Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB176 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/07/2023

                    Page 1 
July 7, 2023  SB 23-176  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0473  
Sen. Moreno; Cutter 
Rep. deGruy Kennedy 
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 7, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Shukria Maktabi | 303-866-4720 
shukria.maktabi@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PROTECTIONS FOR PEOPLE WITH AN EATING DISORDER  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates prohibitions and requirements related to health care services for 
individuals with disordered eating.  The bill minimally increases state expenditures in 
FY 2023-24 and may increase state revenue and local expenditures beginning in 
FY 2024-25.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill prohibits Medicaid, starting July 1, 2023, and health insurance plans, starting January 1, 2024, 
from using body mass index, ideal body weight, or any achieved weight standard to determine 
medical need or the level of care for individuals with certain types of disordered eating.  The bill also 
prohibits retail establishments from selling over-the-counter diet pills to individuals under 
18-years-old without prescriptions beginning July 1, 2024, with rules to be created by the Department 
of Regulatory Agencies (DORA) and failure to comply constituting a deceptive trade practice under 
the Colorado Consumer Protection Act.  
State Revenue 
The bill may increase state revenue from civil penalties and filing fees beginning in FY 2024-25. 
 
Civil penalties. Under the Colorado Consumer Protection Act, a person committing a deceptive trade 
practice may be subject to a civil penalty of up to $20,000 for each violation.  Additional penalties may 
be imposed for subsequent violations of a court order or injunction.  This revenue is classified as a 
damage award and not subject to TABOR.  Given the uncertainty about the number of cases that may 
be pursued by the Attorney General and district attorneys, as well as the wide range in potential 
penalty amounts, the fiscal note cannot estimate the potential impact of these civil penalties.    Page 2 
July 7, 2023  SB 23-176  
 
 
 
Filing fees.  The bill may increase revenue to the Judicial Department from an increase in civil case 
filings. Revenue from filing fees is subject to TABOR. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state workload for DORA and the Department of Health Care Policy and Financing 
in FY 2023-24 and may increase state workload for the Department of Law and the Judicial 
Department beginning in FY 2024-25, as discussed below.  
 
Department of Regulatory Agencies.  Workload in the Division of Insurance and the State Board of 
Pharmacy, both located within DORA, will increase by a minimal amount starting in FY 2023-24.  
Specifically, these divisions will need to update rules, conduct outreach with health insurance carriers 
and retail establishments, and respond to consumer inquiries and complaints.  It is assumed that this 
work can be accomplished within existing appropriations. 
 
Department of Health Care Policy and Financing.  Any impact from the prohibition on using certain 
metrics to determine medical necessity is anticipated to have a minimal effect on the number of 
Medicaid members with disordered eating from being admitted and discharged from residential 
facilities, or the length of time members stay in such facilities.  Any changes in utilization will be 
addressed through the annual budget process. 
 
Department of Law.  Workload in the Department of Law will minimally increase to the extent that 
deceptive trade practice complaints are filed. The department will review complaints under the bill 
and prioritize investigations as necessary within the overall number of deceptive trade practice 
complaints and available resources.  
 
Judicial Department.  The trial courts in the Judicial Department may have an increase in cases filed 
under the Colorado Consumer Protection Act from the addition of a new deceptive trade practice.  It 
is assumed that online marketplaces will abide by the law and that any violation of the legislation will 
result in minimal number of new cases.  The fiscal note assumes that this can be accomplished within 
existing resources and that no change in appropriations is required. 
Local Government 
Similar to the state, to the extent district attorneys receive deceptive trade practice complaints related 
to the new deceptive trade practice under the bill, workload will increase to investigate complaints 
and seek relief when appropriate.  It is assumed most such cases will be handled at the state level by 
the Attorney General. 
Effective Date 
This bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on May 30, 2023. 
   Page 3 
July 7, 2023  SB 23-176  
 
 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Behavioral Health Administration  Corrections          
Health Care Policy and Financing  Higher Education  
Human Services        Information Technology 
Law  Public Health and Environment 
Regulatory Agencies  Revenue 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.