Colorado 2024 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1006 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 07/16/2024

                    Page 1 
July 16, 2024  HB 24-1006 
 
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Final Fiscal Note  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 24-0423  
Rep. Velasco; Snyder 
Sen. Cutter; Will  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
July 16, 2024 
Signed into Law 
Colin Gaiser | 303-866-2677 
colin.gaiser@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: ASSIST RURAL COMMUNITY WILDFIRE -RELATED GRANT APP  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☐ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill requires the Colorado State Forest Service to create a grant program for 
non-governmental organizations that assist rural communities in applying for 
wildfire-related grants. It increases state and local expenditures on an ongoing basis.  
Appropriation 
Summary: 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes an appropriation of $300,000 to the 
Department of Higher Education for use by the Colorado State Forest Service at 
Colorado State University. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The final fiscal note reflects the enacted bill. The bill was recommended by the 
Wildfire Matters Review Committee.    
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under HB 24-1006 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue  	-     	-     
Expenditures 	General Fund
1
 	$275,875  $24,125  
 
Centrally Appropriated 	$6,300  $4,725  
 
Total Expenditures 	$282,175  $28,850  
 	Total FTE 	0.4 FTE 0.3 FTE 
Transfers  	-  	-  
Other Budget Impacts General Fund Reserve 	$41,381  $3,619 
1
 Money appropriated from the General Fund to the rural grant navigator program in FY 2024-25 has roll-forward 
spending authority through FY 2027-28, and therefore may be spent over several years. 
   Page 2 
July 16, 2024  HB 24-1006 
 
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill requires the Colorado State Forest Service (CSFS) at the Colorado State University to 
establish a rural grant navigator program for nongovernmental organizations (NGOs) that 
provides outreach and technical assistance to rural communities applying for wildfire mitigation 
and preparedness grants. The CSFS must post criteria and guidelines for grant awards by 
February 28, 2025, and NGOs may apply for grants from the program beginning March 1, 2025. 
To the best of its ability, the CSFS is required to consult with the Department of Natural 
Resources, the Division of Fire Prevention and Control in the Department of Public Safety, the 
Governor’s Office, and rural counties to evaluate the effective use of grant funding and 
successful outcomes. By March 1, 2026, and annually thereafter, the CSFS must report program 
activity to the Wildfire Matters Review Committee.  
State Expenditures 
The bill increases state expenditures in the CSFS by up to $282,000 in FY 2024-25, and $29,000 
in FY 2025-26 paid from the General Fund. Costs are shown in Table 2 and described below.  
 
Table 2 
Expenditures Under HB 24-1006 
 
 	FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Colorado State Forest Service   
Personal Services 	$31,655       $23,741       
Operating Expenses 	$512       $384       
Capital Outlay Costs 	$6,670       -       
Rural Grant Navigator Grants
1
 	up to $237,038 	- 
Centrally Appropriated Costs
2
 	$6,300       $4,725  
Total Cost $282,175 $28,850 
Total FTE 0.4 FTE 0.3 FTE 
1
 Expenditures for grants are shown in FY 2024-25, but may be spent across several years. 
2
 Centrally appropriated costs are not included in the bill's appropriation. 
Colorado State Forest Service. The bill increases expenditures in the CSFS to establish, fund, 
and manage the grant program, and report on program outcomes.  
 Staff. The CSFS requires 0.4 FTE in FY 2024-25 for a forestry program specialist to develop 
the grant program and collaborate with NGOs, and 0.3 FTE in ongoing years to perform 
grant program administration. Standard operating and capital costs are included, and 
personal services are prorated in FY 2024-25 for a presumed September 2024 start date.  
  Page 3 
July 16, 2024  HB 24-1006 
 
 
 
 Wildfire mitigation and preparedness grants.  After administrative costs in FY 2024-25 
and FY 2025-26, $237,038 is available to award as grants to qualifying NGOs. Table 2 shows 
total grant expenditures in FY 2024-25, though grants may be awarded over several years. 
 
Centrally appropriated costs. Pursuant to a Joint Budget Committee policy, certain costs 
associated with this bill are addressed through the annual budget process and centrally 
appropriated in the Long Bill or supplemental appropriations bills, rather than in this bill. These 
costs, which include employee insurance and supplemental employee retirement payments, are 
shown in Table 2. 
Other Budget Impacts 
General Fund reserve. Under current law, an amount equal to 15 percent of General Fund 
appropriations must be set aside in the General Fund statutory reserve. Based on this fiscal note, 
the bill is expected to increase the amount of General Fund held in reserve by the amounts 
shown in Table 1, decreasing the amount of General Fund available for other purposes. 
Local Government  
The bill may increase local government revenue and workload, as local governments may apply 
for more grants and secure more grant funding than they would without the assistance of the 
CSFS.  
Effective Date 
The bill was signed into law by the Governor on May 20, 2024, and takes effect on 
August 7, 2024, assuming no referendum petition is filed. 
State Appropriations 
For FY 2024-25, the bill requires and includes a General Fund appropriation of $300,000 to the 
Department of Higher Education for use by the Colorado State Forest Service at Colorado State 
University, and 0.4 FTE. This appropriation may be spent by the department through FY 2027-28 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Counties            Higher Education    Natural Resources   
Office of Economic Development 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.