First Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO REVISED LLS NO. M23-0687.01 Rebecca Hausmann x2172 SJM23-002 Senate Committees House Committees SENATE JOINT MEMORIAL 23-002 M EMORIALIZING FORMER SENATOR JOHN (JACK) TAYLOR.101 WHEREAS, John (Jack) W. Taylor, the former Senator, departed1 this life on April 22, 2020, at the age of 84; and2 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was born in Chicago, Illinois, on3 November 22, 1935, to Harvey and Pauline Taylor; and4 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor grew up on a farm in Auburn, Iowa,5 with his brother Robert before attending Iowa State University; and6 WHEREAS, In college, Senator Taylor was in the Navy ROTC7 program and played baseball, in which he excelled, being named All8 Conference at second base and playing for the 1957 Iowa State University9 varsity baseball team that won the Big 7 Conference Championship and10 placed third in the College World Series in Omaha, Nebraska; and11 HOUSE Final Reading February 27, 2023 SENATE Final Reading February 24, 2023 SENATE SPONSORSHIP Roberts, Baisley, Bridges, Coleman, Cutter, Exum, Fenberg, Fields, Gardner, Ginal, Gonzales, Hansen, Hinrichsen, Jaquez Lewis, Kirkmeyer, Kolker, Liston, Lundeen, Marchman, Moreno, Mullica, Pelton B., Pelton R., Priola, Rich, Rodriguez, Simpson, Smallwood, Sullivan, Van Winkle, Will, Winter F., Zenzinger HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Lukens, Amabile, Armagost, Bacon, Bird, Bockenfeld, Boesenecker, Bottoms, Brown, Catlin, Daugherty, DeGraaf, deGruy Kennedy, Dickson, Duran, English, Evans, Frizell, Froelich, Gonzales-Gutierrez, Hamrick, Hartsook, Jodeh, Joseph, Kipp, Lindsay, Lindstedt, Luck, Lynch, Mabrey, Marshall, Martinez, McCluskie, McCormick, McLachlan, Michaelson Jenet, Ortiz, Parenti, Pugliese, Ricks, Sharbini, Sirota, Snyder, Soper, Story, Taggart, Titone, Valdez, Velasco, Vigil, Weinberg, Weissman, Willford, Wilson, Winter T., Woodrow, Young Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. WHEREAS, After college, Senator Taylor joined the Navy and1 served on an icebreaker ship that participated in the International2 Geophysical Year operation in Antarctica, an international scientific3 project that lasted from July 1, 1957, to December 31, 1958; and4 WHEREAS, After serving in the Navy, Senator Taylor moved to5 New Orleans, Louisiana, where he worked for Boeing Aerospace on the6 Apollo Moon Landing Project; and7 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor also spent time in Kuwait, helping to8 build and staff the country's first oil refinery before moving to Steamboat9 Springs, Colorado, in 1969, where he established a real estate business10 and became a partner in a small coal mining operation at Mount Harris;11 and12 WHEREAS, After moving to Steamboat Springs, Senator Taylor13 met his wife, Geneva, whom he married in 1973; and14 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor and Geneva had one daughter, Vicki,15 and two grandchildren, Brianna and Dakin; and16 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor served on several boards and17 commissions, including the Soda Creek Ditch Board, before running for18 the state legislature; and19 WHEREAS, In 1992, Senator Taylor was elected to the Colorado20 House of Representatives, where he served from 1993 to 2000, followed21 by an eight-year term in the Colorado Senate from 2001 to 2008; and22 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was a well-respected and well-liked23 statesman whose legislative career focused on support for the military,24 wildlife, water, and telecommunications; and25 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor sponsored 252 bills, memorials, and26 resolutions in his 16 years in the legislature, 201 of which were enacted,27 including bills on voting, tuition assistance for the National Guard,28 petroleum storage tanks, creation of the Colorado tourism office, waste29 tire recycling, and enterprise zones, among many others; and30 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor served on the Agriculture and31 Business committees in both the House and the Senate and was a member32 002 -2- of the Legislative Audit Committee for 12 years; he also served on joint1 Water committees for 10 years, the joint Police Officers' and Firefighters'2 Pension Reform Commission for five years, and several interim3 committees throughout his tenure; and4 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor felt strongly that it was important to5 fight for Western Slope water, vowing to protect water rights and6 property rights; and7 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor was also instrumental in providing8 better telecommunications access in northwest Colorado; and9 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor also loved working irrigation ditches10 in his neighborhood and mowing the neighborhood Strawberry Park roads11 and some neighbors' driveways with his John Deere tractor; and12 WHEREAS, After serving in the General Assembly, one of13 Senator Taylor's main activities was participating in the Republican Party,14 chairing the Routt County Republican Party twice and partnering with his15 wife, Geneva, to chair various Republican campaigns; and16 WHEREAS, Senator Taylor and Geneva were a team, two17 community leaders who complemented each other and were very strong18 supporters of the community; and19 WHEREAS, Geneva survived Senator Taylor, but passed away20 just six months later on October 15, 2020; now, therefore,21 Be It Resolved by the Senate of the Seventy-fourth General22 Assembly of the State of Colorado, the House of Representatives23 concurring herein:24 That, in the death of Senator Jack Taylor, the people of the state25 of Colorado have lost a devoted public servant and an outstanding citizen,26 and that we, the members of the Seventy-fourth General Assembly, pay27 tribute to Jack Taylor for his years of dedicated public service and do28 hereby extend our deep and heartfelt sympathy to the members of his29 family.30 Be It Further Resolved, That a copy of this Joint Memorial be sent31 to Senator Taylor's daughter and son-in-law, Vicki and Trent Bushner of32 Yuma, Colorado; his granddaughter, Brianna Klamer; his grandson,33 002 -3- Dakin Bushner; and his brother, Robert Taylor of Houston, Texas.1 002 -4-