Page 1 July 19, 2023 SB 23-159 Legislative Council Staff Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature Final Fiscal Note Drafting Number: Prime Sponsors: LLS 23-0313 Sen. Hinrichsen; Pelton B. Rep. Boesenecker; Lindsay Date: Bill Status: Fiscal Analyst: July 19, 2023 Signed into Law Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 anna.gerstle@coleg.gov Bill Topic: SUNSET COLORADO FOOD SYSTEMS ADVISORY COUNCIL Summary of Fiscal Impact: ☐ State Revenue ☒ State Expenditure ☐ State Transfer ☐ TABOR Refund ☐ Local Government ☐ Statutory Public Entity Sunset Bill. This bill continues the Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council in Colorado State University, which is scheduled to repeal on September 1, 2023. State fiscal impacts under the bill include only the continuation of the advisory council’s current expenditures. The council is continued through September 1, 2030. Appropriation Summary: For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $151,068 to the Department of Higher Education, for use by Colorado State University. See State Appropriations section. Fiscal Note Status: This fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. Table 1 State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-159 1 New Impacts Budget Year FY 2023-24 Out Year FY 2024-25 Revenue - - Expenditures - - Other Budget Impacts - - Continuing Impacts Revenue - - Expenditures General Fund $151,068 $151,068 Continuing FTE 1.0 FTE 1.0 FTE Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $22,660 $22,660 1 Table 1 shows the new impacts resulting from changes to the program under the bill, and the continuing impacts from extending the program beyond its current repeal date. Because the bill continues a program without making any changes, there are no new impacts. The continuing program impacts will end if the bill is not passed and the program is allowed to repeal. Page 2 July 19, 2023 SB 23-159 Summary of Legislation The bill extends the Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council by three years, until September 1, 2026. It is currently set to repeal on September 1, 2023. The bill also makes the following changes to the council: modifies the membership of the council and the associated appointment authorities; modifies the purpose of the council and limits the authority of the council to engage in activities not specified in law; requires the council to accept public comment on any research or reports for at least sixty days prior to publication; restores language exempting appropriations for the council from the requirements related to student financial assistance; and modifies council reporting requirements. Background The Colorado Food Systems Advisory Council within Colorado State University (CSU) is charged with increasing access to healthy food and assisting with the growth of local food systems in the agricultural sector. It is made up of 22 members and typically meets quarterly. The council is authorized to accept gifts, grants, and donations that are consistent with their purpose. Members are reimbursed for travel expenses and staff support is provided by CSU. The sunset report for the advisory council is available here. Continuing Program Impacts Based on the FY 2022-23 Long Bill appropriation for the council’s fee-for-service contract between the Department of Higher Education and CSU, the council is expected to have annual expenditures of $151,068. This covers the cost of 1.0 FTE, operating expenses, and board expenses and travel. If this bill is enacted, these current expenditures will continue for the program starting in FY 2023-24. If this bill is not enacted, the program will end on September 1, 2023. State Expenditures The bill increases workload for the council to modify procedures to align with the bill’s new requirements. Because the committee and CSU can adjust how the fee-for-service contract is spent and costs have been lower than anticipated in recent years, any new costs can be accomplished within current appropriations. Effective Date The bill was signed into law by the Governor on June 2, 2023, and takes effect on August 7, 2023, assuming no referendum petition is filed. Page 3 July 19, 2023 SB 23-159 State Appropriations For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $151,068 from the General Fund to the Department of Higher Education, for use by the governing board of Colorado State University. State and Local Government Contacts Higher Education The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each fiscal year. For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit: leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.