Second Regular Session Seventy-fourth General Assembly STATE OF COLORADO ENGROSSED This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted on Second Reading in the House of Introduction LLS NO. 24-0423.01 Jennifer Berman x3286 HOUSE BILL 24-1006 House Committees Senate Committees Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Appropriations A BILL FOR AN ACT C ONCERNING ASSISTANCE FOR RURAL COMMUNITIES TO APPLY FOR101 WILDFIRE-RELATED GRANT MONEY, AND, IN CONNECTION102 THEREWITH, MAKING AN APPROPRIATION .103 Bill Summary (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at http://leg.colorado.gov/ .) Wildfire Matters Review Committee. The bill directs the rural opportunity office (office) in the Colorado office of economic development to assist rural communities with identifying and applying for state or federal grants for wildfire mitigation, prevention, response, or risk management efforts (wildfire-related grants). HOUSE Amended 2nd Reading April 29, 2024 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP Velasco and Snyder, SENATE SPONSORSHIP Cutter and Will, Jaquez Lewis, Ginal Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment. Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law. Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. On or before July 1, 2025, and on or before July 1 of every odd year thereafter, the office is required to prepare a report summarizing its work to assist rural communities with identifying and applying for wildfire-related grants. The report must include information about the rural communities that the office assists and the grants awarded to rural communities that the office assists. The office is required to submit the report to the wildfire matters review committee or, if the committee no longer exists, to the legislative committees with jurisdiction over natural resources matters. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, add 23-31-321 as2 follows:3 23-31-321. Wildfire mitigation and preparedness - rural grant4 navigator grant program - creation - administration - reporting -5 definitions. (1) AS USED IN THIS SECTION, UNLESS THE CONTEXT6 OTHERWISE REQUIRES:7 (a) "DEPARTMENT" MEANS THE DEPARTMENT OF LOCAL AFFAIRS8 CREATED IN SECTION 24-1-125.9 (b) "FOREST SERVICE" MEANS THE COLORADO STATE FOREST10 SERVICE IDENTIFIED IN SECTION 23-31-302.11 (c) "NONGOVERNMENTAL ORGANIZATION" OR "NGO" HAS THE12 MEANING SET FORTH IN SECTION 24-37.5-102 (20).13 (d) "RURAL GRANT NAVIGATOR GRANT PROGRAM " OR14 "COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM" MEANS THE COMPETITIVE GRANT15 PROGRAM AUTHORIZED UNDER SUBSECTION (2)(a) OF THIS SECTION.16 (2) (a) THE FOREST SERVICE SHALL ESTABLISH A RURAL GRANT17 NAVIGATOR GRANT PROGRAM TO PROVIDE GRANT MONEY FOR18 NONGOVERNMENTAL ORGANIZATIONS PROVIDING OUTREACH AND19 TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING GRANT WRITING ASSISTANCE , TO20 1006-2- RURAL COMMUNITIES SEEKING TO APPLY FOR FEDERAL OR STATE GRANTS1 RELATED TO WILDFIRE MITIGATION AND PREPAREDNESS .2 (b) ON OR AFTER MARCH 1, 2025, AN NGO ASSISTING ONE OR3 MORE RURAL COMMUNITIES WITH OBTAINING FEDERAL OR STATE GRANTS4 RELATED TO WILDFIRE MITIGATION OR PREPAREDNESS MAY APPLY TO THE5 FOREST SERVICE FOR GRANT MONEY IN ACCORDANCE WITH APPLICATION6 AND ELIGIBILITY GUIDELINES THAT THE FOREST SERVICE ESTABLISHES7 PURSUANT TO SUBSECTION (3) OF THIS SECTION FOR THE COMPETITIVE8 GRANT PROGRAM.9 (3) (a) THE FOREST SERVICE SHALL CONSULT WITH NGOS THAT10 CURRENTLY ASSIST OR ARE SEEKING TO ASSIST