Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB159 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/03/2023

                    First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 23-0313.01 Josh Schultz x5486
SENATE BILL 23-159
Senate Committees	House Committees
Agriculture & Natural Resources
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE CONTINUATION OF THE COLORADO FOOD SYSTEMS101
ADVISORY COUNCIL , AND, IN CONNECTION THEREWITH ,102
EXTENDING THE SUNSET DATE BY THREE YEARS AND MAKING AN
103
APPROPRIATION.104
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Sunset Process - Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources
Committee. The Colorado food systems advisory council established
within Colorado state university is scheduled to repeal on September 1,
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 3, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
March 31, 2023
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Hinrichsen and Pelton B., Pelton R., Priola, Simpson, Buckner, Cutter, Exum, Ginal,
Gonzales, Hansen, Marchman, Winter F.
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Boesenecker and Lindsay, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. 2023. The bill extends the sunset date until September 1, 2030.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-3-1203, repeal2
(14)(a)(X); and add (17)(a)(VII) as follows:3
2-3-1203.  Sunset review of advisory committees - legislative4
declaration - definition - repeal. (14) (a)  The following statutory5
authorizations for the designated advisory committees are scheduled for6
repeal on September 1, 2023:7
(X)  The Colorado food systems advisory council created in part8
11 of article 31 of title 23;9
(17) (a)  The following statutory authorizations for the designated10
advisory committees will repeal on September 1, 2026:11
(VII)  T
HE COLORADO FOOD SYSTEMS ADVISORY COUNCIL
12
CREATED IN SECTION 23-31-1102.13
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-31-1102, amend14
(2)(b) introductory portion; and add (2)(b)(XII) and (2.1) as follows:15
23-31-1102.  Colorado food systems advisory council - created16
- membership - terms - vacancies. (2)  The council consists of:17
(b)  Sixteen SEVENTEEN members appointed ON A ROTATING BASIS18
IN THE ORDER LISTED IN THIS SUBSECTION (2)(b), AS NEW POSITIONS OR19
VACANCIES ARISE, by the governor or the governor's designee THE20
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES , THE MINORITY LEADER OF21
THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES , THE PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE, AND22
THE MINORITY LEADER OF THE SENATE , as follows:23
(XII)  O
NE MEMBER WHO IS A REPRESENTATIVE OF A FOOD BANK .
24
(2.1)  I
F TWO NEW POSITIONS OR VACANCIES LISTED IN SUBSECTION
25
159-2- (2)(b) OF THIS SECTION OPEN SIMULTANEOUSLY , THE INDIVIDUAL FIRST1
SCHEDULED TO APPOINT PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (2)(b) OF THIS SECTION2
SHALL CHOOSE WHICH POSITION TO APPOINT .3
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-31-1103, amend4
(1)(a), (1)(a)(III), and (1)(b); and add (1)(b.5) and (3) as follows:5
23-31-1103.  Council - purpose and duties. (1)  The purposes6
PURPOSE of the council include IS TO GROW LOCAL, REGIONAL, AND7
STATEWIDE FOOD ECONOMIES WITHIN WHICH PR ODUCERS HAVE ACCESS TO8
NEW MARKETS AND LOW -INCOME POPULATIONS HAVE ACCESS TO FRESH ,9
AFFORDABLE, AND HEALTHY FOODS. DUTIES OF THE COUNCIL INCLUDE:10
(a)  Growing local, regional, and statewide food economies within11
which producers have access to new markets and low-income populations12
have access to fresh, affordable, and healthy foods. The council will13
collaborate and coordinate COLLABORATING AND COORDINATING with14
agricultural producers, relevant state and federal educational institutions,15
nongovernmental organizations, and consumers to connect state and16
federal agencies and to provide Colorado agricultural producers,17
including fruit and vegetable producers, with viable market opportunities.18
Areas of focus include:19
(III)  Supporting the implementation of the recommendations in20
the Colorado blueprint of food and agriculture project, ensuring that the21
recommendations in the blueprint, or its successor project, are updated as22
