Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB277 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 04/17/2023

                    Page 1 
April 17, 2023  SB 23-277  
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Fiscal Note  
  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0992  
Sen. Buckner 
  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
April 17, 2023 
Senate Local Government  
Josh Abram | 303-866-3561 
josh.abram@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: PUBLIC SAFETY PROGRAMS EXTENDED USES  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☐ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill revises and extends grant programs in the Department of Public Safety, and 
extends the authority to spend any remaining funds from appropriations made in the 
current FY 2022-23.  It increases state expenditures beginning in FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The fiscal note reflects the introduced bill and is preliminary. More data must be 
collected to estimate new expenditures beginning FY 2024-25.  This fiscal note will be 
revised when additional information is available. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-277 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Revenue 	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund 	-     up to $12.65 million     
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve  up to $1.9 million 
 
 
    Page 2 
April 17, 2023  SB 23-277  
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill modifies four grant programs in the Department of Public Safety (DPS). 
 
The Crime Prevention Through Safer Streets Grant Program received a one-time appropriation of 
$10.3 million in FY 2022-23. This bill permits the DPS to spend money remaining from that 
appropriation beginning FY 2023-24.  The department must use the remaining funds for the same 
purposes as the original appropriation.  Under current law, the grant program repeals 
November 1, 2023.  This bill extends the program until July 1, 2027. 
 
Under current law, the Law Enforcement Workforce Recruitment, Retention, and Tuition Grant 
Program and the State’s Mission for Assistance in Recruiting and Training Policing (SMART) 
Grant Program both repeal January 1, 2025.  This bill extends the grant programs until July 1, 2027.  
The bill also expands the permissible uses of grant funds, updates reporting requirements, and 
authorizes DPS to provide technical support to assist in grant applications. 
 
The Behavioral Information and Data-Sharing Program received a one-time appropriation of 
$3.5 million in FY 2022-23. This bill permits the department to spend money remaining from that 
appropriation in FY 2023-24. Any money that is not expended or obligated by December 30, 2024, 
reverts to the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 Cash Fund. 
State Expenditures 
The bill extends spending authority for appropriations made to the DPS for the current FY 2022-23.  
No estimate has been provided of the amounts remaining from the $13.8 million appropriations or an 
estimate of the amount to be spent in the next two fiscal years.  This fiscal note will be updated when 
more information is collected from the DPS.   
 
Beginning FY 2024-25, the bill increases state expenditures by extending the repeal of three grant 
programs.  The Crime Prevention Through Safer Streets Grant Program may continue spending the 
original $10.3 million without additional appropriations; under current law, the other grant programs 
are required to receive $3.8 million in the current FY 2022-23, and in FY 2023-24.  Depending on the 
timing of expenditures and fund balances, the DPS must make a budget request for funding these 
programs as new expenditures beginning sometime in FY 2024-25.   Assuming the General Assembly 
funds the Safer Streets Grant Fund at $5.15 million (one half the original $10.3 million appropriation), 
and continues funding the other programs at $3.75 million annually, total new expenditures beginning 
FY 2024-25 are about $12.7 million.  Because the department has not provided any detail on remaining 
fund balance or estimated future expenditures, this fiscal note will be revised when additional data is 
provided.  
Other Budget Impacts 
This bill will have a General Fund reserve requirement beginning FY 2024-25; however, no estimate is 
available as of this writing. 
  Page 3 
April 17, 2023  SB 23-277  
 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect upon signature of the Governor, or upon becoming law without his signature. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Public Safety 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.