Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB241 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/16/2023

                    Page 1 
May 16, 2023  SB 23-241  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
   
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0902  
Sen. Bridges; Kirkmeyer 
Rep. Bird; Bockenfeld  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 16, 2023 
Signed into Law 
Anna Gerstle | 303-866-4375 
anna.gerstle@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CREATION OF OFFICE OF SCHOOL SAFETY  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
Budget package bill.  The bill creates the Office of School Safety, a new crisis 
response unit, and provides funding for school safety related programs.  The bill 
increases state expenditures on an ongoing basis and continues a state transfer for 
five years. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $26.1 million for the 
Department of Public Safety. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
This fiscal note reflects the enacted bill.  The bill was recommended by the Joint 
Budget Committee as part of its FY 2023-24 budget package. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-241 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund $20,715,551  $3,489,746  
 	Cash Funds $5,396,491  $10,396,491  
 
Total Expenditures $26,112,042  $13,886,237  
 	Total FTE       18.1 FTE                18.8 FTE  
Transfers 	State Public School Fund 	-  ($5,000,000)  
 	SAFER Grant Program Cash Fund 	- $5,000,000 
 	Total Transfer 	- 	$0 
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve $3,107,333 $523,462 
 
    Page 2 
May 16, 2023  SB 23-241  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates the Office of School Safety (office) in the Department of Public Safety (DPS) and 
charges the office with: 
 
 overseeing the School Safety Resource Center (SSRC); 
 implementing a newly created crisis response unit to assist schools in responding to a crisis or 
emergency event;  
 overseeing the School Access for Emergency Response Grant Program (SAFER), which is currently 
in the Division of Homeland Security in DPS; and 
 administering a new Youth Violence Prevention Grant Program to provide grants of up to 
$100,000 to schools, community organizations and local governments to address youth violence. 
 
The bill requires that the director of the office must appoint a grants manger to obtain funds and grants 
related to school safety.  It also makes one-time SSRC reporting requirements permanent; specifies 
that the school security disbursement program funds may be used to implement a co-responder or 
school resource officer program; and continues the SAFER program for five years, until July 1, 2029. 
State Transfers 
Under current law, the SAFER program receives an annual transfer of $5.0 million from the State 
Public School Fund to the SAFER Grant Program Cash Fund.  The fiscal note assumes that this transfer 
will continue each year through July 1, 2028. 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in DPS by $26.1 million in FY 2023-24 and $13.9 million in 
FY 2024-25, paid from the General Fund and a variety of cash funds.  Of this amount, $6.7 million 
represents funding for existing programs, as the bill includes both appropriations for existing 
programs and additional funding for the programs discussed below.  New staff costs are prorated in 
the first year. 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under SB 23-241 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 
Department of Public Safety   
Existing Programs (10.3 FTE) 	$6,715,321  $6,715,321  
Administrative Services (4.0 FTE) 	$949,290  $991,422  
Crisis Response Unit (4.0 FTE) 	$1,144,023  $876,079  
Threat Assessment (0.5 FTE) 	$303,408  $303,415  
School Security Disbursement Grants 	$16,000,000  	-  
SAFER Program Continuation   $5,000,000  
Youth Violence Prevention Grants 	$1,000,000  
Total Cost $26,112,042  $13,886,237  
Total FTE 18.1 FTE 18.8 FTE  Page 3 
May 16, 2023  SB 23-241  
 
 
Existing school safety programs.  The bill includes the appropriation for existing school safety 
programs in the SSRC, which is $6.7 million and 10.3 FTE.  Funding for these programs is not included 
in the Long Bill, and is assumed to be appropriated in this bill. 
 
Administrative services.  The bill includes funding for 2.0 FTE for administrative support for the 
office, including the office director and grant support, and 1.0 FTE to support the new office in the 
Executive Director’s Office.  It also provides an increase of $460,000 and 1.0 FTE for the SSRC.  Costs 
include associated employee insurance and indirect costs.  
 
Crisis response unit.  The bill includes about $1.1 million for the new crisis response unit, which will 
be staffed by 4.0 FTE.  The unit will assist schools with responding to emergency situations.  
 
Threat assessment.  The bill includes about $303,000 to provide threat assessment training for school 
threat assessment teams.  A portion of the funding will cover the cost of 0.5 FTE for data collection 
and research related to the effectiveness of threat assessments and interventions; the remainder is used 
for training. 
 
School security disbursement grants.  In FY 2023-24 only, the bill includes $16.0 million for the 
existing School Security Disbursement Program, which provides grants for schools to improve 
security and provide training.  
 
SAFER program continuation. Beginning in FY 2024-25, the bill increases state expenditures by $5.0 
million per year, paid from the SAFER Grant Program Cash Fund, and continuing until the program’s 
new repeal date on July 1, 2029. This amount represents a continuation of current annual expenditures 
of $5.0 million and 1.0 FTE. After the administrative costs, the program distributes about $4.8 million 
annually in grants to school districts and local governments. 
 
Youth violence prevention grants. The bill provides $1.0 million in FY 2023-24 for a new youth 
violence prevention grant program. Grants are up to $100,000 per organization and will be determined 
by the office. The fiscal note assumes that a portion of the funding may be used for administrative 
expenses; however, any administrative expenses are assumed to be minimal due to the one-time 
nature of the program. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve.  Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve.  Based on this fiscal note, the 
bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts shown in 
Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor and took effect on April 27, 2023.  
  Page 4 
May 16, 2023  SB 23-241  
 
 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2023-24, the bill requires and includes the following appropriations to the Department of Public 
Safety, and 18.1 FTE: 
 
 $20,715,551 from the General Fund; 
 $5,000,000 from the School Access for Emergency Response Grant Program Cash Fund; 
 $250,000 from the Marijuana Tax Cash Fund; and  
 $146,491 from the School Safety Resource Center Cash Fund.  
State and Local Government Contacts 
Joint Budget Committee Staff 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.