First Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REREVISED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted in the Second House LLS NO. 23-0473.01 Shelby Ross x4510 SENATE BILL 23-176 Senate Committees House Committees Health & Human Services Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING MEASURES TO IMPROV E OUTCOMES FOR INDIVIDUALS101 WITH AN EATING DISORDER .102 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov .) The bill prohibits certain health benefit plans or the state medical assistance program from utilizing the body mass index, ideal body weight, or any other standard requiring an achieved weight when determining medical necessity criteria or appropriate level of care for an individual with a diagnosed eating disorder. The bill prohibits a retail establishment from selling, transferring, HOUSE 3rd Reading Unamended May 7, 2023 HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading May 6, 2023 SENATE Amended 3rd Reading April 25, 2023 SENATE Amended 2nd Reading April 24, 2023 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Moreno and Cutter, Buckner, Coleman, Exum, Fenberg, Hansen, Kolker, Marchman, Mullica, Priola, Roberts, Winter F. HOUSE SPONSORSHIP deGruy Kennedy and Bradley, Amabile, Bird, Boesenecker, Brown, Dickson, Duran, Froelich, Jodeh, Kipp, Lieder, Lindsay, McCluskie, McCormick, Michaelson Jenet, Ricks, Sirota, Snyder, Story, Titone, Valdez, Young Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. or otherwise furnishing dietary supplements for weight loss or over-the-counter diet pills to any individual under 18 years of age without a prescription. The bill requires the behavioral health administration (BHA) to promulgate rules concerning forced feeding tubes for individuals with an eating disorder. No later than July 1, 2024, the bill requires the BHA to require all eating disorder treatment and recovery facilities to hold an appropriate designation based on the level of care the facility provides. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 10-16-1582 as follows:3 10-16-158. Prohibition on using the body mass index or ideal4 body weight - medical necessity criteria - rules. (1) (a) E VERY HEALTH 5 BENEFIT PLAN SUBJECT TO PART 2, 3, OR 4 OF THIS ARTICLE 16, EXCEPT6 THOSE DESCRIBED IN SECTION 10-16-102 (32)(b), SHALL NOT UTILIZE THE7 BODY MASS INDEX, IDEAL BODY WEIGHT, OR ANY OTHER STANDARD8 REQUIRING AN ACHIEVED WEIGHT WHEN DETERMINING MEDICAL9 NECESSITY OR THE APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL10 DIAGNOSED WITH AN EATING DISORDER , INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO11 BULIMIA NERVOSA, ATYPICAL ANOREXIA NERVOSA , BINGE-EATING12 DISORDER, AVOIDANT RESTRICTIVE FOOD INTAKE DISORDER , AND OTHER13 SPECIFIED FEEDING AND EATING DISORDERS AS DEFINED IN THE MOST14 RECENT EDITION OF THE DIAGNOSTIC AND STATISTICAL MANUAL OF15 M ENTAL DISORDERS. 16 (b) S UBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION DOES NOT APPLY WHEN 17 DETERMINING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE18 FOR AN INDIVIDUAL DIAGNOSED WITH ANOREXIA NERVOSA , RESTRICTING19 SUBTYPE, OR BINGE-EATING/PURGING SUBTYPE; HOWEVER, BODY MASS20 176-2- INDEX, IDEAL BODY WEIGHT, OR ANY OTHER STANDARD REQUIRING AN1 ACHIEVED BODY WEIGHT MUST NOT BE THE DETERMINING FACTOR WHEN2 ASSESSING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR3 AN INDIVIDUAL DIAGNOSED WITH ANOREXIA NERVOSA , RESTRICTING4 SUBTYPE, OR BINGE-EATING/PURGING SUBTYPE.5 (2) T HE FOLLOWING FACTORS , AT A MINIMUM , MUST BE 6 CONSIDERED WHEN DETERMINING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE7 APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL DIAGNOSED WITH AN8 EATING DISORDER:9 (a) T HE INDIVIDUAL'S EATING BEHAVIORS; 10 (b) T HE INDIVIDUAL'S NEED FOR SUPERVISED MEALS AND SUPPORT 11 INTERVENTIONS;12 (c) L ABORATORY RESULTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE 13 INDIVIDUAL'S HEART RATE, RENAL OR CARDIOVASCULAR ACTIVITY , AND14 BLOOD PRESSURE;15 (d) T HE RECOVERY ENVIRONMENT ; AND 16 (e) C O-OCCURRING DISORDERS THE INDIVIDUAL MAY HAVE . 