COLORADO COMMUNITIES11 WITH WILDFIRE MITIGATION AND PREPAREDNESS TO DEVELOP CRITERIA12 AND GUIDELINES FOR THE COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM .13 (b) THE CRITERIA AND GUIDELINES DEVELOPED PURSUANT TO14 SUBSECTION (3)(a) OF THIS SECTION MUST:15 (I) BE COMPLETED AND POSTED ON THE WEBSITE OF THE FOREST16 SERVICE ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 28, 2025; AND17 (II) INCLUDE CRITERIA AND GUIDELINES FOR AT LEAST THE18 FOLLOWING ASPECTS OF THE COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM :19 (A) ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS FOR NGO APPLICANTS ASSISTING20 RURAL COMMUNITIES IN SEEKING FEDERAL OR STATE GRANT MONEY FOR21 WILDFIRE MITIGATION AND PREPAREDNESS EFFORTS ;22 (B) APPLICATION REQUIREMENTS; AND23 (C) PARTICIPATION REQUIREMENTS FOR SELECTED NGOS,24 INCLUDING REQUIREMENTS FOR COORDINATION BETWEEN SELECTED25 NGOS TO ENSURE NONDUPLICATION OF EFFORTS AND FOR PERIODIC26 REPORTING.27 1006 -3- (c) (I) AFTER THE FOREST SERVICE HAS CREATED THE COMPETITIVE1 GRANT PROGRAM, THE FOREST SERVICE, TO THE BEST OF ITS ABILITY,2 SHALL CONSULT ON EFFECTIVE USES OF THE GRANT MONEY AND3 SUCCESSFUL OUTCOMES WITH :4 (A) THE DEPARTMENT;5 (B) THE DIVISION OF FIRE PREVENTION AND CONTROL CREATED IN6 SECTION 24-33.5-1201 (1)(a);7 (C) THE GOVERNOR'S OFFICE;8 (D) A RURAL COUNTY ON THE WESTERN SLOPE ;9 (E) A RURAL COUNTY ON THE EASTERN PLAINS ; AND10 (F) A RURAL COUNTY IN THE SOUTHERN PART OF THE STATE .11 (II) THE FOREST SERVICE, IN CONSULTATION WITH SELECTED12 NGOS, SHALL DEVELOP METRICS TO HELP THE FOREST SERVICE ASSESS13 THE SUCCESS OF THE COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM .14 (4) (a) ON OR BEFORE MARCH 1, 2026, AND ON OR BEFORE MARCH15 1 EACH YEAR THEREAFTER , THE FOREST SERVICE SHALL SUBMIT A16 WRITTEN REPORT SUMMARIZING THE COMPETITIVE GRANT PROGRAM TO17 THE WILDFIRE MATTERS REVIEW COMMITTEE CREATED IN SECTION18 2-3-1602 (1)(a) OR, IF THE COMMITTEE NO LONGER EXISTS, TO BOTH THE19 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES AGRICULTURE, WATER, AND NATURAL20 RESOURCES COMMITTEE AND THE SENATE AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL21 RESOURCES COMMITTEE, OR THEIR SUCCESSOR COMMITTEES. THE FOREST22 SERVICE SHALL POST COPIES OF THE REPORTS ON ITS WEBSITE .23 (b) NOTWITHSTANDING SECTION 24-1-136 (11)(a)(I), THE WRITTEN24 REPORT SPECIFIED IN SUBSECTION (4)(a) OF THIS SECTION CONTINUES25 INDEFINITELY.26 SECTION 2. Appropriation. For the 2024-25 state fiscal year,27 1006 -4- $200,000 is appropriated to the department of higher education for use by1 the Colorado commission on higher education and higher education2 special purpose programs. This appropriation is from the general fund and3 is based on an assumption that the department will require an additional4 0.4 FTE. To implement this act, the department may use this5 appropriation for the Colorado state forest service at Colorado state6 university.7 SECTION 3. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act8 takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the9 ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except10 that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V11 of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this12 act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take13 effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in14 November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the15 official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.16 1006 -5-