS, PROVIDE SUCH STAFFING, OPERATIONAL, AND15
CUSTODIAN SERVICES THROUGH JUNE 30, 2023. THEREAFTER, THE16
COUNCIL SHALL, IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE DIRECTOR OF THE17
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, ON OR BEFORE APRIL 30, 2023, AND, EXCEPT AS18
OTHERWISE PROVIDED IN THIS SUBSECTION (4)(a), ON OR BEFORE EVERY19
SECOND APRIL 15 THEREAFTER, USE A REQUEST FOR PROPOSAL PROCESS20
TO CONTRACT WITH AND DESIGNATE ONE OR MORE NONPROFIT21
ORGANIZATIONS TO PROVIDE SUCH STAFFING, OPERATIONAL, AND22
CUSTODIAN SERVICES. THE TERM OF EACH CONTRACT ENTERED INTO FOR23
A TERM COMMENCING ON OR AFTER JULY 1, 2023, IS TWO STATE FISCAL24
YEARS; EXCEPT THAT ANY SUCH CONTRACT MAY BE EXTENDED FOR ONE25
ADDITIONAL TWO-YEAR TERM. IF A CONTRACT IS EXTENDED, THE REQUEST26
076-2- FOR PROPOSAL FOR THE NEXT CONTRACT MUST BE ISSUED ON OR BEFORE1
THE APRIL 15 IMMEDIATELY PRECEDING THE EXPIRATION OF THE2
EXTENSION TERM. The designated organization shall not be the custodian3
of any moneys MONEY appropriated by the state and credited to the fund4
created in section 2-2-1306. The designated organization is authorized to5
expend any moneys MONEY it receives as is necessary for the operation6
of the council and may solicit and accept monetary and in-kind gifts,7
grants, and donations used to further the council's duties and8
responsibilities. Any such moneys MONEY donated or awarded to the9
designated organization for the benefit of the council are IS not subject to10
appropriation by the general assembly. Any such moneys MONEY obtained11
by the council or the designated organization and not in the fund that are12
IS unexpended and unencumbered at the time the council is dissolved13
shall be distributed according to appropriate federal and state laws14
governing nonprofit organizations. If a different nonprofit or private15
organization is subsequently designated as the custodian of donated16
moneys MONEY in accordance with this paragraph (a), any moneys MONEY17
that are IS unexpended and unencumbered at the time of the change in18
designation shall be promptly transferred by the previously designated19
organization to the newly designated organization.20
(6) (b) On or before April 30, 2021, APRIL 20, 2023, and on or21
before April 30 APRIL 1 of each year thereafter, the council shall select22
five members to serve as nonvoting members of the review committee23
during the subsequent legislative interim.24
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1305.5, amend25
(3)(b) and (4) as follows:26
2-2-1305.5.  Colorado youth advisory council review committee27
076
-3- - created. (3) (b) On or before April 30, 2021, APRIL 20, 2023, and on or1
before April 30 APRIL 1 of each year thereafter, the chair of the legislative2
council shall appoint the member serving pursuant to subsection (2)(a)(II)3
of this section to serve during the subsequent legislative interim.4
(4) In odd-numbered years, the speaker of the house of5
representatives shall appoint the chair of the review committee and the6
president of the senate shall appoint the vice-chair. In even-numbered7
years, the president of the senate shall appoint the chair and the speaker8
of the house of representatives shall appoint the vice-chair. The9
appointing authorities shall make the appointments on or before April 3010
APRIL 20, 2023, AND ON OR BEFORE APRIL 1 of each year THEREAFTER.11
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1301.5, amend12
(4) as follows:13
2-2-1301.5. Definitions. As used in this part 13, unless the14
context otherwise requires:15
(4) "Review committee" means the REPRESENTATIVE HUGH16
MCKEAN Colorado youth advisory council review committee created in17
section 2-2-1305.5. 18
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1305.5, amend19
(1) as follows:20
2-2-1305.5.  Representative Hugh McKean Colorado youth21
advisory council review committee - created. (1) There is created in22
the legislative branch the REPRESENTATIVE HUGH MCKEAN Colorado23
youth advisory council review committee to review the council's work24
and to recommend legislation regarding issues affecting Colorado youth.25
The committee is comprised of ten members, as described in subsection26
(2) of this section.27
076
-4- SECTION 5. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 2-2-1307 as1
follows:2
2-2-1307.  Repeal of part. This part 13 is repealed, effective3
September 1, 2023 SEPTEMBER 1, 2028. Prior to the repeal of this part 13,4
the council must be reviewed as provided for in section 2-3-1203.5
SECTION 6. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1203, repeal6
(14)(a)(VI); and add (19)(a)(II) as follows:7
2-3-1203.  Sunset review of advisory committees - legislative8
declaration - definition - repeal. (14) (a)  The following statutory9
authorizations for the designated advisory committees are scheduled for10
repeal on September 1, 2023:11
(VI)  The Colorado youth advisory council created in section12
2-2-1302;13
(19) (a)  The following statutory authorizations for the designated14
advisory committees will repeal on September 1, 2028:15
(II)  T
HE COLORADO YOUTH ADVISORY COUNCIL CREATED IN
16
SECTION 2-2-1302.17
SECTION 7. Appropriation. For the 2023-24 state fiscal year,18
$50,000 is appropriated to the youth advisory council cash fund created19
in section 2-2-1306, C.R.S. This appropriation is from the general fund.20
The legislative department is responsible for the accounting related to this21
appropriation.22
      SECTION 8. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby23
finds, determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate24
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.25
076
-5-