Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB094 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/18/2023

                    Page 1 
July 18, 2023  SB 23-094  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0764  
Sen. Lundeen; Zenzinger; 
Rep. Wilson; Lukens 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 18, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SCHOOL TRANSPORTATION TASK FORCE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☒ School District 
 
The bill creates the Colorado School Transportation Modernization Task Force to 
report and make recommendations on school transportation barriers, funding, and 
workforce.  The bill increases state expenditures and school district workload in 
FY 2023-24 only. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $95,313 to the 
Colorado Department of Education.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-094 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	$95,313 	-     
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$9,691 	-     
 
Total Expenditures 	$105,004 	-     
 	Total FTE                          0.5 FTE  	-  
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$14,297 	- 
 
 
    Page 2 
July 18, 2023  SB 23-094  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Colorado School Transportation Modernization Task Force in the Colorado 
Department of Education (CDE). The bill specifies the task force’s membership, which must be 
appointed by June 30, 2023.  Task force members serve without compensation but may be reimbursed 
for expenses.  The task force must meet at least two times from August to December 2023, and at least 
four times from May to December 2024.  It must report to the legislature by December 1, 2024. 
 
The bill requires that CDE collect and report certain school transportation data to the task force.  Using 
that data and input from task force members and experts, the task force must report on findings and 
recommendations, including the following topics: 
 
 transportation challenges that create barriers for students to attend a district-assigned 
neighborhood school, or the school or career pathway program of their choice; 
 recommendations for a sustainable funding stream and simplified reimbursement process for 
school districts and charter schools; 
 outcomes from state transportation and assistance grants; 
 a potential transportation innovation fund to support innovative local transportation efforts; 
 facilitation of partnerships to create cost efficiencies;  
 an analysis of requiring automatic vehicle information systems on school buses; and 
 development of transportation talent pipelines and competitive compensation to recruit drivers.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in CDE by $108,921 in FY 2023-24 only, paid from the General 
Fund.  Expenditures are shown in Table 2 and detailed below. 
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-094 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Education   
Personal Services 	$44,638 	-       
Operating Expenses 	$675  	-       
Contracted Facilitator 	$50,000 	- 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$9,691 	-       
Total Cost $105,004 	- 
Total FTE 0.5 FTE 	- 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
   Page 3 
July 18, 2023  SB 23-094  
 
 
Department of Education.  CDE requires 0.5 FTE in FY 2023-24 only to compile and analyze the 
required data and support the task force. Staff is split between the School Transportation Unit and the 
School Finance Unit. Costs include standard operating costs.  CDE will also incur a one-time cost to 
hire a contract facilitator to lead the task force. The fiscal note assumes that it will be a fully remote 
task force, and thus, CDE will not incur costs to reimburse task force members for expenses.  
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
School District  
The bill increases workload by a minimal amount for the three school districts whose transportation 
directors serve on the task force.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 16, 2023.  
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $95,313 to the Colorado 
Department of Education, and 0.5 FTE.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Education 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.