First Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO INTRODUCED LLS NO. 23-0324.01 Jason Gelender x4330 SENATE BILL 23-153 Senate Committees House Committees Business, Labor, & Technology A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE REGULATION OF NOTARIES101 BY THE SECRETARY OF STATE IN THE DEPARTMENT OF STATE ,102 AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH , IMPLEMENTING THE103 RECOMMENDATIONS IN THE 2022 SUNSET REPORT BY THE104 DEPARTMENT OF REGULATORY AGENCIES .105 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov/ .) Sunset Process - Senate Business, Labor, and Technology Committee. The bill implements the recommendations of the department SENATE SPONSORSHIP Rodriguez and Rich, HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Duran and Pugliese, Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. of regulatory agencies, as specified in the department's sunset review of the "Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts" (act), as follows: ! Continues the act for 9 years, until September 1, 2032; ! Repeals the requirement that a certificate evidencing a notarial act performed by a notary public indicate the date of expiration of the notary public's commission; ! Repeals statutory fees for notarial acts performed by a notary public and requires the secretary of state to adopt rules that prescribe or establish caps for fees that a notary public may charge for notarial acts; and ! Requires the secretary of state to adopt rules that establish minimum requirements for the use of interpreters and translators in the performance of notarial acts. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-21-515, amend2 (1)(c) and (1)(d); and repeal (1)(e) as follows:3 24-21-515. Certificate of notarial act. (1) A notarial act must be4 evidenced by a certificate. The certificate must:5 (c) Identify the county and state in which the notarial act is6 performed; AND7 (d) Contain the title of office of the notarial officer. and 8 (e) If the notarial officer is a notary public, indicate the date of9 expiration of the officer's commission.10 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-21-519, amend11 (5) as follows:12 24-21-519. Journal. (5) Upon written request of any member of13 the public, which request must include the name of the parties, the type14 of document, and the month and year in which a record was notarized, a15 notary public may supply a certified copy of the line item representing the16 requested transaction. A notary public may charge the fee allowed in17 section 24-21-529 A FEE AS AUTHORIZED BY THE SECRETARY OF STATE BY18 SB23-153-2- RULE for each certified copy of a line item, and shall record the1 transaction in the notary's journal.2 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-21-527, add (1.5)3 as follows:4 24-21-527. Rules - definitions. (1.5) I N ADDITION TO THE RULES5 THAT THE SECRETARY OF STATE IS AUTHORIZED TO ADOPT PURSUANT TO6 SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION, NO LATER THAN JANUARY 1, 2024, THE7 SECRETARY OF STATE SHALL ADOPT RULES THAT PRESCRIBE OR ESTABLISH8 CAPS FOR FEES THAT A NOTARY PUBLIC MAY CHARGE FOR THE9 PERFORMANCE OF NOTARIAL ACTS AND ESTABLISH MINIMUM10 REQUIREMENTS FOR THE USE OF INTERPRETERS AND TRANSLATORS IN THE11 PERFORMANCE OF NOTARIAL ACTS .12 SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, repeal 24-21-529 as13 follows:14 24-21-529. Notary's fees. (1) Except as specified in subsection 15 (2) of this section, the fees of a notary public may be, but must not16 exceed, five dollars for each document attested by a person before a17 notary, except as otherwise provided by law. The fee for each such18 document must include all duties and functions required to complete the19 notarial act in accordance with this part 5.20 (2) In lieu of the fee authorized in subsection (1) of this section,21 a notary public may charge a fee, not to exceed ten dollars, for the22 notary's electronic signature.23 SECTION 5. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 24-21-540 as24 follows:25 24-21-540. Repeal of part. This part 5 is repealed, effective26 September 1, 2023 SEPTEMBER 1, 2032. Before its repeal, this part 5 is27 SB23-153 -3- scheduled for review in accordance with section 24-34-104.1 SECTION 6. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 24-34-104, repeal2 (24)(a)(IV); and add (33)(a)(IV) as follows:3 24-34-104. General assembly review of regulatory agencies4 and functions for repeal, continuation, or reestablishment - legislative5 declaration - repeal. (24) (a) The following agencies, functions, or both,6 are scheduled for repeal on September 1, 2023:7 (IV) The appointment of notaries public through the secretary of8 state in accordance with part 5 of article 21 of this title 24;9 (33) (a) The following agencies, functions, or both, are scheduled10 for repeal on September 1, 2032:11 (IV) T HE APPOINTMENT OF NOTARIES PUBLIC THROUGH THE12 SECRETARY OF STATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH PART 5 OF ARTICLE 21 OF THIS13 TITLE 24.14 SECTION 7. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 38-30-134 as15 follows:16 38-30-134. Fees of commissioners. Commissioners, for like17 services, shall be allowed the same fees as are allowed by law THE18 SECRETARY OF STATE to notaries public of this state.19 SECTION 8. Effective date. This act takes effect upon passage;20 except that sections 2, 4, and 7 of this act take effect January 1, 2024.21 SECTION 9. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,22 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate23 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.24 SB23-153 -4-