17 (3) T HE COMMISSIONER MAY PROMULGATE RULES AS NECESSARY 18 TO IMPLEMENT AND ENFORCE THIS SECTION .19 SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 25.5-5-334 as20 follows:21 25.5-5-334. Prohibition on using the body mass index or ideal22 body weight - medical necessity criteria. (1) (a) B EGINNING JULY 1, 23 2023, THE STATE MEDICAL ASSISTANCE PROGRAM SHALL NOT UTILIZE THE 24 BODY MASS INDEX, IDEAL BODY WEIGHT, OR ANY OTHER STANDARD25 REQUIRING AN ACHIEVED WEIGHT WHEN DETERMINING MEDICAL26 NECESSITY OR THE APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL27 176 -3- DIAGNOSED WITH AN EATING DISORDER , INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO,1 BULIMIA NERVOSA, ATYPICAL ANOREXIA NERVOSA , BINGE-EATING2 DISORDER, AVOIDANT RESTRICTIVE FOOD INTAKE DISORDER , AND OTHER3 SPECIFIED FEEDING AND EATING DISORDERS AS DEFINED IN THE MOST4 RECENT EDITION OF THE DIAGNOSTIC AND STATISTICAL MANUAL OF5 M ENTAL DISORDERS. 6 (b) S UBSECTION (1)(a) OF THIS SECTION DOES NOT APPLY WHEN 7 DETERMINING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE8 FOR AN INDIVIDUAL DIAGNOSED WITH ANOREXIA NERVOSA , RESTRICTING9 SUBTYPE; HOWEVER, BODY MASS INDEX, IDEAL BODY WEIGHT, OR ANY10 OTHER STANDARD REQUIRING AN ACHIEVED BODY WEIGHT MUST NOT BE11 THE DETERMINING FACTOR WHEN ASSESSING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE12 APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL DIAGNOSED WITH13 ANOREXIA NERVOSA, RESTRICTING SUBTYPE.14 (2) T HE FOLLOWING FACTORS , AT A MINIMUM , MUST BE 15 CONSIDERED WHEN DETERMINING MEDICAL NECESSITY OR THE16 APPROPRIATE LEVEL OF CARE FOR AN INDIVIDUAL DI AGNOSED WITH AN17 EATING DISORDER:18 (a) T HE INDIVIDUAL'S EATING BEHAVIORS; 19 (b) T HE INDIVIDUAL'S NEED FOR SUPERVISED MEALS AND SUPPORT 20 INTERVENTIONS;21 (c) L ABORATORY RESULTS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE 22 INDIVIDUAL'S HEART RATE, RENAL OR CARDIOVASCULAR ACTIVITY , AND23 BLOOD PRESSURE;24 (d) T HE RECOVERY ENVIRONMENT ; AND 25 (e) C O-OCCURRING DISORDERS THE INDIVIDUAL MAY HAVE . 26 27 176 -4- 1 SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add article 26 to title2 6 as follows:3 ARTICLE 264 Regulation Of Dietary Supplements For Weight Loss5 6-26-101. Definitions. AS USED IN THIS ARTICLE 26, UNLESS THE6 CONTEXT OTHERWISE REQUIRES :7 8 (1) (a) "OVER-THE-COUNTER DIET PILL" MEANS A CLASS OF DRUGS9 THAT ARE LABELED AND MARKETED UNDER THE "FEDERAL FOOD, DRUG,10 AND COSMETIC ACT", 21 U.S.C. SEC. 301 ET SEQ., FOR THE PURPOSE OF11 ACHIEVING WEIGHT LOSS THAT ARE LAWFULLY SOLD , TRANSFERRED, OR12 OTHERWISE FURNISHED WITHOUT A PRESCRIPTION .13 (b) "O VER-THE-COUNTER DIET PILL" INCLUDES PRODUCTS14 MARKETED WITH A DRUG FACTS PANEL PURSUANT TO FEDERAL15 REGULATIONS THAT CONTAIN EITHER APPROVED DRUG INGREDIENTS OR16 INGREDIENTS DEEMED ADULTERATED PURSUANT TO 21 U.S.C. SEC. 342,17 OR BOTH.18 (2) "RETAIL ESTABLISHMENT" MEANS ANY VENDOR THAT, IN THE19 REGULAR COURSE OF BUSINESS, SELLS OVER-THE-COUNTER DIET PILLS20 AT RETAIL DIRECTLY TO THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO,21 PHARMACIES, GROCERY STORES, OTHER RETAIL STORES, AND VENDORS22 THAT ACCEPT ORDERS PLACED BY MAIL , TELEPHONE, ELECTRONIC MAIL,23 INTERNET WEBSITE, ONLINE CATALOG, OR SOFTWARE APPLICATION.24 6-26-102. Over-the-counter diet pills - prohibition on selling25 to persons under eighteen years of age - deceptive trade practice - 26 rules. (1) (a) A RETAIL ESTABLISHMENT SHALL NOT SELL, TRANSFER, OR27 176 -5- OTHERWISE FURNISH OVER-THE-COUNTER DIET PILLS TO ANY PERSON1 UNDER EIGHTEEN YEARS OF AGE .2 (b) A RETAIL ESTABLISHMENT SHALL REQUEST VALID3 IDENTIFICATION FROM ANY PERSON WHO ATTEMPTS TO PURCHASE 4 OVER-THE-COUNTER DIET PILLS IF THAT PERSON REASONABLY APPEARS TO5 THE RETAIL ESTABLISHMENT TO BE UNDER EIGHTEEN YEARS OF AGE .6 (2) A VIOLATION OF THIS ARTICLE 26 IS A DECEPTIVE TRADE7 PRACTICE PURSUANT TO SECTION 6-1-105 (1)(uuu).8 SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 6-1-105, add9 (1)(uuu) as follows:10 6-1-105. Unfair or deceptive trade practices. (1) A person11 engages in a deceptive trade practice when, in the course of the person's12 business, vocation, or occupation, the person:13 (uuu) SELLS OR OFFERS FOR SALE A PRODUCT THAT IS14 AGE-RESTRICTED TO A PERSON WHO DOES NOT MEET THE AGE15 RESTRICTION.16 17 SECTION 5. Effective date. This act takes effect upon passage;18 except that section 1 of this act takes effect January 1, 2024, and section19 3 of this act takes effect July 1, 2024.20 SECTION 6. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,21 determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate22 preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.23 176 -6-