Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB159 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/19/2023

                    Page 1 
July 19, 2023  SB 23-159  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0313  
Sen. Hinrichsen; Pelton B. 
Rep. Boesenecker; Lindsay  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 19, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: SUNSET COLORADO FOOD SYSTEMS ADVISORY COUNCIL  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Sunset Bill. This bill continues the Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council in 
Colorado State University, which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2023.  State 
fiscal impacts under the bill include only the continuation of the advisory council’s 
current expenditures.  The council is continued through September 1, 2030. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $151,068 to the 
Department of Higher Education, for use by Colorado State University. See State 
Appropriations section.  
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-159
1 
 
New Impacts 
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue  	-       	-       
Expenditures  	-       	-       
Other Budget Impacts  	-       	-       
 
Continuing Impacts   
Revenue 
 
-       	-       
Expenditures 	General Fund $151,068       $151,068       
 	Continuing FTE 1.0 FTE       1.0 FTE 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $22,660       $22,660       
1
 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill, and the continuing impacts from 
extending the program beyond its current repeal date. Because the bill continues a program without making any 
changes, there are no new impacts.  The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is not passed and the program 
is allowed to repeal.   Page 2 
July 19, 2023  SB 23-159  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill extends the Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council by three years, until September 1, 2026. 
It is currently set to repeal on September 1, 2023.  The bill also makes the following changes to the 
council: 
 
 modifies the membership of the council and the associated appointment authorities;  
 modifies the purpose of the council and limits the authority of the council to engage in activities 
not specified in law; 
 requires the council to accept public comment on any research or reports for at least sixty days 
prior to publication;  
 restores language exempting appropriations for the council from the requirements related to 
student financial assistance; and 
 modifies council reporting requirements. 
Background 
The Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council within Colorado State University (CSU) is charged 
with increasing access to healthy food and assisting with the growth of local food systems in the 
agricultural sector.  It is made up of 22 members and typically meets quarterly.  The council is 
authorized to accept gifts, grants, and donations that are consistent with their purpose.  Members are 
reimbursed for travel expenses and staff support is provided by CSU. The sunset report for the 
advisory council is available here. 
Continuing Program Impacts 
Based on the FY 2022-23 Long Bill appropriation for the council’s fee-for-service contract between the 
Department of Higher Education and CSU, the council is expected to have annual expenditures of 
$151,068.  This covers the cost of 1.0 FTE, operating expenses, and board expenses and travel.  If this 
bill is enacted, these current expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2023-24.  If this 
bill is not enacted, the program will end on September 1, 2023.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload for the council to modify procedures to align with the bill’s new 
requirements.  Because the committee and CSU can adjust how the fee-for-service contract is spent 
and costs have been lower than anticipated in recent years, any new costs can be accomplished within 
current appropriations.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 2, 2023, and takes effect on August 7, 2023, 
assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
  Page 3 
July 19, 2023  SB 23-159  
 
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $151,068 from the General Fund to 
the Department of Higher Education, for use by the governing board of Colorado State University.  
State and Local Government Contacts  
Higher Education 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.