needed, and ensuring alignment with other state or local food plans if23
relevant. EXAMINING BEST PRACTICES TO ADVANCE OR IMPROVE24
DISTRIBUTION SYSTEMS AND DEVELOP NEW MARKETS FOR COLORADO25
AGRICULTURAL PRODUCERS .26
(b)  Conducting research regarding national best practices27
159
-3- regarding food and nutrition assistance, direct and intermediated market1
development, institutional procurement, and farm-to-school programs; as2
well as other priorities determined by the council;3
(b.5)  S
ERVING AS A RESOURCE FOR RESEARCH AND SUPPORT AT
4
THE REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR , MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY ,5
OR ANY STATE AGENCY IN CONNECTION WITH THE C OUNCIL	'S PURPOSE AND6
DUTIES IN SUBSECTIONS (1)(a) AND (1)(b) OF THIS SECTION;7
(3)  T
HE COUNCIL SHALL ACCEPT AND CONSIDER PUBLIC COMMENT
8
REGARDING ANY RESEARCH OR REPORTS CREATED BY THE COUNCIL9
PURSUANT TO SUBSECTIONS (1)(b) AND (1)(b.5) OF THIS SECTION. THE10
COUNCIL SHALL RECEIVE PUBLIC COMMENT FOR A MINIMUM OF SIXTY11
DAYS.12
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-31-1104, repeal13
(2) as follows:14
23-31-1104.  Subcommittees of the council. (2)  The council may15
engage in any other activity the council determines is necessary to16
accomplish the purposes outlined in this part 11.17
SECTION 5. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 23-31-110618
as follows:19
23-31-1106.  Reports - recommendations. Notwithstanding20
section 24-1-136 (11)(a)(I), no later than January 31, 2021, and January21
31 every other year thereafter, the council shall report the information22
specified in section 23-31-1103 (1)(d) 
AND PROVIDE A SUMMARY OF THE
23
COUNCIL'S ACTIVITIES FROM THE PRIOR YEAR AND A SUMMARY OF THE24
COUNCIL'S PLANNED ACTIVITIES FOR THE UPCOMING YEAR to the house25
rural affairs and agriculture AGRICULTURE, WATER, AND NATURAL26
RESOURCES committee and the senate agriculture and natural resources27
159
-4- committee, or their successor committees.1
SECTION 6. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 23-31-11072
as follows:3
23-31-1107.  Repeal of part. This part 11 is repealed, effective4
September 1, 2023 SEPTEMBER 1, 2026. Before the repeal, this part 11 is5
scheduled for review in accordance with section 2-3-1203.6
SECTION 7. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 23-3.3-103, add (12)7
as follows:8
23-3.3-103.  Annual appropriations - repeal. (12) (a)  T
HE
9
PROVISIONS OF SUBSECTION (1) OF THIS SECTION CONCERNING10
APPROPRIATIONS FOR STUDENT FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE UNDER THIS11
ARTICLE 3.3 DO NOT APPLY TO APPROPRIATIONS MADE FOR THE PURPOSE12
OF THE COLORADO FOOD SYSTEMS ADVISORY C OUNCIL PURSUANT TO PART13
11
 OF ARTICLE 31 OF THIS TITLE 23.
14
(b)  T
HIS SUBSECTION (12) IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE SEPTEMBER 1,
15
2026.16
SECTION 8. Appropriation. (1)  For the 2023-24 state fiscal17
year, $151,068 is appropriated to the department of higher education. This18
appropriation is from the general fund. To implement this act, the19
department may use this appropriation for the college opportunity fund20
program to be used for limited purpose fee-for-service contracts with21
state institutions.22
(2)  For the 2023-24 state fiscal year, $151,068 is appropriated to23
the department of higher education. This appropriation is from24
reappropriated funds received from the limited purpose fee-for-service25
contracts with state institutions under subsection (1) of this section. To26
implement this act, the department may use this appropriation for the27
159
-5- board of governors of the Colorado state university system for the food1
systems advisory council, which amount is based on an assumption that2
the board of governors will require an additional 1.0 FTE.3
SECTION 9. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act4
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the5
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except6
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V7
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this8
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take9
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in10
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the11
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.12
159
-6-