Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB153 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 08/03/2023

                    Page 1 
August 3, 2023  SB 23-153  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0324  
Sen. Rodriguez; Rich 
Rep. Duran; Pugliese  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
August 3, 2023 
Signed into Law  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SUNSET REVISED UNIFORM LAW ON NOTARIAL ACTS  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☒ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill.  This bill continues the regulation of notary publics by the Secretary of 
State, which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2023.  State fiscal impacts include 
both new revenue and expenditures from changes to the program under the bill, as well 
as the continuation of the program's current revenue and expenditures.  The program 
is continued through September 1, 2032. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the enacted bill includes an appropriation of $96,568 to the Secretary 
of State. 
Fiscal Note  
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-153
1 
 
 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	Cash Funds up to $107,925       up to $42,339       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	$96,568       $34,759       
 	Centrally Appropriated 	$11,357 	$7,745 
 	Total Expenditures $107,925 	$42,339 
 	Total FTE 	0.7 FTE        0.5 FTE        
Other Budget Impacts TABOR Refund up to $107,925       up to $42,339       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 	Cash Funds 	-       $72,000       
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $72,000       
 	Continuing FTE 	-       2.0 FTE       
Other Budget Impacts 
 
 
 
 
 
TABOR Refund  	$72,000 
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill and the continuing impacts 
from extending the program beyond its current repeal date.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is 
not passed and the program is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
August 3, 2023  SB 23-153  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill implements the recommendations of the Department of Regulatory Affairs’ (DORA) sunset 
review of the Revised Uniform Law on Notarial Acts, and continues regulation of notary publics by 
the Secretary of State (SOS) until September 1, 2032.   
 
Under current law, notary public fees are fixed at not more than $5 per document and up to $10 for a 
notary’s electronic signature.  This bill repeals the statutory fees and requires that the SOS adopt rules 
that establish caps for notary fees.  The SOS must also adopt rules for the minimum requirements for 
the use of interpreters and translators in the performance of notarial acts.  The bill sets conditions for 
the use of interpreters in execution notarial acts.  Finally, the bill repeals obsolete language requiring 
that a notary include the expiration date of his or her office on certificates of notarial acts. 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the DORA’s 2022 Sunset Review, the SOS is expected to have revenue and expenditures of 
about $72,000 and 2.0 FTE to regulate notary publics. If this bill is enacted, current revenue and 
expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2024-25.  This continuing revenue is subject 
to the state TABOR limits.  If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on September 1, 2024, 
followed by a wind-down period, and state revenue and expenditures will decrease starting in 
FY 2024-25 by the amounts shown in Table 1. The changes to the program that drive additional 
revenue and costs are discussed in the State Revenue and State Expenditures sections below. 
State Revenue 
The bill may increase business filing fee revenue by up to $107,925 in FY 2023-24 and up to $42,339 in 
FY 2024-25, paid to the Department of State Cash Fund. 
 
Fee impact on businesses and professions. Colorado law requires legislative service agency 
review of measures which create or increase any fee collected by a state agency. To cover the costs 
described in the State Expenditures section below, notary registration and other business filing 
fees may need to be raised to cover all or some of the costs of this bill.  The fees affected and the 
actual amount of fee charges will be set administratively by the DOS based on cash fund balance, 
total program costs, and the estimated number of professional activities subject to fees.  This 
revenue is subject to TABOR. 
   Page 3 
August 3, 2023  SB 23-153  
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the SOS by $107,925 in FY 2023-24, and by $42,339 in 
FY 2024-25, paid from the Department of State Cash Fund.  New expenditures are displayed in Table 3 
and described below. 
 
Table 3 
Expenditures Under SB 23-153 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Secretary of State   
Personal Services 	$38,953  $23,919  
Operating Expenses 	$945  $675  
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670  	- 
Economic Consultant 	$50,000  $10,000  
Centrally Appropriated Costs
1
 	$11,357  $7,745  
Total Cost $107,925  $42,339  
Total FTE 0.7 FTE 0.5 FTE 
1
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
   
Personal services. The Business and Licensing Division in the SOS will have increased costs for 
additional management, technical and administrative staff totaling 0.7 FTE in FY 2023-24, which 
reduces to 0.5 FTE in FY 2024-25 and subsequent years.  Staff are needed to adopt rules for notary fees 
and the use of translators and interpreters, to update website and informational documents, and for 
customer support.  
 
Economic consultant. When adopting rules to set notary public fees, the SOS will work with an 
outside economist or consultant to conduct market research, and make recommendations on 
appropriate fee amounts and a schedule for revising rules and fees.  This work will be most significant 
in FY 2023-24 and less involved in subsequent years. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs associated 
with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally appropriated in the Long 
Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill.  These costs, which include employee 
insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are shown in Table 3. 
 
TABOR refunds.  The bill is expected to increase the amount of state revenue required to be refunded 
to taxpayers by the amounts shown in the State Revenue section above.  This estimate assumes the 
December 2022 LCS revenue forecast.  A forecast of state revenue subject to TABOR is not available 
beyond FY 2024-25.  Because TABOR refunds are paid from the General Fund, increased cash fund 
revenue will reduce the amount of General Fund available to spend or save. 
 
   Page 4 
August 3, 2023  SB 23-153  
 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 17, 2023. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the enacted bill includes an appropriation of $96,568 to the Secretary of State from the 
Department of State Cash Fund. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law  Secretary of State 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.